Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Apr 12, 2024 - Apr 20, 2024 | World Championships | Riyadh | ||||||||
1 | N | ABDUKARIMBEKOV Sardor | 2007 | M | UZB | |||
2 | N | URAKBOEV Alpamis | 2007 | M | UZB | |||
3 | N | KAWAHARA Motoki | 2007 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | KIM Doyeon | 2007 | M | KOR | |||
Apr 1, 2023 - Apr 12, 2023 | World Championships | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | N | MORRILL William | 2006 | M | USA | |||
2 | N | DENKIEWICZ Benedykt | 2006 | M | POL | |||
3 | N | CHON Taylor | 2006 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | HESHAM Ahmed | 2006 | M | EGY | |||
Apr 2, 2022 - Apr 10, 2022 | World Championships | Dubai | ||||||||
1 | N | KODIROV Zuhriddin | 2006 | M | UZB | |||
2 | N | HEATHCOCK Colin | 2005 | M | USA | TSG Eislingen (GER) | ||
3 | N | JI Cody Walter | 2006 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | MORRILL William | 2006 | M | USA | |||
Apr 3, 2021 - Apr 11, 2021 | World Championships | Cairo | ||||||||
1 | N | SOVAR Marco | 2004 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | ||
2 | N | PARK Junseong | 2004 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | HARLEY Colby | 2004 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | SHELEKHOV Arseniy | 2004 | M | AIN | |||
Apr 6, 2019 - Apr 14, 2019 | World Championships | Torun | ||||||||
1 | N | HUMEN Vasyl | 2002 | M | UKR | KIEW (UKR) | ||
2 | N | MARCIANO Giorgio | 2002 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | LEE Dohun | 2002 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | PARK Donghwan | 2002 | M | USA | |||
Apr 1, 2018 - Apr 10, 2018 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Verona | ||||||||
1 | PASTIN Andrei | 2001 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
2 | VIDOVSZKY Robert | 2001 | M | USA | ||||
3 | RABB Krisztian | 2001 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
3 | SANTAMARIA Alonso | 2001 | M | ESP | CEB-M (ESP) | |||
Apr 1, 2017 - Apr 10, 2017 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | ACAR Ibrahim Ahmed | 2000 | M | TUR | Ankara Kilic GSK (TUR) | |||
2 | WALKER Christopher | 2001 | M | USA | ||||
3 | LIM Jaeyoon | 2000 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | PRESNOV Nikita | 2000 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 1, 2016 - Apr 10, 2016 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Bourges | ||||||||
1 | NERI Matteo | 1999 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | CAI Erwin | 1999 | M | USA | ||||
3 | POZDNYAKOV Vladislav | 1999 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | TSELYSHEV Artem | 1999 | M | AIN | ||||
Apr 1, 2015 - Apr 9, 2015 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Tashkent | ||||||||
1 | KIM Dongju | 1998 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | LOKHANOV Konstantin | 1998 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | ARPINO Alberto | 1998 | M | ITA | [i] SAL Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | NERI Matteo | 1999 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 3, 2014 - Apr 12, 2014 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | ILYIN Ivan | 1997 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | GIAKOUMATOS Marios | 1997 | M | GRE | ILYSIAKOS A.O. (GRE) | |||
3 | LOKHANOV Konstantin | 1998 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | METRYKA Karol | 1997 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 6, 2013 - Apr 15, 2013 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Porec | ||||||||
1 | VORONOV Kostiantyn | 1996 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
2 | NOVIKAU Artsiom | 1996 | M | BLR | ||||
3 | GERT Eduard | 1996 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | LECCI Marco | 1996 | M | ITA | [i] Societa Varesina (ITA) | |||
Mar 31, 2012 - Apr 8, 2012 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Moscow | ||||||||
1 | JUNG Jaeseung | 1995 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | MACKIEWICZ Andrew | 1995 | M | USA | ||||
3 | DANILENKO Dmitriy | 1995 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | KOCH Domenik | 1995 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
Mar 26, 2011 - Apr 6, 2011 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Mer Morte | ||||||||
