Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nov 4, 2023 - Nov 5, 2023 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | GITTON Camille | 2006 | F | FRA | ANNECY (FRA) | ||
2 | N | PERROUD Nora | 2004 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
3 | N | NEDOPAKA Kateryna | 2008 | F | UKR | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PONTINELLI Marie | 2001 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
Nov 5, 2022 - Nov 6, 2022 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | PERROUD Nora | 2004 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
2 | N | LUKOVKINA Anastasiia | 1994 | F | FIE | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
Nov 13, 2021 - Nov 14, 2021 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | PERROUD Nora | 2004 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
2 | N | PY Marilou | 1986 | F | FRA | BESANCON UC (FRA) | ||
3 | N | PELET Luna | 2001 | F | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
3 | N | SALAMIN Gwenaëlle | 1998 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
Nov 9, 2019 - Nov 10, 2019 | Circuit National Senior | Genève | ||||||||
1 | N | VIELI Isabelle | 1991 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | ||
2 | N | KOTUR Ekaterina | 1982 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | ||
Nov 3, 2018 - Nov 3, 2018 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | FERAUD Sarah | 2001 | F | FRA | MEYLAN SE (FRA) | ||
2 | N | DE SALIS Lara | 1995 | F | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
3 | N | KOTUR Ekaterina | 1982 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | PELET Luna | 2001 | F | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
Nov 25, 2017 - Nov 26, 2017 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | KOTUR Ekaterina | 1982 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | |||
2 | VIELI Isabelle | 1991 | F | SUI | FGL Luzern (SUI) | |||
Nov 15, 2015 - Nov 15, 2015 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | SALAMIN Gwenaëlle | 1998 | F | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | |||
Nov 2, 2013 - Nov 3, 2013 | Circuit National Senior | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | DE SALIS Camille | 1995 | F | SUI | |||
2 | N | DE SALIS Lara | 1995 | F | SUI | |||
3 | N | RUSHTON Georgia | 1998 | F | SUI | |||
4 | N | KOTUR Ekaterina | 1982 | F | SUI | AFZ Zürich (SUI) |