Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jun 8, 2024 - Jun 9, 2024 | Mistrovství České republiky | Praha | ||||||||
1 | N | SOKOL BRNO | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | CACEK Matyáš | 2005 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | CACEK Simon | 2007 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | WAGNER Filip | 2005 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | KRAL Krystof | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KRAL Lumir | 2007 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | MACHAJ Vojtech | 2009 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | CACEK Krystof | 2001 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | ÁBALOS MARTINEZ Salvador | 1996 | M | ESP | |||
4 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
4 | N | SANDHU Aryan | 2003 | M | IND | |||
Jun 10, 2023 - Jun 11, 2023 | Mistrovství České republiky | Opava | ||||||||
1 | N | SOKOL BRNO | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | CACEK Krystof | 2001 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | CACEK Matyáš | 2005 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | WAGNER Filip | 2005 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | CACEK Simon | 2007 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | FOJT Alexander | 2001 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SKERLE Michal | 1983 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | KOTLAN Petr | 2002 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | KRAL Krystof | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | KRAL Lumir | 2007 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | RIEGEL PRAHA | CZE | CSK Riegel (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | BERAN Pavel | 1984 | M | CZE | CSK Riegel (CZE) | ||
4 | N | CIMLER Cestmir | 1990 | M | CZE | Bohemians Praha (CZE) | ||
4 | N | MAXA Filip | 1996 | M | CZE | Bohemians Praha (CZE) | ||
Jun 4, 2022 - Jun 5, 2022 | Mistrovství České republiky | Brno | ||||||||
1 | N | SOKOL BRNO | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | CACEK Krystof | 2001 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | CACEK Matyáš | 2005 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | DUSEK Jindrich | 1998 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KOTLAN Petr | 2002 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KRAL Krystof | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KRAL Lumir | 2007 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | REINHARD Kvetoslav | 2001 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | WAGNER Filip | 2005 | M | CZE | |||
4 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | ÁBALOS MARTINEZ Salvador | 1996 | M | ESP | |||
4 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
4 | N | SCHON Martin | 1999 | M | CZE | |||
Sep 19, 2020 - Sep 20, 2020 | Mistrovství České republiky | Praha | ||||||||
1 | N | AMU PRAHA 2 | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Bohuslav | 1952 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | SIROTA Alexander | 1975 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | POTUCEK Tomas | 2000 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | RACEK Oldrich | 1900 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SOKOL BRNO 3 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | FOJT Alexander | 2001 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | REINHARD Kvetoslav | 2001 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | ROCEK Michal | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | HOLUBEC Philip | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KOTLAN Petr | 2002 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KRAL Krystof | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
Jun 8, 2019 - Jun 9, 2019 | Mistrovství České republiky | Brno | ||||||||
1 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Bohuslav | 1952 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | SIROTA Alexander | 1975 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SOKOL BRNO 3 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | POTUCEK Tomas | 2000 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | ROCEK Michal | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | SKERLE Michal | 1983 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | RIEGEL PRAHA | CZE | CSK Riegel (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | BERAN Pavel | 1984 | M | CZE | CSK Riegel (CZE) | ||
3 | N | KUBIS Petr | 1982 | M | CZE | CSK Riegel (CZE) | ||
3 | N | RAFERT Wolfgang | 1989 | M | USA | |||
4 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | HOLUBEC Philip | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KRAL Krystof | 2004 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | REBICEK Krystof | 2003 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
Jun 2, 2018 - Jun 3, 2018 | Mistrovství České republiky | Brandys nad Labem | ||||||||
1 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | DYRSMID David | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | SKERLE Michal | 1983 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
1 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
2 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | BRODIL Radek | 1991 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | DOLEZAL Bohuslav | 1952 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
2 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | SOKOL BRNO | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | FOJTA Pavel | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | POTUCEK Tomas | 2000 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | REINHARD Kvetoslav | 2001 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | ROCEK Michal | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | DUSEK Jindrich | 1998 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | HANUS Adam | 1995 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KOTLAN Petr | 2002 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
Jun 3, 2017 - Jun 4, 2017 | Mistrovství České republiky | Praha | ||||||||
1 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | CSEPLO Jan | 1990 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
1 | N | DUSEK Jindrich | 1998 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
1 | N | FUCIK Jan | 1994 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
1 | N | LANG Jaroslav | 1988 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | BRODIL Radek | 1991 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | DOLEZAL Bohuslav | 1952 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
2 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
2 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | DYRSMID David | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SKERLE Michal | 1983 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | SRP Sasa | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
3 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | SOKOL BRNO | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | FOJTA Pavel | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KALLA Libor | 1985 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | KRATOCHVIL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
Jun 4, 2016 - Jun 5, 2016 | Mistrovství České republiky | Brno | ||||||||
1 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | BRODIL Radek | 1991 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | SIROTA Alexander | 1975 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | DUSEK Jindrich | 1998 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | FUCIK Jan | 1994 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | HANUS Adam | 1995 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
2 | N | MORAVEC Tomas | 1995 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | STARÉ MÌSTO | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | KOVARIKOVÁ Tana | 1989 | F | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||
3 | N | STULIR Vojtech | 1986 | M | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||
3 | N | TRUBACIK Michal | 1976 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | VRTAL Vlastimil | 1987 | M | CZE | |||
4 | N | SOKOL BRNO 2 | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | DYRSMID David | 1996 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | ROCEK Michal | 1977 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | SKERLE Michal | 1983 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
4 | N | WACHSBERGER Petr | 1992 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | ||
May 30, 2015 - May 31, 2015 | Mistrovství České republiky | Brno | ||||||||
1 | N | AMU PRAHA | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
1 | N | DOLEZAL Jan | 1986 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
1 | N | KURIC Miroslav | 1982 | M | CZE | |||
1 | N | SIROTA Alexander | 1975 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | STARÉ MÌSTO | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||||
2 | N | JABUREK Vojtech | 1999 | M | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||
2 | N | STULIR Vojtech | 1986 | M | CZE | SK St.Mesto (CZE) | ||
2 | N | TRUBACIK Michal | 1976 | M | CZE | |||
2 | N | VRTAL Vlastimil | 1987 | M | CZE | |||
3 | N | SK HOUSTKA | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||||
3 | N | FUCIK Jan | 1994 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | HANUS Adam | 1995 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
3 | N | PLONER Jiri | 1996 | M | CZE | SK Houstka (CZE) | ||
4 | N | AMU PRAHA 2 | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||||
4 | N | DRNEK Krystof | 1985 | M | CZE | AMU Praha (CZE) | ||
4 | N | EXNER Jan | 1978 | M | CZE | |||
4 | N | RAFERT Wolfgang | 1989 | M | USA |