Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oct 4, 2023 - Oct 8, 2023 | Nordic Championships | Kääriku | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ANDÉN Max | 2005 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
1 | N | FASTESSON Rufus | 2005 | M | SWE | EGF Solna (SWE) | ||
1 | N | KVERNES Isak | 2005 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
1 | N | NORDMAN RID Emil | 2005 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | LATVIA | LAT | |||||
2 | N | ABELE Reinis | 2006 | M | LAT | |||
2 | N | BOGDANS Maksims | 2006 | M | LAT | Florete (LAT) | ||
2 | N | GAFE Alekss | 2005 | M | LAT | Asmens (LAT) | ||
3 | N | LATVIA 2 | LAT | |||||
3 | N | FRICBERGS Marcis Juris | 2005 | M | LAT | BJSS Ridzene (LAT) | ||
3 | N | LEBEDEVS Deniss | 2006 | M | LAT | |||
3 | N | ZDORS Markuss | 2007 | M | LAT | BJSS Ridzene (LAT) | ||
4 | N | SWEDEN 2 | SWE | |||||
4 | N | BOUSTEDT Erik | 2005 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
4 | N | ELMFELDT Axel | 2004 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
4 | N | GRELA Tristan | 2006 | M | SWE | EGF Solna (SWE) | ||
4 | N | MONCATAR JUNGERMANN Hugo | 2006 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
Aug 24, 2022 - Aug 28, 2022 | Nordic Championships | Copenhagen | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | FASTESSON Rufus | 2005 | M | SWE | EGF Solna (SWE) | |||
1 | KRÖCKEL Emil | 2004 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
1 | KVERNES Isak | 2005 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
1 | NORDMAN RID Emil | 2005 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | FREDERIKSEN William | 2007 | M | DEN | Københavns Fægteklub (DEN) | |||
2 | FU GIUGNO Raffaele Salvatore Qikuan | 2007 | M | DEN | Københavns Fægteklub (DEN) | |||
2 | MARNANE Alexander | 2007 | M | IRL | Københavns Fægteklub (DEN) | |||
Nov 24, 1990 - Nov 24, 1990 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
1 | N | ANDERSEN-PRYCE Rama | 1973 | M | DEN | Frederiksberg Slots FK (DEN) | ||
1 | N | HANSEN Rasmus Hvass | 1971 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
2 | N | SCHÜLER Fredrik | 1973 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | THUNBERG Jonas | 1973 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | ||
2 | N | VON BUSCH Eduard | 1971 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | WÄSTFELT Anders | 1973 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 5, 1988 - Mar 6, 1988 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | AHLGREN Thomas | 1969 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | ELMFELDT Mathias | 1968 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | HELLSTRÖM Max | 1971 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | WÄSTFELT Henrik | 1969 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | JACOBSEN Rune | 1900 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | NIELSEN Peter | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 14, 1987 - Mar 15, 1987 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | AHLGREN Mats | 1967 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | AHLGREN Thomas | 1969 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | ELMFELDT Mathias | 1968 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SJÖLIN Ola | 1968 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
Mar 1, 1986 - Mar 2, 1986 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | AHLGREN Mats | 1967 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | KAJBJER Ola | 1969 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SJÖLIN Ola | 1968 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SNIS Björn | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | BERGE K | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | FLENSBURG Claus | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | JACOBSEN Rune | 1900 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | ANDREASEN Guttorm | 1966 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | KOLBJORNSEN Endre | 1967 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | ØDEGAARD Halvor | 1967 | M | NOR | Bærum FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | ØISTAD Odin | 1967 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | ||
Apr 23, 1985 - Apr 24, 1985 | Nordic Championships | Lidingö | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | AHLGREN Mats | 1967 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | KAJBJER Ola | 1969 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | ||
1 | N | PETERSTRAND Lars | 1965 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SJÖLIN Ola | 1968 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SNIS Björn | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | ANDREASEN Guttorm | 1966 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | GJERSØE Ivar | 1900 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | KOLBJORNSEN Endre | 1967 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | LUIHN Fredrik | 1966 | M | NOR | Affekt FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | JACOBSEN Rune | 1900 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | NIELSEN Peter | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | SKADBORG Knud | 1969 | M | DEN | Rudersdal FK (DEN) | ||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
4 | N | HAKAMAEKI Ilari | 1900 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
4 | N | HUTHANEN Tuuka | 1970 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
4 | N | LAHTI Tuure Taneli | 1969 | M | FIN | Miekka Miehet (FIN) | ||
4 | N | NURMI A | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
Mar 10, 1984 - Mar 11, 1984 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | AHLGREN Mats | 1967 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | PETERSTRAND Lars | 1965 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SJÖLIN Ola | 1968 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | CORNELIUS-KNUDSEN Christian Jens | 1964 | M | DEN | FK Mahaut (DEN) | ||
2 | N | KOGGERSBÖL Niels | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | MULVAD Henrik | 1964 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
