rank | status | pool | name | yob | gender | nation | club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
30. mar. 2024 - 31. mar. 2024 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | GOUGOULIAS Olympios | 2002 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
2 | N | TWINE Daniel | 2000 | M | GBR | Cambridge University Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | BEDFORD Louis | 2003 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | MARTIN Henry | 2005 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
8. apr. 2023 - 9. apr. 2023 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MCLELLAN Rory | 2003 | M | GBR | Salle Ossian (GBR) | ||
2 | N | HOWES Nicholas | 1998 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | SUDDARDS George | 1998 | M | GBR | House of Sabre (GBR) | ||
3 | N | TWINE Daniel | 2000 | M | GBR | Cambridge University Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
16. apr. 2022 - 17. apr. 2022 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MCLELLAN Rory | 2003 | M | GBR | Salle Ossian (GBR) | ||
2 | N | HALLIWELL Barnaby | 2000 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | HAYNES Luke | 2001 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | HOWES Nicholas | 1998 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
20. apr. 2019 - 21. apr. 2019 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | AIYENURO Soji | 1993 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | HAMILTON Zachary | 1999 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | POCKNELL Joe | 2000 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | SAUNDERS Brynmor | 1994 | M | GBR | Paul Davis Fencing Academy (GBR) | ||
31. mar. 2018 - 1. apr. 2018 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | GEMESI Bence | 1989 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | ||
2 | N | AIYENURO Soji | 1993 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | KRUSZEWSKI Jan | 1998 | M | POL | AZS AWF Warszawa (POL) | ||
3 | N | SAUNDERS Brynmor | 1994 | M | GBR | Paul Davis Fencing Academy (GBR) | ||
15. apr. 2017 - 16. apr. 2017 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | AIYENURO Soji | 1993 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | EDWARDS James | 2000 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | HOWES Nicholas | 1998 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | THORLEY Christian | 1991 | M | GBR | |||
26. apr. 2016 - 27. apr. 2016 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | ROCKS Stephen | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | MOTTERSHEAD Thomas James | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CONCANNON Stephen | 1986 | M | IRL | |||
3 | N | POTTER Nathan | 1996 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
4. apr. 2015 - 5. apr. 2015 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MOTTERSHEAD Thomas James | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | SAUNDERS Brynmor | 1994 | M | GBR | Paul Davis Fencing Academy (GBR) | ||
3 | N | ROCKS Stephen | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | VONDEE Morgan | 1992 | M | GBR | Millfield School (GBR) | ||
19. apr. 2014 - 20. apr. 2014 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | CRUTCHETT Alexander | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | AIYENURO Soji | 1993 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | GANN Henry | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | JENNINGS Patrick | 1993 | M | GBR | Rivington Park FC (GBR) | ||
30. mar. 2013 - 31. mar. 2013 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MILLER Curtis | 1992 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | RATNESWARAN Maiyuran | 1990 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | AIYENURO Soji | 1993 | M | GBR | Camden Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | SIMMONS John | 1993 | M | GBR | Shakespeare's Swords (GBR) | ||
4. apr. 2012 - 5. apr. 2012 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | RATNESWARAN Maiyuran | 1990 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Alexander | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WARD Fraser | 1990 | M | GBR | |||
23. apr. 2011 - 24. apr. 2011 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MOTTERSHEAD Thomas James | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | RATNESWARAN Maiyuran | 1990 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | GANN Henry | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3. apr. 2010 - 4. apr. 2010 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | BRAINE Gildas | 1977 | M | GBR | GISORS 3A (FRA) | ||
2 | N | MARSHALL Stuart | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | RAHIMI Amir | 1981 | M | GBR | |||
11. apr. 2009 - 12. apr. 2009 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | BRAINE Gildas | 1977 | M | GBR | GISORS 3A (FRA) | ||
2 | N | NEGRO Francesco Eugenio | 1944 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | FARREN Christopher | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ROSE Julian | 1982 | M | GBR | |||
22. mar. 2008 - 23. mar. 2008 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | HONEYBONE James | 1991 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | CRUTCHETT Alexander | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | MOTTERSHEAD Thomas James | 1989 | M | GBR | |||
7. apr. 2007 - 8. apr. 2007 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FARREN Christopher | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | GEMESI Bence | 1989 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | ||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | NELIS Julian | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
15. apr. 2006 - 16. apr. 2006 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | HUTCHISON Neil | 1984 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | SALFIELD Jon | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CRUTCHETT Anthony | 1988 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | NELIS Julian | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
26. mar. 2005 - 27. mar. 2005 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | NELIS Julian | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | SALFIELD Jon | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FLOOD Dominic | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | HUTCHISON Neil | 1984 | M | GBR | |||
10. apr. 2004 - 11. apr. 2004 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FARREN Christopher | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BUXTON Chris | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FLOOD Dominic | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
19. apr. 2003 - 20. apr. 2003 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FLOOD Dominic | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | SALFIELD Jon | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FARREN Christopher | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | NELIS Julian | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
30. mar. 2002 - 31. mar. 2002 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | BUXTON Chris | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | JAMIESON Christopher | 1979 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ALSAYED Ali | 1900 | M | KUW | |||
3 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
14. apr. 2001 - 15. apr. 2001 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FARREN Christopher | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | NELIS Julian | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BUXTON Chris | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
22. apr. 2000 - 23. apr. 2000 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FLOOD Dominic | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | MOORE Stephen Anthony William | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BUXTON Chris | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WATSON Stewart | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3. apr. 1999 - 4. apr. 1999 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | SMITH Cameron | 1971 | M | AUS | |||
3 | N | COHEN Richard | 1947 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | HANLEY Benet | 1971 | M | GBR | |||
11. apr. 1998 - 12. apr. 1998 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | WILLIAMS James | 1966 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | HOENIGMANN Paul | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | SABA Shafik | 1972 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | SLADE Mark | 1958 | M | GBR | |||
29. mar. 1997 - 30. mar. 1997 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | SABA Shafik | 1972 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | COHEN Richard | 1947 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | HANLEY Benet | 1971 | M | GBR | |||
6. apr. 1996 - 7. apr. 1996 | Birmingham International | Birmingham | ||||||||
1 | N | FLOOD Dominic | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | WRIGHT Peter | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | KHAKHRIA Vijay | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | SHARMA Raj | 1968 | M | GBR |