rank | status | pool | name | yob | γένος | nation | σωματείο | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nov 1, 2014 - Nov 2, 2014 | JAFs Jubilaeumsstaevne | Århus | ||||||||
1 | N | CIPAR Jan | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | OLSEN Johannes Kristian | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | PETERSEN Magnus | 1999 | M | DEN | JAF Arhus (DEN) | ||
Nov 12, 2011 - Nov 13, 2011 | JAFs Jubilaeumsstaevne | Århus | ||||||||
1 | N | YIANNAKI Constantinos | 1994 | M | CYP | Nicosia FC (CYP) | ||
2 | N | KNUDSEN Kenneth | 1997 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
3 | N | DEMETRIOU Demetris | 1992 | M | CYP | Nicosia FC (CYP) | ||
3 | N | VILHELMSEN Frej Juul | 1995 | M | DEN | FK Sydjylland (DEN) |