Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Apr 12, 2024 - Apr 20, 2024 | World Championships | Riyadh | ||||||||
1 | N | FUKUDA Ryosuke | 2004 | M | JPN | |||
2 | N | SOSNOV David | 2006 | M | GBR | ZFW Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | CHAGNON Eliot | 2004 | M | FRA | MEUNG LOIRE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | KUMBLA Samarth | 2004 | M | USA | |||
Apr 1, 2023 - Apr 12, 2023 | World Championships | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | N | DI VEROLI Damiano | 2003 | M | ITA | Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | ||
2 | N | ZENG Zhaoran | 2004 | M | CHN | |||
3 | N | KUMBLA Samarth | 2004 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | SZEMES Gergo | 2003 | M | HUN | Kunszentmiklósi Vivóegylet (HUN) | ||
Apr 2, 2022 - Apr 10, 2022 | World Championships | Dubai | ||||||||
1 | N | IIMURA Kazuki | 2003 | M | JPN | |||
2 | N | AN Hyeonbhin | 2004 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | ANANE Anas | 2004 | M | FRA | |||
3 | N | EMMER Chase | 2004 | M | USA | |||
Apr 3, 2021 - Apr 11, 2021 | World Championships | Cairo | ||||||||
1 | N | KOZLOV Zakhar | 2003 | M | AIN | Start St. Petersburg (RUS) | ||
2 | N | CHOI Dongyun | 2002 | M | KOR | |||
3 | N | MARTYNOVICH Stepan | 2003 | M | RUS | |||
3 | N | ROGER Constant | 2001 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | ||
Apr 6, 2019 - Apr 14, 2019 | World Championships | Torun | ||||||||
1 | N | BORODACHEV Kirill | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
2 | N | MYLNIKOV Vladislav | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
3 | N | FUJIKURA Rui | 1999 | M | JPN | |||
3 | N | HAMZA Mohamed | 2000 | M | EGY | |||
Apr 1, 2018 - Apr 10, 2018 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Verona | ||||||||
1 | ITKIN Nick | 1999 | M | USA | ||||
2 | MARINI Tommaso | 2000 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | KUMBLA Sidarth | 1998 | M | USA | ||||
3 | SEMENYUK Grigoriy | 1998 | M | AIN | ||||
Apr 1, 2017 - Apr 10, 2017 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | CHEUNG Ka Long | 1997 | M | HKG | ||||
2 | SAITO Toshiya | 1997 | M | JPN | ||||
3 | AKHMETOV Iskander | 1997 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | BIANCHI Guillaume | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 1, 2016 - Apr 10, 2016 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Bourges | ||||||||
1 | SHIKINE Takahiro | 1997 | M | JPN | ||||
2 | MATVEEV Andrey | 1996 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | BIANCHI Guillaume | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MATSUYAMA Kyosuke | 1996 | M | JPN | ||||
Apr 1, 2015 - Apr 9, 2015 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Tashkent | ||||||||
1 | ROSATELLI Damiano | 1995 | M | ITA | [i] CS ARICCIA (ITA) | |||
2 | INGARGIOLA Francesco | 1996 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | HUANG Mengkai | 1997 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | YANG Hyeonjun | 1996 | M | KOR | ||||
Apr 3, 2014 - Apr 12, 2014 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | CHEN Haiwei | 1994 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | CHOUPENITCH Alexander | 1994 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | |||
3 | MASSIALAS Alexander | 1994 | M | USA | Massialas Foundation (USA) | |||
3 | SAITO Toshiya | 1997 | M | JPN | ||||
Apr 6, 2013 - Apr 15, 2013 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Porec | ||||||||
1 | MASSIALAS Alexander | 1994 | M | USA | Massialas Foundation (USA) | |||
2 | NISTA Lorenzo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | CHOUPENITCH Alexander | 1994 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | |||
3 | LICHAGIN Kirill | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
Mar 31, 2012 - Apr 8, 2012 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Moscow | ||||||||
1 | SAFIN Timur | 1992 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | GAROZZO Daniele | 1992 | M | ITA | [i] CS Acireale (ITA) | |||
3 | MASSIALAS Alexander | 1994 | M | USA | Massialas Foundation (USA) | |||
3 | NAKIS Theodoros | 1992 | M | GRE | ATHINAIKOS O.O. (GRE) | |||
Mar 26, 2011 - Apr 6, 2011 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Mer Morte | ||||||||
1 | LUPERI Edoardo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | MASSIALAS Alexander | 1994 | M | USA | Massialas Foundation (USA) | |||
3 | GATAI Robert | 1991 | M | HUN | Budakalasz (HUN) | |||
3 | LICHAGIN Kirill | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 3, 2010 - Apr 4, 2010 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Baku | ||||||||
1 | ABOUELKASSEM Alaaeldin | 1990 | M | EGY | AUBERVILLIER (FRA) | |||
2 | MEINHARDT Gerek | 1990 | M | USA | ||||
3 | LUPERI Edoardo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | WILLETTE David | 1991 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 5, 2009 - Apr 6, 2009 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Belfast | ||||||||
