Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nov 11, 2023 - Nov 12, 2023 | Danske Mesterskaber | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | DU PLESSIS DE RICHELIEU Jakob | 2005 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | FRIIS MADSEN Benjamin | 2005 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
3 | N | OXHOLM WAGNER Alec | 2005 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
3 | N | PEDERSEN Adrian | 2008 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
Nov 12, 2022 - Nov 13, 2022 | Danske Mesterskaber | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | DU PLESSIS DE RICHELIEU Jakob | 2005 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | ODGAARD-JENSEN Johan | 2006 | M | DEN | Rudersdal FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | BÆKMAND Nicky | 2004 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | CHRISTENSEN Valdemar Ditlev | 2003 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
Oct 30, 2021 - Oct 31, 2021 | Danske Mesterskaber | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | QVISTGAARD Simon | 2004 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
2 | N | BRANDES Magnus | 2004 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | CHRISTENSEN Valdemar Ditlev | 2003 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
3 | N | DIEMER Alfred | 2003 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
Sep 12, 2020 - Sep 13, 2020 | Danske Mesterskaber | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | JENSEN August Lindström | 2001 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | OXHOLM WAGNER Alec | 2005 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | BERNSEN Christoffer Leth | 2000 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | LE QUANG HUY Phileas Rubaek | 2000 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
Jan 12, 2019 - Jan 13, 2019 | Danske Mesterskaberne | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | PERSSON Casper Nils | 1999 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
2 | N | JENSEN August Lindström | 2001 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | BERNSEN Christoffer Leth | 2000 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | LE QUANG HUY Phileas Rubaek | 2000 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
Jan 13, 2018 - Jan 14, 2018 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | JENSEN August Lindström | 2001 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
2 | LE QUANG HUY Phileas Rubaek | 2000 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | |||
3 | BERNSEN Christoffer Leth | 2000 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
3 | JEPPESEN Tobias | 2001 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
Jan 14, 2017 - Jan 15, 2017 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | KONGSTAD Conrad Seibæk | 1997 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
2 | LINNEMANN Christian Schack | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
3 | KNUDSEN Kenneth | 1997 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | |||
3 | OLSEN Johannes Kristian | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
Jan 2, 2016 - Jan 3, 2016 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | BERG Mads Peter | 1998 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
2 | KNUDSEN Kenneth | 1997 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | |||
3 | BREMS Alexander | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
3 | LINNEMANN Christian Schack | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
Jan 17, 2015 - Jan 18, 2015 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Rudersdal | ||||||||
1 | N | LINNEMANN Christian Schack | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | AL AWSSI Hanibal | 1996 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | BREMS Alexander | 1997 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | KNUDSEN Kenneth | 1997 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
May 24, 2014 - May 25, 2014 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | RAHBEK Alexander Christian | 1995 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | KNUDSEN Kenneth | 1997 | M | DEN | KFK Kalundborg (DEN) | ||
3 | N | JAUERNIK Christian | 1994 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | LINNEMANN Christian Schack | 1997 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
May 4, 2013 - May 5, 2013 | Danske Mesterskaberne juniorer | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | ROBL Troels Christian | 1993 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | JAUERNIK Christian | 1994 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | CANING Klaus Albert | 1993 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | EGELUND Alexander S. | 1993 | M | DEN | |||
May 12, 2012 - May 13, 2012 | Danske Mesterskaberne | Kalundborg | ||||||||
1 | N | VON DER OSTEN Frederik | 1993 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | EGELUND Alexander S. | 1993 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | JAUERNIK Christian | 1994 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | WIEGELL Mathias | 1992 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) |