Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feb 12, 2010 - Feb 13, 2010 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | BAO Yingying | 1983 | F | CHN | ||||
2 | ZAGUNIS Mariel | 1985 | F | USA | ||||
3 | DYACHENKO Ekaterina | 1987 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
Feb 12, 2009 - Feb 13, 2009 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | KHARLAN Olga | 1990 | F | UKR | ||||
2 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | BIANCO Ilaria | 1980 | F | ITA | ||||
3 | TAN Xue | 1984 | F | CHN | ||||
Feb 16, 2008 - Feb 17, 2008 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | DYACHENKO Ekaterina | 1987 | F | RUS | ||||
2 | KIM Keum Hwa | 1982 | F | KOR | ||||
3 | KHARLAN Olga | 1990 | F | UKR | ||||
3 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
Feb 16, 2007 - Feb 17, 2007 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | TAN Xue | 1984 | F | CHN | ||||
2 | NETCHAEVA Elena | 1979 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | CSABA Edina Diana | 1979 | F | HUN | Budavári BSE (HUN) | |||
3 | MARZOCCA Gioia | 1979 | F | ITA | ||||
Mar 17, 2006 - Mar 18, 2006 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | DYACHENKO Ekaterina | 1987 | F | RUS | ||||
2 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | JOZWIAK Bogna | 1983 | F | POL | ||||
3 | TOUYA Anne-Lise | 1981 | F | FRA | MARQUISAT (FRA) | |||
Mar 19, 2005 - Mar 20, 2005 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | MARZOCCA Gioia | 1979 | F | ITA | ||||
2 | SHELTON Aleksandra | 1982 | F | USA | AZS AWF Warszawa (POL) | |||
3 | PERRUS Leonore | 1984 | F | FRA | ||||
3 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
Mar 20, 2004 - Mar 21, 2004 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | NETCHAEVA Elena | 1979 | F | RUS | ||||
2 | VELIKAYA Sofya | 1985 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | GHEORGHITOAIA Catalina | 1975 | F | ROU | ||||
3 | TOUYA Anne-Lise | 1981 | F | FRA | MARQUISAT (FRA) | |||
Dec 21, 2002 - Dec 23, 2002 | Sabre de Moscou | Moscou | ||||||||
1 | NETCHAEVA Elena | 1979 | F | RUS | ||||
2 | JACOBSON Sada | 1983 | F | USA | ||||
3 | FEDORKINA Ekaterina | 1983 | F | RUS | ||||
3 | PERRUS Leonore | 1984 | F | FRA |