Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sep 14, 2024 - Sep 15, 2024 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | ELG Elwin | 2007 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | PELLETTA Francesco | 2005 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | BRANDBERG Hugo | 2005 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | A | PERSSON TÖRN Caspian | 2005 | M | SWE | YFK Ystad (SWE) | ||
Sep 9, 2023 - Sep 10, 2023 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | POURMAND Nima | 2004 | M | SWE | LöFK Lidingö (SWE) | ||
2 | N | ZIMMERMAN Filip | 2008 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | ||
3 | N | BÄCKSTRÖM Ian | 2004 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | A | PERSSON TÖRN Caspian | 2005 | M | SWE | YFK Ystad (SWE) | ||
Sep 10, 2022 - Sep 11, 2022 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | KELLY Christopher | 2003 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | MALVIK Aleksander | 2005 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | BÄCKSTRÖM Ian | 2004 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | KUTTI David | 2003 | M | SWE | LöFK Lidingö (SWE) | ||
Sep 11, 2021 - Sep 12, 2021 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | MALVIK Aleksander | 2005 | M | NOR | Titan Fekteklubb (NOR) | ||
2 | N | KELLY Christopher | 2003 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | BROBAKKEN Marcus Vokes | 2002 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | KUTTI David | 2003 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | ||
Sep 7, 2019 - Sep 8, 2019 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | GEITUNG Tomas | 2000 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | NYMAN Filip | 2002 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | KELLY Christopher | 2003 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | STÅHL Gösta | 2004 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
Sep 8, 2018 - Sep 9, 2018 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | MANCEWICZ Bartlomiej | 1999 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | ||
2 | N | SVENSSON Jonathan | 1999 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | GROSSE Arthur | 2001 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | STORMARK Joergen | 1999 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | ||
Sep 16, 2017 - Sep 17, 2017 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | MANCEWICZ Bartlomiej | 1999 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | |||
3 | ALFHEIM Fabian | 1999 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | |||
3 | MATTSSON Axel | 1998 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
Sep 17, 2016 - Sep 18, 2016 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | ELIASSEN Ferdinand | 1998 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | |||
3 | MANCEWICZ Bartlomiej | 1999 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | |||
3 | STORMARK Joergen | 1999 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | |||
Sep 19, 2015 - Sep 20, 2015 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | MANCEWICZ Bartlomiej | 1999 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | |||
3 | HANSSON Rasmus | 1999 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
3 | MATTSSON Axel | 1998 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
Nov 8, 2014 - Nov 9, 2014 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | STYMNE Jakob | 1996 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | ANDERSSON Måns | 1995 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | ROSENBERG Gabriel | 1995 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
Sep 28, 2013 - Sep 29, 2013 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | JOKINEN Simon | 1995 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | ANDERSSON Måns | 1995 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | VÄGGÖ Victor | 1995 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
Nov 3, 2012 - Nov 4, 2012 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | ISLAS FLYGARE Linus | 1998 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | ANDERSSON Måns | 1995 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | GRÄSBECK Gunnar | 1993 | M | FIN | Habda Helsinki (FIN) | |||
3 | NILSSON Erik | 1996 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
Nov 5, 2011 - Nov 6, 2011 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | HAGLUND Daniel | 1994 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | BERG NIEMELÄ Elias | 1996 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | DOWNES Adam | 1992 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | HAGLUND Andreas | 1992 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
Sep 4, 2010 - Sep 5, 2010 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | KASE Robin | 1992 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | JOHNSSON Fredrik | 1992 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | JÖNSSON Andreas | 1991 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | PYK Karl | 1992 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
Sep 26, 2009 - Sep 27, 2009 | Uppsala Cup - Nordic Championships | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | KARLSSON Philip | 1990 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | DOWNES Adam | 1992 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | ROSLANDER Kasper | 1992 | M | FIN | Habda Helsinki (FIN) | |||
3 | SEEVE Teemu | 1992 | M | FIN | Turun Miekkailijat (FIN) | |||
Sep 13, 2008 - Sep 14, 2008 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | JÖNSSON Andreas | 1991 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | FRANCK Karl | 1989 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
3 | KARLSSON Philip | 1990 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | SAMUELSSON Anton | 1990 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
Sep 22, 2007 - Sep 23, 2007 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | SEEVE Teemu | 1992 | M | FIN | Turun Miekkailijat (FIN) | |||
2 | VONEN Joakim | 1990 | M | NOR | Bergens FK (NOR) | |||
3 | HILLESTAD Ludvig | 1988 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | |||
3 | LAHTINEN Alexander | 1991 | M | FIN | Helsingin Miekkailijat (FIN) | |||
Sep 16, 2006 - Sep 17, 2006 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | STIESSEL Adrian | 1987 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | BERGDAHL Erik | 1988 | M | SWE | A6 Jönköping (SWE) | ||
3 | N | VON PLATEN Philip | 1988 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | ||
3 | N | WIKENBORG Jens | 1988 | M | SWE | |||
Sep 3, 2005 - Sep 4, 2005 | Uppsala Cup | Uppsala | ||||||||
1 | N | KRAMARICS Zoltan Michael | 1986 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | SVALHEIM Anders | 1988 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | STIESSEL Adrian | 1987 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | LINDQVIST Joakim | 1989 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) |