Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2024 - May 26, 2024 | Malmö International - Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | N | GILFILLAN Gregor Duncan | 1974 | M | GBR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | KIRSCHEN Uwe | 1967 | M | GER | SC Berlin (GER) | ||
3 | N | ASHRAFI Ehsan | 1973 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
Jun 3, 2023 - Jun 4, 2023 | Malmö International | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | N | DANIELSON Martin | 1968 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | ||
2 | N | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
3 | N | KRETSCHMER Jan | 1971 | M | SWE | AFF Göteborg (SWE) | ||
3 | N | SALTER Duncan | 1972 | M | GBR | Brian Boru FC (IRL) | ||
Jun 4, 2022 - Jun 5, 2022 | Malmö International | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | N | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
2 | N | CHRISTENSEN Stig | 1965 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | FRIGYESI Attila | 1971 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | ||
3 | N | SALTER Duncan | 1972 | M | GBR | Brian Boru FC (IRL) | ||
Sep 4, 2021 - Sep 5, 2021 | Malmö International - Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | N | DANIELSON Martin | 1968 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | ||
2 | N | SJÖDAHL Fredrik | 1963 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | ||
3 | N | FRIGYESI Attila | 1971 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | ||
3 | N | HINZ Gerald | 1965 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | ||
Jun 8, 2019 - Jun 9, 2019 | Malmö International | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | N | HINZ Gerald | 1965 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | ||
2 | N | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
3 | N | CHRISTENSEN Stig | 1965 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | TIVENIUS Jan | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
Jun 2, 2018 - Jun 3, 2018 | Malmö International | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
2 | TIVENIUS Jan | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | GOUGH Robert-David | 1964 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | |||
3 | SJÖDAHL Fredrik | 1963 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
Jun 3, 2017 - Jun 4, 2017 | Malmö International - Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
2 | OXENSTIERNA Alexander | 1961 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | ARONOWITSCH Niklas | 1962 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | LUIHN Fredrik | 1966 | M | NOR | Affekt FK (NOR) | |||
May 28, 2016 - May 29, 2016 | Malmö International-Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | SJÖDAHL Fredrik | 1963 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
2 | CHRISTENSEN Stig | 1965 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
3 | RENNER Daniel | 1965 | M | GER | Fechtakademie Ravensburg (GER) | |||
3 | ZANDER Anders | 1964 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
May 30, 2015 - May 31, 2015 | Malmö International - Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | NAVASARDIAN Armen | 1962 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
2 | VAN DEN BERG Paul | 1962 | M | NED | s.v. M.V.O. (NED) | |||
3 | ENGSTRÖM Urban | 1958 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | WIKSTRÖM Ulf | 1958 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
May 31, 2014 - Jun 1, 2014 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | WIKSTRÖM Ulf | 1958 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
2 | ELFVERSON Göran | 1955 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | ÅSTRÖM Lennart | 1963 | M | SWE | ARA Helsingborg (SWE) | |||
3 | SJÖDAHL Fredrik | 1963 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
Jun 1, 2013 - Jun 2, 2013 | Ystad International | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | N | WIKSTRÖM Ulf | 1958 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | ||
2 | N | TIVENIUS Jan | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | ||
3 | N | ÅSTRÖM Lennart | 1963 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
3 | N | NAVASARDIAN Armen | 1962 | M | SWE | |||
Jun 9, 2012 - Jun 10, 2012 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | TIVENIUS Jan | 1961 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | FALCK-YTTER Jan | 1961 | M | NOR | SV Esslingen (GER) | |||
3 | ELFVERSON Göran | 1955 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | WIKSTRÖM Ulf | 1958 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
Jun 18, 2011 - Jun 19, 2011 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | POSNOV Alexander | 1952 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | HÅRLEMAN Johan | 1953 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
3 | ENGSTRÖM Urban | 1958 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | JÖNSSON Håkan | 1956 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
Jun 19, 2010 - Jun 20, 2010 | Ystad International | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | KHAVIN Vladimir | 1954 | M | RUS | SKA St. Petersburg (RUS) | |||
2 | UIJTING Henk | 1953 | M | NED | s.v. Scaramouche (NED) | |||
3 | BENSON Lennart | 1956 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | POSNOV Alexander | 1952 | M | RUS | ||||
Jun 13, 2009 - Jun 14, 2009 | Ystad International | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | KARASEV Valery | 1954 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | N | BEL Erik R. | 1952 | M | NED | |||
3 | BENSON Lennart | 1956 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | KHAVIN Vladimir | 1954 | M | RUS | SKA St. Petersburg (RUS) | |||
Jun 14, 2008 - Jun 15, 2008 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | SCHARPFF Lars | 1949 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | BEEKHUIZEN Gerrit | 1949 | M | NED | Koninklijke Militaire Scherm Vereniging (NED) | |||
3 | JORFALD Knut | 1948 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | |||
Jun 2, 2007 - Jun 3, 2007 | Ystad International | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | KHAVIN Vladimir | 1954 | M | RUS | SKA St. Petersburg (RUS) | |||
2 | SCHARPFF Lars | 1949 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | KARASEV Valery | 1954 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | MERKY Thomas | 1953 | M | SUI | AFCB Bern (SUI) | |||
Jun 17, 2006 - Jun 18, 2006 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | SCHARPFF Lars | 1949 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | MERKY Thomas | 1953 | M | SUI | AFCB Bern (SUI) | |||
3 | RUGHEIMER Iain | 1953 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | STEFFENSEN Joern | 1944 | M | DEN | [i] HMF Helsingør (DEN) | |||
Jun 18, 2005 - Jun 19, 2005 | Ystad International - Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | SCHARPFF Lars | 1949 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | CARS Hans Christian | 1939 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
3 | BLAKSTEEN Peter | 1954 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
3 | RUGHEIMER Iain | 1953 | M | GBR | ||||
4 | BLAGOEV Ivan | 1954 | M | FIN | Kalpaveljet (FIN) |