rank | status | pool | name | yob | γένος | nation | σωματείο | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feb 22, 2024 - Feb 29, 2024 | Asian Championships | Manama | ||||||||
1 | N | GAO Ying Chuen | 2007 | M | HKG | |||
2 | N | PROKHODOV Kirill | 2007 | M | KAZ | |||
3 | N | FUKUSHIMA Kosei | 2007 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | HATAKAKE Seigo | 2007 | M | JPN | |||
Mar 2, 2023 - Mar 9, 2023 | Asian Championships | Tashkent | ||||||||
1 | N | NAM Hohyun | 2006 | M | KOR | |||
2 | N | LEE Rang | 2007 | M | TPE | |||
3 | N | HSU Jia Huan Kenton | 2007 | M | HKG | |||
3 | N | ZHANG Qinrui | 2006 | M | CHN | |||
Feb 24, 2022 - Mar 3, 2022 | Asian Championships | Tashkent | ||||||||
1 | N | LUKIN Bogdan | 2005 | M | KAZ | |||
2 | N | TIMUROV Meyirkhan | 2005 | M | UZB | |||
3 | N | BATBYAMBA Gandul | 2006 | M | MGL | |||
3 | N | LIM Julien Kenneth | 2006 | M | HKG | Blade (SGP) | ||
Mar 1, 2020 - Mar 5, 2020 | Asian Championships | Amman | ||||||||
1 | N | MATSUMOTO Ryu | 2002 | M | JPN | |||
2 | N | LEE Simon Renjie | 2003 | M | SGP | SSP (SGP) | ||
3 | N | ASAMI Seiya | 2002 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | LIN Xiaosen | 2002 | M | CHN | |||
Feb 27, 2019 - Mar 8, 2019 | Asian Championships | Amman | ||||||||
1 | N | MATSUMOTO Ryu | 2002 | M | JPN | |||
2 | N | LEE Simon Renjie | 2003 | M | SGP | SSP (SGP) | ||
3 | N | ASAMI Seiya | 2002 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | LIN Xiaosen | 2002 | M | CHN | |||
Feb 24, 2018 - Mar 4, 2018 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Dubai | ||||||||
1 | N | BAUDUNOV Khasan | 2001 | M | UZB | |||
2 | N | ZHANG Xinkun | 2002 | M | CHN | |||
3 | N | ASAMI Seiya | 2002 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | LEE Simon Renjie | 2003 | M | SGP | SSP (SGP) | ||
Feb 24, 2017 - Mar 5, 2017 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Korat | ||||||||
1 | KU Bonyeong | 2001 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | BAUDUNOV Khasan | 2001 | M | UZB | ||||
3 | CHINGAKHAM Jetlee Singh | 2001 | M | IND | ||||
3 | SAVIN Alexandr | 2000 | M | KAZ | ||||
Feb 20, 2016 - Feb 23, 2016 | Asien Meisterschaften U17/U20 | Dammam | ||||||||
1 | EL CHOUEIRY Antoine | 1999 | M | LBN | ||||
2 | SATHASIVAN NIRMALA Siva Magesh | 2002 | M | IND | ||||
3 | ISHII Kazuki | 1999 | M | JPN | ||||
3 | TAJIRI Kodai | 1999 | M | JPN | ||||
Mar 1, 2015 - Mar 9, 2015 | Asien Meisterschaften U17/U20 | Abu Dabi | ||||||||
1 | LIM Neville Woon Juin | 1998 | M | SGP | Blade (SGP) | |||
2 | KOMATA Akira | 1998 | M | JPN | ||||
3 | ALIMOV Fayzulla | 1998 | M | UZB | ||||
3 | SIM Nigel | 1998 | M | SGP | ||||
Mar 8, 2014 - Mar 16, 2014 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Amman | ||||||||
1 | KE Yulong | 1998 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | GU Xinyuan | 1997 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | CHUANG Po Yu | 1997 | M | TPE | ||||
3 | ZHU Haiyu | 1997 | M | CHN | ||||
Mar 3, 2013 - Mar 11, 2013 | Asien Meisterschaften | Bangkok | ||||||||
1 | N | NGUYEN Phuoc Den | 1996 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | NG Ho Tin | 1996 | M | HKG | |||
3 | N | HO Sze Hou | 1996 | M | HKG | |||
3 | N | KAWAKITA Shinkai | 1997 | M | JPN | |||
Oct 1, 2012 - Oct 8, 2012 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Bali | ||||||||
1 | ZHANG Yu | 1996 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | SUN Jiajie | 1996 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | NGUYEN Phuoc Den | 1996 | M | VIE | ||||
3 | ZHU Yichen | 1996 | M | CHN | ||||
Mar 4, 2011 - Mar 13, 2011 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Bangkok | ||||||||
1 | TSUE Aoi | 1994 | M | JPN | ||||
2 | PIYA-ANANT Poonanant | 1994 | M | THA | ||||
3 | ADAIKIN Dmitriy | 1994 | M | KAZ | ||||
3 | SYU Zih Siang | 1994 | M | TPE | ||||
Mar 5, 2010 - Mar 14, 2010 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Pasig City | ||||||||
1 | DERYABIN Ivan | 1993 | M | KAZ | ||||
2 | SHIMADA Koya | 1993 | M | JPN | ||||
3 | FONG Hoi Sun | 1993 | M | HKG | ||||
3 | ZHAKUPOV Kirill | 1993 | M | KAZ | ||||
Jul 16, 2009 - Jul 21, 2009 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Singapore | ||||||||
1 | ZHAKUPOV Kirill | 1993 | M | KAZ | ||||
2 | DERYABIN Ivan | 1993 | M | KAZ | ||||
3 | KIM Han Wool | 1900 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | TSUE Aoi | 1994 | M | JPN | ||||
Oct 25, 2008 - Oct 30, 2008 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Yanggu City | ||||||||
1 | KIM Yun Tae | 1991 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | ALEXANIN Dmitriy | 1991 | M | KAZ | ||||
3 | KANNO Keishi | 1991 | M | JPN | ||||
3 | KURBANOV Ruslan | 1991 | M | KAZ | ||||
Jul 2, 2007 - Jul 8, 2007 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Almaty | ||||||||
1 | TRUBACHEV Alexey | 1991 | M | KAZ | ||||
2 | KURBANOV Ruslan | 1991 | M | KAZ | ||||
3 | JOSHUA KOH I-Jie | 1990 | M | MAS | ||||
3 | SLESSARENKO Roman | 1990 | M | KAZ | ||||
Apr 24, 2006 - Apr 30, 2006 | Asian Championships U17/U20 | Kuweit City | ||||||||
1 | HASAN Fahed | 1989 | M | KUW | ||||
2 | AL-HAMOUD Muhanna | 1991 | M | KSA | ||||
3 | ALQATTAN Ahmed | 1989 | M | KUW | ||||
3 | PYO Jung Woo | 1989 | M | KOR |