Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2024 - May 19, 2024 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | N | PATRICE Sebastien | 2000 | M | FRA | GEMENOS (FRA) | ||
2 | N | HA Hansol | 1993 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | MORRILL William | 2006 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | NERI Matteo | 1999 | M | ITA | Centro Sportivo Carabinieri (ITA) | ||
May 12, 2023 - May 14, 2023 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | N | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | ||
2 | N | NUCCIO Riccardo | 1991 | M | ITA | Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | ||
3 | N | BERRÈ Enrico | 1992 | M | ITA | Gruppo Scherma Fiamme Gialle (ITA) | ||
3 | N | PIANFETTI Maxime | 1999 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | ||
May 6, 2022 - May 8, 2022 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | N | OH Sanguk | 1996 | M | KOR | |||
2 | N | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | ||
3 | N | KIM Junghwan | 1983 | M | KOR | |||
May 10, 2019 - May 12, 2019 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | N | HARTUNG Max | 1989 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | ||
2 | N | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
3 | N | KIM Junho | 1994 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | OH Sanguk | 1996 | M | KOR | |||
May 18, 2018 - May 20, 2018 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | BERRÈ Enrico | 1992 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | RESHETNIKOV Veniamin | 1986 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | HOMER Daryl | 1990 | M | USA | ||||
3 | OH Sanguk | 1996 | M | KOR | ||||
May 19, 2017 - May 21, 2017 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | HARTUNG Max | 1989 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
2 | DERSHWITZ Eli | 1995 | M | USA | ||||
3 | SZATMARI Andras | 1993 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
3 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
May 13, 2016 - May 15, 2016 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | ANSTETT Vincent | 1982 | M | FRA | SOUFFELWEYE (FRA) | |||
2 | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
3 | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | KIM Junghwan | 1983 | M | KOR | ||||
May 1, 2015 - May 3, 2015 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | GU Bongil | 1989 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | IBRAGIMOV Kamil | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | DOLNICEANU Tiberiu | 1988 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | HARTUNG Max | 1989 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
Feb 7, 2014 - Feb 9, 2014 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | KIM Junghwan | 1983 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | GEMESI Csanad | 1986 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | |||
3 | DOLNICEANU Tiberiu | 1988 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | OCCHIUZZI Diego | 1981 | M | ITA | ||||
Feb 8, 2013 - Feb 10, 2013 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | CASARES Fernando | 1980 | M | ESP | ||||
2 | RESHETNIKOV Veniamin | 1986 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | LIMBACH Nicolas | 1985 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
May 11, 2012 - May 13, 2012 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | LIMBACH Nicolas | 1985 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
2 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | DUMITRESCU Rares | 1983 | M | ROU | ||||
3 | MONTANO Aldo | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
May 13, 2011 - May 15, 2011 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | PILLET Julien | 1977 | M | FRA | STRASBOURG UC (FRA) | |||
3 | MONTANO Aldo | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | WON Woo Young | 1982 | M | KOR | ||||
May 21, 2010 - May 22, 2010 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | OH Eunseok | 1983 | M | KOR | ||||
2 | GU Bongil | 1989 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | MONTANO Aldo | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
May 23, 2009 - May 24, 2009 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | DUMITRESCU Rares | 1983 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | NEMCSIK Zsolt | 1977 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
3 | MARTI Jaime | 1979 | M | ESP | ||||
3 | MOREHOUSE Timothy | 1978 | M | USA | ||||
May 23, 2008 - May 24, 2008 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | DUMITRESCU Rares | 1983 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | MARTI Jaime | 1979 | M | ESP | ||||
3 | DECSI Tamas | 1982 | M | HUN | Kondorosi Vívók Sportegyesület (HUN) | |||
3 | KOVALEV Nikolay | 1986 | M | RUS | ||||
May 25, 2007 - May 27, 2007 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | ANSTETT Vincent | 1982 | M | FRA | SOUFFELWEYE (FRA) | |||
3 | LOPEZ Nicolas | 1980 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
3 | MONTANO Aldo | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
May 5, 2006 - May 7, 2006 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | NEMCSIK Zsolt | 1977 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | LIMBACH Nicolas | 1985 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | LOPEZ Nicolas | 1980 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
3 | MARTI Jaime | 1979 | M | ESP | ||||
May 7, 2005 - May 8, 2005 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | SANSON Boris | 1980 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | LUKASHENKO Vladimir | 1980 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | PILLET Julien | 1977 | M | FRA | STRASBOURG UC (FRA) | |||
May 7, 2004 - May 9, 2004 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SANSON Boris | 1980 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | TOUYA Damien | 1975 | M | FRA | ||||
May 9, 2003 - May 11, 2003 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | SMART Keeth | 1978 | M | USA | ||||
2 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | COVALIU Mihai | 1977 | M | ROU | ||||
3 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
May 10, 2002 - May 11, 2002 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | CHEN Feng | 1981 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | HUANG Yaojiang | 1982 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | DARVISHIJANI Parviz | 1981 | M | IRI | ||||
3 | ZHAO Chunsheng | 1977 | M | CHN | ||||
May 12, 2001 - May 13, 2001 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | PINA Jorge | 1977 | M | ESP | ||||
2 | KALUZHNIY Vladimir | 1972 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | LEE Ivan | 1981 | M | USA | ||||
3 | MEDINA Fernando | 1973 | M | ESP | ||||
May 13, 2000 - May 14, 2000 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | FERJANCSIK Domonkos | 1975 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | FROSIN Aleksey | 1978 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | KOTHNY Wiradech | 1979 | M | THA | ||||
May 15, 1999 - May 16, 1999 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MEDINA Fernando | 1973 | M | ESP | ||||
3 | TOUYA Gael | 1973 | M | FRA | ||||
May 16, 1998 - May 18, 1997 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | JASKOT Norbert | 1971 | M | POL | ||||
2 | NAVARETTE Jozsef | 1965 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | SOBALA Marcin | 1971 | M | POL | ||||
3 | SZNAJDER Rafal | 1972 | M | POL | ||||
May 17, 1997 - May 19, 1997 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | TOUYA Damien | 1975 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CASERTA Raffaello | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | TOUYA Gael | 1973 | M | FRA | ||||
May 18, 1996 - May 20, 1996 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
2 | NAVARETTE Jozsef | 1965 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | CHARIKOV Serguei | 1974 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | WIESINGER Steffen | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
May 20, 1995 - May 22, 1995 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | KIRIENKO Grigory | 1965 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | TERENZI Tonhi | 1969 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
3 | NAVARETTE Jozsef | 1965 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | WIESINGER Steffen | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
May 21, 1994 - May 22, 1994 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | TERENZI Tonhi | 1969 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
2 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
3 | DUCHEIX Franck | 1962 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | KIRIENKO Grigory | 1965 | M | RUS | ||||
May 23, 1993 - May 24, 1993 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | MARIN Marco | 1963 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SCALZO Giovanni | 1959 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
3 | MEGLIO Ferdinando | 1959 | M | ITA | ||||
Oct 19, 1991 - Oct 19, 1991 | Villa de Madrid | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | SCALZO Giovanni | 1959 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | KOEVES Csaba | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | ABAY Peter | 1962 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | GARCIA HERNANDEZ Antonio | 1964 | M | ESP |