rank | status | pool | name | yob | gender | nation | club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16. nov. 2023 - 18. nov. 2023 | Campeonato Brasileiro Infantil | São Paulo | ||||||||
1 | N | KADUNC Theo | 2013 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
2 | N | FERRAZZI João Pedro | 2013 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | DEFENDI Gabriel | 2012 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | FONSECA Antonio | 2014 | M | BRA | CMSP Sao Paulo (BRA) | ||
3. nov. 2022 - 5. nov. 2022 | Campeonato Brasileiro Infantil | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | N | TEIXEIRA Antonio | 2011 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
2 | N | VENTURA Carlos Eduardo | 2011 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
3 | N | CAMPOS Fernando | 2011 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | FERRAZZI João Pedro | 2013 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
4. nov. 2021 - 7. nov. 2021 | Campeonato Brasileiro Infantil | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | N | TOMINO Leonardo | 2010 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
2 | N | SILVA Walison | 2010 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | REICHOW Felipe | 2010 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | SANTOS José | 2010 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
11. okt. 2019 - 13. okt. 2019 | Campeonato Brasileiro Infantil | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | N | FOSCHINI Luiz | 2008 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
2 | N | BUENO Gustavo | 2008 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
3 | N | MALUF Guilherme | 2008 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
3 | N | TOMINO Leonardo | 2010 | M | BRA | SSJE Sao Jorge (BRA) | ||
16. mar. 2018 - 18. mar. 2018 | Campeonato Brasileiro infantil | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | NOGUEIRA Pedro | 2007 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | |||
2 | LOBO Guilherme | 2007 | M | BRA | SSJE Sao Jorge (BRA) | |||
3 | FOSCHINI Luiz | 2008 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | |||
3 | HOMSI Bernardo | 2007 | M | BRA | BTC Barroca (BRA) | |||
15. sep. 2017 - 17. sep. 2017 | Campeonato Brasileiro infantil | Belo Horizonte | ||||||||
1 | CHOLFE Theo | 2006 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | |||
2 | ALONSO Vinicius | 2006 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | |||
3 | MURRAY Pedro | 2006 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | |||
3 | NOGUEIRA Pedro | 2007 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | |||
21. okt. 2016 - 23. okt. 2016 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Sao Paulo | ||||||||
1 | MURA Andre | 2005 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | |||
2 | MURRAY Pedro | 2006 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | |||
3 | FUMAGALLI Giorgio | 2005 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | |||
3 | RAMOS Rafael | 2005 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | |||
23. okt. 2015 - 25. okt. 2015 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Sao Paulo | ||||||||
1 | MION Lorenzo | 2004 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | |||
2 | TOMINO Rafael | 2004 | M | BRA | CMSP Sao Paulo (BRA) | |||
3 | DUARTE Leonardo | 2005 | M | BRA | SSJE Sao Jorge (BRA) | |||
3 | HOFMEISTER Andre | 2004 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | |||
23. okt. 2014 - 25. okt. 2014 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | N | FRANCA Giovanni | 2003 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
2 | N | PACHECO Ricardo | 2003 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | FONSECA Lucas | 2003 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | MION Lorenzo | 2004 | M | BRA | ECP Pinheiros (BRA) | ||
6. sep. 2013 - 8. sep. 2013 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Sao Paulo | ||||||||
1 | N | MURRAY Guilherme | 2002 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
2 | N | FRANCA Giovanni | 2003 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | FONSECA Lucas | 2003 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | PACHECO Ricardo | 2003 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
7. sep. 2012 - 9. sep. 2012 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Sao Paulo | ||||||||
1 | N | SACCHI Francesco | 2001 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
2 | N | MURRAY Guilherme | 2002 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | BRECHERET Pedro | 2002 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
3 | N | FRANCA Giovanni | 2003 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
4. sep. 2010 - 6. sep. 2010 | Campeonato Brasileiro | Curitiba | ||||||||
1 | N | DE NIGRIS Giovanni | 1999 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) | ||
2 | N | DE MOURA Dartagnan | 1998 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | MENALDA Henrique | 2000 | M | BRA | GNU Nautico Uniao (BRA) | ||
3 | N | SACCHI Francesco | 2001 | M | BRA | CAP Paulistano (BRA) |