Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sep 14, 2024 - Sep 15, 2024 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | BOSSHARD Eric | 2008 | M | SUI | FCZN Zürich (SUI) | ||
2 | N | STOLZ Arthur | 2009 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PERRET Arthur | 2008 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | REGNAT Louis | 2009 | M | SUI | FCZ Zug (SUI) | ||
Sep 16, 2023 - Sep 17, 2023 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | QUELIN-GUERLAIS Gaspard | 2008 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | TAN Lucas | 2007 | M | FRA | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PASSOT Léo | 2007 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | VON SCHONBORN Leopold | 2007 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
Sep 24, 2022 - Sep 25, 2022 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | ISCHI Eric | 2006 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | ||
2 | N | VON SCHONBORN Leopold | 2007 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | LANGENSCHEID Cajus | 2008 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
3 | N | QUELIN-GUERLAIS Gaspard | 2008 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
Oct 2, 2021 - Oct 3, 2021 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | PFEIFER Paul | 2006 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | WIDMER Neel | 2005 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | DUCHENE Noam | 2007 | M | FRA | CEFL Florimont (SUI) | ||
3 | N | SQUIERI Juliano Nicola | 2007 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
Jun 12, 2021 - Jun 13, 2021 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | ISCHI Eric | 2006 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | ||
2 | N | WIDMER Neel | 2005 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | HÜRLIMANN David | 2004 | M | SUI | SESAF Fribourg (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PFEIFER Paul | 2006 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
Oct 19, 2019 - Oct 20, 2019 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | FAVRE Aurèle | 2004 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GERBER Jacob | 2003 | M | SUI | AFCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | VINEIS Sven | 2003 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
Jan 26, 2019 - Jan 27, 2019 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | POLGAR Gabriel | 2003 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | MÜLLER Leonard Gregor | 2002 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | WANG Helius | 2002 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
Sep 23, 2017 - Sep 24, 2017 | Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | ZYBACH Lenny | 2001 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | |||
2 | SOUTULLO Jordi | 2002 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | ERBETTA Diego | 2002 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | |||
3 | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
Sep 24, 2016 - Sep 25, 2016 | CNJ Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
2 | SOUTULLO Jordi | 2002 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | GERINI Luca | 2000 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | |||
3 | WICHT Matteo | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
Sep 26, 2015 - Sep 27, 2015 | CNJ Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | GERINI Luca | 2000 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | |||
2 | LATINO Sebastian | 1999 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | LUSTI Hannes | 1999 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | |||
3 | LUTIN Antoine | 2000 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | |||
Sep 28, 2013 - Sep 28, 2013 | CNJ Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | WEBER Frederik | 1997 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | ZRYD Arthur | 1998 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | CORTHÉSY Bastien | 1998 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | LUPRANO Victor | 1997 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
Sep 23, 2012 - Sep 23, 2012 | CNJ Challenge Marcus Leyrer | Luzern | ||||||||
1 | N | MARCHUKOV Dimitrij | 1900 | M | SUI | |||
2 | N | SIGNORELL Yannick | 1996 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | VILLIGER Jori | 1997 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | WEBER Frederik | 1997 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) |