Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jun 6, 2024 - Jun 9, 2024 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | FAZEKAS Arpad | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KUCHTA Leopold Marc | 2003 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | LANCARIC Branislav | 2006 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Sep 3, 2022 - Sep 3, 2022 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | FAZEKAS Arpad | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | GYÖRGY Bendeguz | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | PIRK Akos | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Sep 18, 2021 - Sep 19, 2021 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | GYÖRGY Bendeguz | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Jun 6, 2019 - Jun 9, 2019 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Jun 8, 2018 - Jun 10, 2018 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
Jun 2, 2017 - Jun 4, 2017 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
Jun 11, 2016 - Jun 11, 2016 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | FARKAS Attila | 1972 | M | CZE | |||
May 23, 2015 - May 23, 2015 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SIMEUNOVIC Rastislav | 1995 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
May 31, 2014 - May 31, 2014 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
May 29, 2013 - May 29, 2013 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VILEM Michal | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
Jun 10, 2012 - Jun 10, 2012 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
Jun 11, 2011 - Jun 11, 2011 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | FORGACH Peter | 1979 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | NAGY Jozef | 1966 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Jun 19, 2010 - Jun 19, 2010 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | LELKES Peter | 1984 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Jun 20, 2009 - Jun 20, 2009 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VILEM Michal | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
Jun 21, 2008 - Jun 21, 2008 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | HORONY Tamas | 1985 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | MEZEY Ladislav | 1983 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Jun 9, 2007 - Jun 9, 2007 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
Dec 29, 2006 - Dec 29, 2006 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | NAGY Jozef | 1966 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BOTLO Balint | 1985 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK David | 1975 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) |