Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nov 4, 2023 - Nov 5, 2023 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | RICHTER Axel | 2005 | M | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
2 | N | ALVAREZ PEREZ Iñaki | 2004 | M | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ROSSETTI Alexandre | 2005 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
Nov 5, 2022 - Nov 6, 2022 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | ALVAREZ PEREZ Iñaki | 2004 | M | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
2 | N | ROSSETTI Alexandre | 2005 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
3 | N | EICHLER Victor | 2007 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
Nov 13, 2021 - Nov 14, 2021 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | ALVAREZ PEREZ Iñaki | 2004 | M | SUI | CHCH Châtelaine (SUI) | ||
2 | N | DONATI Alexander | 2003 | M | SUI | CSL Locarno (SUI) | ||
3 | N | CROSTA Giovanni | 2005 | M | ITA | [i] CS VARESE (ITA) | ||
3 | N | ROSSETTI Alexandre | 2005 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
Nov 9, 2019 - Nov 10, 2019 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Genève | ||||||||
1 | N | PERROUD Rémi | 2001 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
2 | N | VERT Loïc | 2001 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GROSSE Antonin | 2002 | M | FRA | ANNECY (FRA) | ||
Nov 3, 2018 - Nov 4, 2018 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | DE POUMEYROL Oscar | 1999 | M | FRA | MEYLAN SE (FRA) | ||
2 | N | GALLAY Antoine | 2001 | M | FRA | ANNECY (FRA) | ||
3 | N | RIVET Matthias | 1999 | M | FRA | MEYLAN SE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | STACCHETTI Alexandre | 2001 | M | FRA | ANNECY (FRA) | ||
Nov 19, 2016 - Nov 20, 2016 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | DEQUENNE Pierre | 1998 | M | FRA | ORLEANS CE (FRA) | |||
2 | GAMBERONI Ugo Daniel | 1998 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | |||
3 | CHESAUX Benoit | 1997 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | |||
3 | PERROUD Adrien | 1999 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | |||
Nov 2, 2013 - Nov 3, 2013 | Circuit National Jeunesse | Châtelaine | ||||||||
1 | N | NOTZON David | 1995 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
2 | N | PFISTER Corentin | 1996 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | PERROUD Adrien | 1999 | M | SUI | CEF Founex (SUI) | ||
3 | N | SIMONA Matteo | 1995 | M | SUI |