Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
May 4, 2024 - May 5, 2024 | Championnats suisses | Morges | ||||||||
1 | N | MUMENTHALER Colin | 2004 | M | SUI | CEFL Florimont (SUI) | ||
2 | N | SQUIERI Juliano Nicola | 2007 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | CHARBONNET Samuel | 2007 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | WICHT Gianluca | 2007 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
May 6, 2023 - May 7, 2023 | Championnats suisses | Morges | ||||||||
1 | N | VINEIS Sven | 2003 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ALBRECHT Nicolas | 2006 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FAVRE Aurèle | 2004 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
May 7, 2022 - May 8, 2022 | Championnats suisses | Morges | ||||||||
1 | N | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | FAVRE Aurèle | 2004 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | CAVADINI Lazare | 2002 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
May 8, 2021 - May 9, 2021 | Schweizermeisterschaften U17/U20 | Zürich | ||||||||
1 | N | FAVRE Aurèle | 2004 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
2 | N | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FUHRIMANN Jonathan | 2002 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | SOUTULLO Jordi | 2002 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
May 11, 2019 - May 12, 2019 | Championnats suisses U17/U20 | Zürich | ||||||||
1 | N | VINEIS Sven | 2003 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | CAVADINI Lazare | 2002 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FUHRIMANN Jonathan | 2002 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ZYBACH Lenny | 2001 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
May 5, 2018 - May 6, 2018 | Championnats suisses U17/U20 | Morges | ||||||||
1 | DAGANI Elia | 1998 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
2 | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
3 | HATZ Nick | 1998 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | |||
3 | PFEIFER Jannik | 1998 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
Apr 29, 2017 - Apr 30, 2017 | Championnats suisses U17/U20 | Morges | ||||||||
1 | METRAILLER Clément | 1997 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | |||
2 | VILLIGER Jori | 1997 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | |||
3 | CRIBLEZ Lorin Noam | 1998 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | |||
3 | GERINI Luca | 2000 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | |||
Nov 21, 2015 - Nov 22, 2015 | Championnats suisses U17/U20 | St.Gallen | ||||||||
1 | BAYARD Alexis | 1996 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | |||
2 | DAGANI Elia | 1998 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | METRAILLER Clément | 1997 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | |||
3 | OSWALD Charles-Eric | 1996 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
Nov 8, 2014 - Nov 9, 2014 | Championnats suisses U17/U20 | Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | MALCOTTI Lucas | 1995 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
2 | N | OSWALD Charles-Eric | 1996 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PITTET Alexandre | 1995 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | WEBER Frederik | 1997 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
Dec 22, 2013 - Dec 22, 2013 | Championnats suisses juniors | Bonstetten | ||||||||
1 | N | OBERSON Alexandre | 1994 | M | SUI | BFC Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | OSWALD Charles-Eric | 1996 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | DAGANI Elia | 1998 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | ||
3 | N | MALCOTTI Lucas | 1995 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
Oct 20, 2012 - Oct 21, 2012 | Championnats suisses juniors | Berne | ||||||||
1 | N | OBERSON Alexandre | 1994 | M | SUI | BFC Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | STALDER Leonard | 1993 | M | SUI | CEM Morges (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FAERBER Stephan | 1993 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | PAOLI Stefano | 1995 | M | SUI | |||
Oct 15, 2011 - Oct 16, 2011 | Championnats suisses juniors | Berne | ||||||||
1 | N | BRUNOLD Bruce | 1992 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
2 | N | GIACOPINI Achille | 1992 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | BOURGEOIS Louis | 1993 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | OBERSON Alexandre | 1994 | M | SUI | BFC Basel (SUI) |