4 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
Mar 12, 1983 - Mar 13, 1983 | Nordic Championships | Birkerod | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ABRAHAMSSON Peter | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SNIS Björn | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | STRAND Eric | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Per | 1963 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | KOGGERSBÖL Niels | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | MULVAD Henrik | 1964 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | STRØMSTAD Paal | 1966 | M | NOR | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 13, 1982 - Mar 14, 1982 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ABRAHAMSSON Peter | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | JUHLIN Andreas | 1962 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | STRAND Eric | 1966 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Per | 1963 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | WENDT Carl-Henrik | 1964 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | CORNELIUS-KNUDSEN Christian Jens | 1964 | M | DEN | FK Mahaut (DEN) | ||
2 | N | KOGGERSBÖL Niels | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | MULVAD Henrik | 1964 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
4 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
Mar 21, 1981 - Mar 22, 1981 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
1 | N | HAKKARAINEN Tero | 1962 | M | FIN | Turun Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
1 | N | LINDBERG Kim Markus | 1965 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
1 | N | PAATTAKAINEN Jouni | 1900 | M | FIN | Espoon Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
1 | N | RAITIO Matti | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
2 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
2 | N | ARONOWITSCH Niklas | 1962 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | ||
2 | N | EIRITZ Johan | 1964 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | PETERSTRAND Lars | 1965 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | PETERSTRAND Ola | 1965 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | MULVAD Henrik | 1964 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
Mar 8, 1980 - Mar 9, 1980 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ÅKERBERG Peter | 1960 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | FORSLÖW Greger | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SVENSSON Cai | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Kenneth | 1960 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
2 | N | PAATTAKAINEN Jouni | 1900 | M | FIN | Espoon Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
4 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
Mar 24, 1979 - Mar 25, 1979 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | EKSTEDT Lars | 1959 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | FORSLÖW Greger | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | JUHLIN Andreas | 1962 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SVENSSON Cai | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | VANAMO Anssi | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
Mar 11, 1978 - Mar 12, 1978 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ÅKERBERG Peter | 1960 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | ÅKERBERG Thomas | 1959 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SVENSSON Cai | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Kenneth | 1960 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | VANAMO Anssi | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
4 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
Mar 12, 1977 - Mar 13, 1977 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ÅKERBERG Thomas | 1959 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
1 | N | EKSTEDT Lars | 1959 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | LINDQUIST Christian | 1958 | M | SWE | MFFG Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Kenneth | 1960 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | HOYVIK Jarle | 1957 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
4 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
Mar 13, 1976 - Mar 14, 1976 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | EKSTEDT Lars | 1959 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | ROSÉN Jonas | 1958 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SVENSSON Bengt-Göran | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | TÄCKENSTRÖM Kenneth | 1960 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | MOE Kjell Otto | 1956 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | LINDROOS Hilding Gustav | 1958 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
4 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
Mar 15, 1975 - Mar 16, 1975 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
1 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
1 | N | MOE Kjell Otto | 1956 | M | NOR | |||
1 | N | MØRCH Lasse | 1955 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | ||
1 | N | VONEN Bård | 1955 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
3 | N | BERGH Benny | 1956 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | EKSTEDT Lars | 1959 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | HÖGSTRÖM Leif | 1955 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | ROSÉN Jonas | 1958 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
4 | N | GRÖNHOLM Peter | 1958 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | ||
