rank | status | pool | name | yob | γένος | nation | σωματείο | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aug 9, 2022 - Aug 20, 2022 | Commonwealth Championships | London | ||||||||
1 | N | COOPER Matthew | 1998 | M | GBR | Wingerworth Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | EAST William | 1999 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CHOONG Joseph | 1995 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WOOLLARD Jonathan | 1992 | M | GBR | Heriot Watt University F (GBR) | ||
Nov 23, 2018 - Nov 28, 2018 | Commonwealth Championships | Canberra | ||||||||
1 | N | CURRAN JONES Tomas | 1995 | M | GBR | Brixton Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | JOHNSTON Calum | 1992 | M | GBR | Edinburgh University FC (GBR) | ||
3 | N | RADFORD Kristian | 1989 | M | AUS | |||
3 | N | SANCHEZ-LETHEM Paul James | 1994 | M | GBR | Brixton Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
Nov 9, 2014 - Nov 19, 2014 | Commonwealth Championships | Largs | ||||||||
1 | N | TREDGER Dudley | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | BURKHALTER Marc | 1982 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | DOWNES John | 1991 | M | AUS | |||
3 | N | EDWARDS Thomas | 1993 | M | GBR | Redhill and Reigate EC (GBR) | ||
Sep 29, 2010 - Oct 5, 2010 | Commonwealth Championships | Melbourne | ||||||||
1 | N | BURKHALTER Marc | 1982 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | LIM Wei Wen | 1985 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | THORNTON James | 1986 | M | GBR | Brentwood School Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | TREDGER Dudley | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
Sep 20, 2006 - Sep 25, 2006 | Commonwealth Championships | Belfast | ||||||||
1 | N | LINTEAU Thomas | 1976 | M | CAN | |||
2 | N | PELLETIER Vincent | 1976 | M | CAN | |||
3 | N | LANE Tristan | 1982 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WILLIS Jonathan | 1981 | M | GBR | |||
Nov 19, 2002 - Nov 24, 2002 | Commonwealth Championships | Newcastle | ||||||||
1 | N | HEFFERNAN Nick | 1974 | M | AUS | |||
2 | N | WILLIS Jonathan | 1981 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | TREDGER Dudley | 1980 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | USHER Eric | 1975 | M | GBR | |||
Aug 16, 1998 - Aug 22, 1998 | Commonwealth Championships | Shah Alam | ||||||||
1 | N | ROBINSON Seamus | 1975 | M | AUS | |||
2 | N | ARNOLD Scott | 1965 | M | AUS | |||
3 | N | BERRIMAN Quentin | 1964 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | STEENKAMP Daniel | 1974 | M | RSA | |||
Jun 20, 1994 - Jun 20, 1994 | Commonwealth Championships | Whistler | ||||||||
1 | N | SHONG Laurie | 1971 | M | CAN | |||
2 | N | AUSTIN Simon | 1964 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ASPINALL Simon | 1967 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WEYMOUTH Simon | 1975 | M | AUS | |||
Jul 1, 1990 - Jul 1, 1990 | Commonwealth Championships | Manchester | ||||||||
1 | N | CHOUINARD Jean-Marc | 1963 | M | CAN | |||
2 | N | BERRIMAN Quentin | 1964 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | MELVILLE Jerry | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | SHONG Laurie | 1971 | M | CAN | |||
Jul 15, 1986 - Jul 21, 1986 | Commonwealth Championships | Cardiff | ||||||||
1 | N | DESSUREAULT Michele | 1957 | M | CAN | |||
2 | N | PERREAULT Daniel | 1961 | M | CAN | |||
3 | N | CHOUINARD Jean-Marc | 1963 | M | CAN | |||
Jul 1, 1982 - Jul 1, 1982 | Commonwealth Championships | Barnstaple | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | TYSON Julian | 1949 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | DAVIDSON Robert | 1958 | M | AUS | |||
4 | N | LLEWELLYN John | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
Jul 1, 1978 - Jul 1, 1978 | Commonwealth Championships | Glasgow | ||||||||
1 | N | ROOSE Steve | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | BENKO Gregory | 1952 | M | AUS | |||
3 | N | PAUL Steven | 1954 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | HOSKYNS Henry William Furse | 1931 | M | GBR | |||
Jul 1, 1974 - Jul 1, 1974 | Commonwealth Championships | Ottawa | ||||||||
1 | N | BENKO Gregory | 1952 | M | AUS | |||
2 | N | PARTRIDGE David | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | NOEL James | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | PRIMEAU Jacues | 1900 | M | CAN |