Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sep 2, 2023 - Sep 3, 2023 | OWS Security Masters Biel/Bienne | Biel/Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | BRUNNER Pauline | 1994 | F | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | KRIEGER Angela | 1990 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FAVRE Angeline | 2000 | F | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GOGNIAT Vanie | 2005 | F | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
Nov 5, 2022 - Nov 6, 2022 | OWS Security Masters Biel/Bienne | Biel/Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | BRUNNER Pauline | 1994 | F | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | STAEHLI Laura | 1991 | F | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GOGNIAT Vanie | 2005 | F | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | MOESCHLIN Noemi | 1996 | F | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
Nov 6, 2021 - Nov 7, 2021 | OWS Security Masters Biel/Bienne | Biel/Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | MALCOTTI Lucas | 1995 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
2 | N | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | BAYARD Alexis | 1996 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | OSWALD Charles-Eric | 1996 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
Nov 9, 2019 - Nov 10, 2019 | OWS Security Masters Biel/Bienne | Biel/Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | STEFFEN Benjamin | 1982 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | DAGANI Elia | 1998 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PITTET Alexandre | 1995 | M | SUI | |||
Nov 10, 2018 - Nov 11, 2018 | Prona Masters Bienne | Biel/Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | PITTET Alexandre | 1995 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | BAYARD Alexis | 1996 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | MALCOTTI Lucas | 1995 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
Oct 21, 2017 - Oct 22, 2017 | Prona Masters Bienne | Biel Bienne | ||||||||
1 | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | |||
2 | KUHN Georg | 1992 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | |||
3 | NIGGELER Michele | 1992 | M | SUI | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | PITTET Alexandre | 1995 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
Oct 22, 2016 - Oct 23, 2016 | Prona Masters Bienne | Biel Bienne | ||||||||
1 | VERWIJLEN Bas | 1983 | M | NED | SC Den Bosch (NED) | |||
2 | STEFFEN Benjamin | 1982 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | |||
3 | HOFFMANN Basil | 1976 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | KAUTER Michael | 1979 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | |||
Oct 17, 2015 - Oct 18, 2015 | Prona Masters Bienne | Biel Bienne | ||||||||
1 | KAUTER Fabian | 1985 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | |||
2 | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | |||
3 | PITTET Alexandre | 1995 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | STEFFEN Benjamin | 1982 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | |||
Oct 18, 2014 - Oct 19, 2014 | Bieler-Masters-Bienne | Biel Bienne | ||||||||
1 | N | STAUB Florian | 1990 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | KAUTER Fabian | 1985 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | CLENIN Laurent | 1992 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
3 | N | HEINZER Max | 1987 | M | SUI | FGK Küssnacht (SUI) |