Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jun 10, 2018 - Jun 10, 2018 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | WÖRLE Gert | 1964 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | |||
2 | LINK Michael | 1961 | M | GER | Wiesbadener FC (GER) | |||
3 | BENNER Michael | 1962 | M | GER | TV Dillenburg (GER) | |||
Jul 2, 2017 - Jul 2, 2017 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | BEDEROW Michael | 1961 | M | GER | DFC Düsseldorf (GER) | |||
2 | WÖRLE Gert | 1964 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | |||
3 | BENNER Michael | 1962 | M | GER | TV Dillenburg (GER) | |||
Apr 24, 2016 - Apr 24, 2016 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | LINK Michael | 1961 | M | GER | Wiesbadener FC (GER) | |||
2 | BENNER Michael | 1962 | M | GER | TV Dillenburg (GER) | |||
3 | MAYSAMI Mahmoud | 1965 | M | GER | Duisburger FK (GER) | |||
May 3, 2015 - May 3, 2015 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | BEDEROW Michael | 1961 | M | GER | DFC Düsseldorf (GER) | |||
2 | KIND Andreas | 1962 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
3 | BENNER Michael | 1962 | M | GER | TV Dillenburg (GER) | |||
Jun 22, 2014 - Jun 22, 2014 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | BEDEROW Michael | 1961 | M | GER | DFC Düsseldorf (GER) | |||
2 | BENNER Michael | 1962 | M | GER | TV Dillenburg (GER) | |||
May 20, 2012 - May 20, 2012 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | FÖRSTER Titus | 1957 | M | GER | TG Dörnigheim (GER) | |||
2 | LEIPERTZ Alfred | 1956 | M | GER | Eintracht Duisburg (GER) | |||
3 | KIND Andreas | 1962 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
May 15, 2011 - May 15, 2011 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | BABILAS Wolfgang | 1952 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
May 18, 2008 - May 19, 2008 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | GRÜTZNER Olaf | 1956 | M | GER | Hasper FC (GER) | |||
2 | BABILAS Wolfgang | 1952 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
3 | BURGHARDT Ulrich | 1957 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
May 26, 2001 - May 27, 2001 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | SCHOLZ Jürgen | 1947 | M | GER | Pulheimer SC (GER) | |||
May 27, 2000 - May 28, 2000 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | SCHOLZ Jürgen | 1947 | M | GER | Pulheimer SC (GER) | |||
2 | HAHN Wolfgang | 1940 | M | GER | OFC Castrop-Rauxel (GER) | |||
May 1, 1998 - May 1, 1998 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | BRÄHLER Günter | 1944 | M | GER | ||||
Jun 7, 1997 - Jun 8, 1997 | Castroper Husar | Castrop-Rauxel | ||||||||
1 | SCHUH Horst | 1941 | M | GER | [i] TUS Chlodwig Zülpich (GER) | |||
2 | KULIGK Norbert | 1900 | M | GER | ||||
3 | SCHOLZ Jürgen | 1947 | M | GER | Pulheimer SC (GER) |