Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nov 13, 2021 - Nov 14, 2021 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | N | BLASCHKA Robert | 1958 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
2 | N | FALLWICKL Armin | 1956 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
3 | N | KAINZ Ernst | 1959 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
May 11, 2019 - May 12, 2019 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Salzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | BARTLING Renaldo | 1959 | M | GER | SV Medizin Bautzen (GER) | ||
2 | N | ZYLKA Henryk | 1955 | M | GER | TG Landshut (GER) | ||
3 | N | GRABNER Karol | 1954 | M | SLO | SK Olimpija (SLO) | ||
4 | N | KOLLAR Gabriel | 1952 | M | SVK | |||
Apr 28, 2018 - Apr 29, 2018 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | BLASCHKA Robert | 1958 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
2 | FALLWICKL Armin | 1956 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | LANGE Wieland | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
3 | ZYLKA Henryk | 1955 | M | GER | TG Landshut (GER) | |||
May 6, 2017 - May 7, 2017 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Salzburg | ||||||||
1 | KOLLAR Gabriel | 1952 | M | SVK | ||||
2 | FALLWICKL Armin | 1956 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | EGGER Gerhard | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
4 | LANGE Wieland | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
Apr 30, 2016 - May 1, 2016 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | HRUBESCH Andreas | 1956 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | FALLWICKL Armin | 1956 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
May 3, 2014 - May 4, 2014 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | VETULANI Zygmunt | 1950 | M | POL | ||||
May 4, 2013 - May 5, 2013 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Salzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | EGGER Gerhard | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | ||
Sep 16, 2012 - Sep 16, 2012 | Österreichische Veteranen Meisterschaft | Wien | ||||||||
1 | LANGE Wieland | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
Nov 5, 2011 - Nov 6, 2011 | Österreichische Meisterschaft Senioren | Wien | ||||||||
1 | LANGE Wieland | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
Nov 6, 2010 - Nov 7, 2010 | Österreichische Meisterschaft Senioren | Wien | ||||||||
1 | POSCHARNIG Josef | 1941 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | OTTENDORFER Herbert | 1941 | M | AUT | FUW Wien (AUT) | |||
Mar 21, 2009 - Mar 22, 2009 | Österreichische Meisterschaft Senioren | Villach | ||||||||
1 | MAIER Walter | 1940 | M | AUT | ATUS Weiz (AUT) | |||
2 | OTTENDORFER Herbert | 1941 | M | AUT | FUW Wien (AUT) | |||
Mar 27, 2004 - Mar 28, 2004 | Int. Österreichische Meisterschaft | Vöcklabruck | ||||||||
1 | POSCHARNIG Josef | 1941 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | MAIER Walter | 1940 | M | AUT | ATUS Weiz (AUT) | |||
3 | OTTENDORFER Herbert | 1941 | M | AUT | FUW Wien (AUT) | |||
4 | ESSER Karl-Heinz | 1938 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
Jul 12, 2003 - Jul 13, 2003 | Int. Österreichische Meisterschaft | Vöcklabruck | ||||||||
1 | ESSER Karl-Heinz | 1938 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
2 | POSCHARNIG Josef | 1941 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
3 | MAIER Walter | 1940 | M | AUT | ATUS Weiz (AUT) | |||
4 | KONNES Manfred | 1940 | M | GER | Eintracht Duisburg (GER) |