Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mar 13, 2010 - Mar 14, 2010 | Weltcup | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | GANEEV Renal | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | NASSIBOULLINE Rouslan | 1981 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | SEDOV Artem | 1984 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | ZAWADA Marcin | 1981 | M | POL | ||||
Mar 14, 2009 - Mar 15, 2009 | Weltcup | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | CHEREMISINOV Alexey | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | GUYART Brice | 1981 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | GLONEK Radoslaw | 1983 | M | POL | ||||
3 | SCHLOSSER Roland | 1982 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
Mar 15, 2008 - Mar 16, 2008 | World Cup | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | GLONEK Radoslaw | 1983 | M | POL | ||||
2 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | FOCONI Alessio | 1989 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SEDOV Artem | 1984 | M | AIN | ||||
Mar 17, 2007 - Mar 18, 2007 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | MENENDEZ Javier | 1981 | M | ESP | ||||
2 | JOUBERT Terence | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | BALDINI Andrea | 1985 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | PICHON Marc | 1977 | M | BEL | ||||
May 13, 2006 - May 14, 2006 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | LEI Sheng | 1984 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | BARRERA Stefano | 1980 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | VANNINI Marco | 1976 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
3 | ZAWADA Marcin | 1981 | M | POL | ||||
May 14, 2005 - May 15, 2005 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | BALDINI Andrea | 1985 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
2 | JAULT Jerome | 1983 | M | FRA | BOURG LA REINE (FRA) | |||
3 | HUANG Liangcai | 1984 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | TAHOON Tamer Mohamed | 1977 | M | EGY | ||||
May 14, 2004 - May 16, 2004 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | CASSARA Andrea | 1984 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BIßDORF Ralf | 1971 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | WANG Haibin | 1973 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | WU Hanxiong | 1981 | M | CHN | ||||
May 16, 2003 - May 18, 2003 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | LE PECHOUX Erwann | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SANZO Salvatore | 1975 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | WANG Haibin | 1973 | M | CHN | ||||
May 17, 2002 - May 18, 2002 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | BIßDORF Ralf | 1971 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
2 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | KIELPIKOWSKI Piotr | 1962 | M | POL | ||||
3 | WEßELS André | 1981 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
May 19, 2001 - May 20, 2001 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | KRZESINSKI Adam | 1965 | M | POL | ||||
2 | SANZO Salvatore | 1975 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | GUYART Brice | 1981 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
May 20, 2000 - May 21, 2000 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | MAMEDOV Ilgar | 1965 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | FRANK Tobias | 1978 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | DONG Zhaozhi | 1973 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | GARCIA PEREZ Oscar | 1966 | M | CUB | ||||
May 22, 1999 - May 23, 1999 | Coupe du Monde | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | GARCIA PEREZ Oscar | 1966 | M | CUB | ||||
2 | WIENAND Wolfgang | 1972 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | BAYER Cliff | 1977 | M | USA | ||||
3 | TUCKER Orlando | 1971 | M | CUB | ||||
May 23, 1998 - May 24, 1998 | World Cup | Porto | ||||||||
1 | GREGORY Elvis | 1971 | M | ITA | [i] CS Roma (ITA) | |||
2 | ENDRES Thomas | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | BIßDORF Ralf | 1971 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | SANZO Salvatore | 1975 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
May 24, 1997 - May 25, 1997 | World Cup | Porto | ||||||||
1 | WIENAND Wolfgang | 1972 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2 | BEL Laurent | 1966 | M | FRA | PARIS TA (FRA) | |||
3 | BOIDIN Franck | 1972 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | GOLUBITSKY Sergei | 1969 | M | UKR |