Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feb 22, 2024 - Feb 25, 2024 | European Championships | Napoli | ||||||||
1 | N | QUEIROLI Michele | 2007 | M | ITA | Cds Mangiarotti (ITA) | ||
2 | N | SUNDER RAJAN Sameer | 2007 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | EROLCEVIK Doruk | 2008 | M | TUR | |||
3 | N | MITRAIL Theo | 2007 | M | FRA | |||
Feb 21, 2023 - Feb 24, 2023 | European Championships | Tallinn | ||||||||
1 | N | CORTINI Leonardo | 2006 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | WOJCIECHOWSKI Szymon | 2006 | M | POL | |||
3 | N | PELLE Domonkos | 2006 | M | HUN | BHSE BUDAPEST (HUN) | ||
3 | N | SARID Alon | 2006 | M | ISR | |||
Mar 3, 2022 - Mar 7, 2022 | European Championships | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | N | RIZZI Jacopo | 2005 | M | ITA | [i] Bergamasca Scherma Creberg (ITA) | ||
2 | N | SARID Alon | 2006 | M | ISR | |||
3 | N | BROOKE Alec | 2005 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | MALVIK Aleksander | 2005 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
Feb 22, 2020 - Feb 26, 2020 | European Championships | Porec | ||||||||
1 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | MENCARELLI Simone | 2003 | M | ITA | [i] TOISE (ITA) | ||
3 | N | HEURLIN VAZQUEZ Lino | 2003 | M | FRA | |||
3 | N | ZHUKOV Semen | 2003 | M | RUS | |||
Feb 22, 2019 - Feb 26, 2019 | European Championships | Foggia | ||||||||
1 | N | TOLASOV Vladimir | 2002 | M | RUS | |||
2 | N | BARTKO Levente | 2002 | M | HUN | MTK (HUN) | ||
3 | N | MENCARELLI Simone | 2003 | M | ITA | [i] TOISE (ITA) | ||
3 | N | REMONDINI Dario | 2002 | M | ITA | [i] CS Forlivese (ITA) | ||
Mar 2, 2018 - Mar 6, 2018 | European Championships U17 | Sochi | ||||||||
1 | DI VEROLI Davide | 2001 | M | ITA | [i] G. VERNE SCHERMA (ITA) | |||
2 | SHVELIDZE Dmitrii | 2001 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | BIRO Alexander | 2001 | M | AUT | KAC Klagenfurt (AUT) | |||
3 | VELTRUP Paul | 2001 | M | GER | Fecht Club Krefeld (GER) | |||
Feb 28, 2017 - Mar 4, 2017 | European Championships U17 | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | DI VEROLI Davide | 2001 | M | ITA | [i] G. VERNE SCHERMA (ITA) | |||
2 | BALZANO Marco | 2000 | M | ITA | [i] CESAN - Club Scherma San Nicola (ITA) | |||
3 | BONGARD Louis | 2000 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | |||
3 | GAETANI Giulio | 2000 | M | ITA | ||||
Feb 29, 2016 - Mar 4, 2016 | European Championships U17 | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | GALPER Stanislav | 1999 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
2 | RUDYKH Daniil | 1999 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | LUBIENIECKI Wojciech | 1999 | M | POL | PTG Sokol Mielec (POL) | |||
3 | PREZIOSI Alessio | 1999 | M | ITA | [i] CS Imola (ITA) | |||
Feb 24, 2015 - Feb 28, 2015 | European Championships U17 | Maribor | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | PIANFETTI Andric | 1998 | M | FRA | PARIS GRP (FRA) | |||
3 | DAGANI Elia | 1998 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | ESKOV Ruslan | 1998 | M | EST | Tartu Kalev (EST) | |||
Feb 23, 2014 - Feb 27, 2014 | European Championships U17 | Jerusalem | ||||||||
1 | BRAUN Rico | 1997 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | SIKLOSI Gergely | 1997 | M | HUN | Balaton (HUN) | |||
3 | SINCLAIR Aml | 1997 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | VISMARA Federico | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