Mar 16, 1974 - Mar 17, 1974 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ALLERS Mats | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HÖGSTRÖM Leif | 1955 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HOLMBERG Claes | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | MALKAR Göran | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | MØRCH Lasse | 1955 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 10, 1973 - Mar 11, 1973 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | FLODSTRÖM Göran | 1953 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HARMENBERG Johan | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HOLMBERG Claes | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | JONSSON Dick | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | KOPPANG Nils | 1958 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 11, 1972 - Mar 12, 1972 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | ALLERS Mats | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | FLODSTRÖM Göran | 1953 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HARMENBERG Johan | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | LYRHOLM Hans | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | FJELSTRUP Peter | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | THORUP Flemming | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | FAYE Bjørn | 1952 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | ||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 6, 1971 - Mar 7, 1971 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | BERNSTRÖM Peter | 1953 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HARMENBERG Johan | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | HEDEFÄLT Dag | 1951 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | NORMANN Jeppe | 1951 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | THORUP Flemming | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 7, 1970 - Mar 8, 1970 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | HARMENBERG Johan | 1954 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | JÖNSSON Orvar | 1950 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | SOBACK Sigmund | 1950 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | MØRCH Ole | 1950 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | NORMANN Jeppe | 1951 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | FJELSTRUP Peter | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | THORUP Jørgen | 1950 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 8, 1969 - Mar 9, 1969 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | JÖNSSON Orvar | 1950 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | LÖFMAN Bengt | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SUNDBERG Per | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | LEGO ANDERSEN Eigil | 1950 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | LUND-JACOBSEN Henrik | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | THORUP Jørgen | 1950 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | MØRCH Ole | 1950 | M | NOR | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 9, 1968 - Mar 10, 1968 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | JÖNSSON Orvar | 1950 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | LÖFMAN Bengt | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SUNDBERG Per | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | LUND-JACOBSEN Henrik | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | THORUP Jørgen | 1950 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | MØRCH Ole | 1950 | M | NOR | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Feb 18, 1967 - Feb 19, 1967 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | JÖNSSON Orvar | 1950 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
1 | N | RUBIN Henric | 1947 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | SUNDBERG Per | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
2 | N | ASKJAER-FRIIS Peter | 1947 | M | DEN | Københavns Fægteklub (DEN) | ||
2 | N | JOHANSEN Svend | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
3 | N | BJERCH-ANDRESEN Henning | 1947 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 12, 1966 - Mar 13, 1966 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
1 | N | BJERCH-ANDRESEN Henning | 1947 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
1 | N | KNUTZEN Peter | 1900 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
2 | N | FALK Thomas | 1948 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | JACOBSON Hans | 1947 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | SUNDBERG Per | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | LACOUR-JANSEN Kim | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
Mar 26, 1965 - Mar 27, 1965 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
1 | N | BJERCH-ANDRESEN Henning | 1947 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
1 | N | KNUTZEN Peter | 1900 | M | NOR | |||
1 | N | MIDLING-JENSEN F | 1900 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
2 | N | JACOBSON Hans | 1947 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | RUBIN Henric | 1947 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | SUNDBERG Per | 1949 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | APPELROTH Lars | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
4 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
Feb 15, 1964 - Feb 16, 1964 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
1 | N | BJERCH-ANDRESEN Henning | 1947 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
1 | N | MIDLING-JENSEN F | 1900 | M | NOR | |||
1 | N | VON KOSS Jan Christopher | 1945 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
2 | N | ADLER Johan | 1900 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | BROMÉE Per | 1945 | M | SWE | NFK Nyköping (SWE) | ||
2 | N | ROHLIN Lennart | 1944 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | FINLAND | FIN | |||||
3 | N | APPELROTH Lars | 1900 | M | FIN | |||
Mar 16, 1963 - Mar 17, 1963 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | SWEDEN | SWE | |||||
1 | N | BROMÉE Per | 1945 | M | SWE | NFK Nyköping (SWE) | ||
1 | N | LARSSON Lars-Erik | 1944 | M | SWE | |||
1 | N | ROHLIN Lennart | 1944 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | NORWAY | NOR | |||||
2 | N | PLATOU Christian | 1943 | M | NOR | |||
2 | N | VON KOSS Jan Christopher | 1945 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | DENMARK | DEN | |||||
3 | N | HANSEN H | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | KEMNITZ Ivan | 1943 | M | DEN | [i] HMF Helsingør (DEN) | ||
4 | N | FINLAND | FIN |