1 | CHUNG Hojin | 1994 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | AFFEDE Leonardo | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MARDALEISHVILI Mikheil | 1994 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
Apr 3, 2010 - Apr 4, 2010 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Baku | ||||||||
1 | HÜBERS Richard | 1993 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
2 | KINDLER Maximilian | 1993 | M | GER | TSG Eislingen (GER) | |||
3 | AFFEDE Leonardo | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | OKUNEV Artur | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 5, 2009 - Apr 6, 2009 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Belfast | ||||||||
1 | IBRAGIMOV Kamil | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | WILLAU Mathias | 1992 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | STATSENKO Yevgeniy | 1992 | M | UKR | KIEW (UKR) | |||
3 | VALKAI Ferenc | 1992 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | |||
Apr 6, 2008 - Apr 7, 2008 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Acireale | ||||||||
1 | PUY Sebestyen | 1991 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | NUCCIO Riccardo | 1991 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | KIM Junghyun | 1991 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | MARINARI Niccolo | 1991 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 13, 2007 - Apr 14, 2007 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Belek | ||||||||
1 | SAVICH Boris | 1990 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
3 | COUTURIER Vincent | 1990 | M | CAN | ||||
3 | HOMER Daryl | 1990 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 9, 2006 - Apr 10, 2006 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Taeback City | ||||||||
1 | GU Bongil | 1989 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | YOO Chang-Seok | 1989 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | DAVIDSON Raskyrie | 1989 | M | USA | ||||
3 | MARINO Fabrizio | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
Mar 23, 2005 - Mar 24, 2005 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Linz | ||||||||
1 | OCONNELL Alexander | 1988 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | KUKSA Anton | 1988 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | KANG Min Goo | 1988 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | LALLEMENT Thimothee | 1988 | M | FRA | PAU SECTION (FRA) | |||
Apr 1, 2004 - Apr 2, 2004 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | SAMELE Luigi | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | KALYNSIY Vasyl | 1987 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | NEIGER Antoine | 1987 | M | FRA | BOURGES ESC (FRA) | |||
3 | PREVENIOS Marinos | 1987 | M | GRE | ATHINAIKI LESHI (GRE) | |||
Apr 4, 2003 - Apr 13, 2003 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Trapani | ||||||||
1 | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
2 | CECI Claudio | 1987 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | GEMESI Csanad | 1986 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | |||
3 | MAKSIMOV Yvgen | 1986 | M | UKR | ||||
Apr 1, 2002 - Apr 2, 2002 | World Championships Cadets/Junios | Antalya | ||||||||
1 | TRICARICO Marco | 1985 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BOGHICEV Franz | 1985 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
3 | AGENO Riccardo | 1985 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | CLEMENT Luther | 1985 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 9, 2001 - Apr 10, 2001 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Gdansk | ||||||||
1 | MARTIN Clement | 1984 | M | FRA | ORLEANS CE (FRA) | |||
2 | HAGAMEN Timothy | 1984 | M | USA | ||||
3 | PALASZ Patryk | 1984 | M | POL | ||||
3 | SHTURBABIN Oleh | 1984 | M | UKR | ||||
Apr 18, 2000 - Apr 19, 2000 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | South Bend | ||||||||
1 | MARTIN Clement | 1984 | M | FRA | ORLEANS CE (FRA) | |||
2 | OLEJNIK Bartlomiej | 1983 | M | POL | ||||
3 | CATALETA Alberto | 1983 | M | ITA | [i] CSFG (ITA) | |||
3 | ROGERS Jason | 1983 | M | USA | ||||
Mar 30, 1999 - Apr 5, 1999 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | BEDEL Simon | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | ANSTETT Vincent | 1982 | M | FRA | SOUFFELWEYE (FRA) | |||