Feb 26, 2013 - Mar 2, 2013 | European Championships | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | BANYAI Zsombor | 1996 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | GORETSKI Sergei | 1996 | M | UKR | Uzhgorod (UKR) | |||
3 | BERGAMINI Enrico | 1996 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | RUBES Martin | 1996 | M | CZE | TJ Lokomotiva Karlovy Vary (CZE) | |||
Feb 28, 2012 - Mar 10, 2012 | European Championships U17 | Porec | ||||||||
1 | KARYUCHENKO Yevgeniy | 1995 | M | UKR | Kharkiv (UKR) | |||
2 | FREILICH Yuval Shalom | 1995 | M | ISR | Hapoel Kfar-Saba (ISR) | |||
3 | CRECCHI Bernardo | 1995 | M | ITA | [i] CUS Siena ASD (ITA) | |||
3 | GORETSKI Sergei | 1996 | M | UKR | Uzhgorod (UKR) | |||
Feb 28, 2011 - Mar 6, 2011 | European Championships U17 | Klagenfurt | ||||||||
1 | FREILICH Yuval Shalom | 1995 | M | ISR | Hapoel Kfar-Saba (ISR) | |||
2 | BUZZI Lorenzo | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | HAMAR Balazs | 1995 | M | HUN | BVSC BUDAPEST (HUN) | |||
3 | PRISTERA Mattia | 1994 | M | ITA | [i] CS LEGNANO (ITA) | |||
Mar 2, 2010 - Mar 3, 2010 | European Championships U17 | Athen | ||||||||
1 | FICHERA Marco | 1993 | M | ITA | [i] CS Acireale (ITA) | |||
2 | ELKORD Houssam | 1993 | M | MAR | LEVALLOIS (FRA) | |||
3 | LUCANI Quentin | 1993 | M | FRA | EPINAL SE (FRA) | |||
3 | SIGNANI Filippo | 1993 | M | ITA | [i] CDS Ravennate (ITA) | |||
Mar 2, 2009 - Mar 3, 2009 | European Championships U17 | Bourges | ||||||||
1 | HAXAIRE Pierre | 1992 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
2 | ANOKHIN Vadim | 1992 | M | AIN | Dinamo-Kazan (RUS) | |||
3 | BÖJTE Szabolocs Jozsef | 1992 | M | TUR | [i] BVSC 2 (HUN) | |||
3 | CLENIN Laurent | 1992 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
Mar 4, 2008 - Mar 5, 2008 | European Championships U17 | Rovigo | ||||||||
1 | SEEVE Teemu | 1992 | M | FIN | Turun Miekkailijat (FIN) | |||
2 | CLENIN Laurent | 1992 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | FONSON Erwan | 1991 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | SWOROWSKI Wojciech | 1991 | M | POL | RMKS Rybnik (POL) | |||
Mar 7, 2007 - Mar 9, 2007 | European Championships U17 | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | ROSELLO Pau | 1990 | M | ESP | SEA-T (ESP) | |||
2 | VAFIN Ramil | 1990 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | BOYADZHIEV Kristian | 1991 | M | BUL | Sofia (BUL) | |||
3 | PROKHOROV Dmytry | 1990 | M | ISR | ||||
Mar 10, 1990 - Mar 11, 1990 | European Championships U17 | Gouda | ||||||||
1 | N | PORISINI Christian | 1900 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | TOTOLA Gabor | 1973 | M | HUN | MTK (HUN) | ||
3 | N | RÜDINGER Alexander | 1973 | M | GER | |||
4 | N | DEAK Ferencz | 1900 | M | HUN | |||
Feb 24, 1989 - Feb 25, 1989 | European Championships | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | N | RÜDINGER Alexander | 1973 | M | GER | |||
2 | N | TOTOLA Gabor | 1973 | M | HUN | MTK (HUN) | ||
3 | N | SARKOEZI Attila | 1972 | M | HUN | BHSE BUDAPEST (HUN) | ||
4 | N | LEMANOWICZ Arkadius | 1972 | M | GER | |||
Mar 10, 1988 - Mar 12, 1988 | European Championships | Udine | ||||||||
1 | N | BUERGIN Nicolas | 1971 | M | SUI | |||
2 | N | HELLSTRÖM Max | 1971 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | LETELLIER Samuel | 1900 | M | FRA | |||
4 | N | FRANKENBERG Marc | 1971 | M | GER | |||
Feb 28, 1987 - Mar 1, 1987 | European Championships | St. Nazaire | ||||||||
1 | N | LOTTER Carsten | 1971 | M | GER | |||
2 | N | MILANO Dario | 1970 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BONKAT Gernot | 1970 | M | GER | |||
4 | N | ATHLIN Mattias | 1970 | M | SWE | EGF Solna (SWE) |