3 | PARKER Colin | 1982 | M | USA | ||||
3 | SHKALIKOV Sergiy | 1982 | M | UKR | ||||
Apr 6, 1998 - Apr 13, 1998 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Valencia | ||||||||
1 | GUIDI Giacomo | 1982 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | GRIMM Matthias | 1981 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | DECSI Tamas | 1982 | M | HUN | Kondorosi Vívók Sportegyesület (HUN) | |||
3 | LEE Ivan | 1981 | M | USA | ||||
Mar 25, 1997 - Mar 31, 1997 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Teneriffa | ||||||||
1 | BAUER Dennis | 1980 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
2 | NARANJO CASTILLO Yunior al | 1980 | M | CUB | ||||
3 | LENGYEL Balazs | 1980 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | SZELLE Gabor | 1980 | M | HUN | ||||
Apr 2, 1996 - Apr 3, 1996 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Tournai | ||||||||
1 | SURIMTO Alexandre | 1979 | M | BLR | ||||
2 | GAZIN Fabrice | 1979 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CAGNONI Alessandro | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SANDONA Mirko | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 11, 1995 - Apr 16, 1995 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Paris | ||||||||
1 | MARFFY Geza | 1978 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | KRAUS Christian | 1978 | M | GER | TSG Eislingen (GER) | |||
3 | ARGYELAN Gabor | 1978 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | DIATCHENKO Alexei | 1978 | M | RUS | ||||
Mar 27, 1994 - Mar 28, 1994 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Mexico | ||||||||
1 | DECSI Andras | 1977 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | VERGNE Philippe | 1978 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | LASKER Terrence | 1977 | M | USA | ||||
3 | TOMCZAK Maciej | 1977 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 7, 1993 - Apr 8, 1993 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Denver | ||||||||
1 | CASTRUCCI COTICHINI Giovanni | 1976 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | PASTORE Giampiero | 1976 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | LITWINSKI Maciej | 1976 | M | POL | ||||
3 | NIKOLAJEV Dimitri | 1976 | M | RUS | ||||
May 27, 1992 - May 28, 1992 | World Championships Cadets | Bonn | ||||||||
1 | FERJANCSIK Domonkos | 1975 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | CHARRON Herve | 1975 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | PASTORE Giampiero | 1976 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | PIGULA Tomasz | 1975 | M | POL | ||||
May 7, 1991 - May 8, 1991 | World Championships Cadets | Foggia | ||||||||
1 | COUSIN Gildas | 1976 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | PASTORE Domenico | 1974 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | EGOROV Viktor | 1977 | M | KAZ | ||||
4 | SIESTO Marco | 1974 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 28, 1990 - Apr 29, 1990 | World Championships Cadets | Göteborg | ||||||||
1 | GILMAN Dariusz | 1973 | M | POL | ||||
2 | LEHMANN Eero | 1974 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | AMAYA CAMEJO Candido Alberto | 1973 | M | CUB | ||||
4 | ALFONSO Francisco | 1900 | M | CUB | ||||
May 13, 1989 - May 14, 1989 | World Championships Cadets | Lissabon | ||||||||
1 | LOMBARDO Ivan | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | KÖRMÖCZI Gabor | 1972 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | STARK Patrick | 1972 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
4 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 30, 1988 - May 1, 1988 | Championnats du Monde Cadets | Cabries | ||||||||
1 | BATOVSZKY Zoltan | 1971 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | SIROVICH Giovannimaria | 1971 | M | ITA | [i] Fiame Oro Rom (ITA) | |||
3 | WISZKIDENSZKY Marton | 1971 | M | HUN | ||||
4 | YIOU Christian | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
Apr 3, 1987 - Apr 4, 1987 | World Championships Cadets | Tel Aviv | ||||||||
1 | BOROS Gyorgy | 1971 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | CASELLA Carmine | 1970 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SIROVICH Giovannimaria | 1971 | M | ITA | [i] Fiame Oro Rom (ITA) | |||
4 | HUCHWAJDA Michael | 1970 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) |