1 | LARI Tommaso | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | JEFFERIES Edward | 1989 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | FOCONI Alessio | 1989 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MEINHARDT Gerek | 1990 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 6, 2008 - Apr 7, 2008 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Acireale | ||||||||
1 | AWAJI Suguru | 1989 | M | JPN | ||||
2 | LARI Tommaso | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ABOUELKASSEM Alaaeldin | 1990 | M | EGY | AUBERVILLIER (FRA) | |||
3 | ZHEREBCHENKO Dmitry | 1989 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 13, 2007 - Apr 14, 2007 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Belek | ||||||||
1 | MINUTO Martino | 1988 | M | TUR | [i] EFE SK Ankara (EUR) | |||
2 | IM Yong Tae | 1987 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | ASPROMONTE Valerio | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | LOPATENKO Georgiy | 1988 | M | UKR | KIEW (UKR) | |||
Apr 9, 2006 - Apr 10, 2006 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Taeback City | ||||||||
1 | ASPROMONTE Valerio | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | CADOT Jeremy | 1986 | M | FRA | HENIN BEAUMONT (FRA) | |||
3 | BASSAL Oren | 1986 | M | ISR | Hapoel Acco (ISR) | |||
3 | DESVAUX Clement | 1986 | M | FRA | PARIS CEP (FRA) | |||
Mar 23, 2005 - Mar 24, 2005 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Linz | ||||||||
1 | KLEIBRINK Benjamin | 1985 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2 | BALDINI Andrea | 1985 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | GANEEV Renal | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | OTA Yuki | 1985 | M | JPN | ||||
Apr 1, 2004 - Apr 2, 2004 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | ZHU Jun | 1984 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | GANEEV Renal | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | KLEIBRINK Benjamin | 1985 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | MEYERS Brendan | 1988 | M | USA | ||||
Apr 4, 2003 - Apr 13, 2003 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Trapani | ||||||||
1 | GANEEV Renal | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | CASSARA Andrea | 1984 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ALONGI Giuseppe | 1985 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | MOLTCHAN Youri | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 1, 2002 - Apr 2, 2002 | World Championships Cadets/Junios | Antalya | ||||||||
1 | JOUBERT Terence | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | LE PECHOUX Erwann | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CASSARA Andrea | 1984 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MCGUIRE Joshua | 1983 | M | CAN | ||||
Apr 9, 2001 - Apr 10, 2001 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Gdansk | ||||||||
1 | WEßELS André | 1981 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | LE PECHOUX Erwann | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CHOI Byungchul | 1981 | M | KOR | ||||
3 | ZHU Jun | 1984 | M | CHN | ||||
Apr 18, 2000 - Apr 19, 2000 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | South Bend | ||||||||
1 | WEßELS André | 1981 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | CIEPLY Tomasz | 1980 | M | POL | AZS AWF Poznan (POL) | |||
3 | FOGT Przemyslaw | 1980 | M | POL | ||||
3 | SINTES Hamid Victor | 1980 | M | ALG | RUEIL MALMAI (FRA) | |||
Mar 30, 1999 - Apr 5, 1999 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | HAUSMANN David | 1979 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2 | BREUTNER Richard | 1979 | M | GER | KTF Luitpold München (GER) | |||
3 | BONOMETTO Andrea | 1980 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
3 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 6, 1998 - Apr 13, 1998 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Valencia | ||||||||
1 | OR Tomer | 1978 | M | ISR | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
2 | RODRIGUEZ Carlos Eduardo | 1978 | M | VEN | ||||
3 | BARRERA Stefano | 1980 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | DEEV Andrei | 1978 | M | RUS | ||||
Mar 25, 1997 - Mar 31, 1997 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Teneriffa | ||||||||
1 | MAMMI Lorenzo | 1977 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
2 | PIERUCCI Giuseppe | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | BAYER Cliff | 1977 | M | USA | ||||
3 | REICHLING Felix | 1977 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
Apr 2, 1996 - Apr 3, 1996 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Tournai | ||||||||
1 | SCHLECHTWEG Christian | 1976 | M | GER | ||||
2 | WANG Jun | 1976 | M | CHN | ||||
3 | BORMATOV Dimitri | 1972 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | MOCEK Slawomir | 1976 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 11, 1995 - Apr 16, 1995 | Championnats du Monde Cadets/Juniors | Paris | ||||||||
1 | SANZO Salvatore | 1975 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
2 | SCHACHE Lars | 1976 | M | GER | TV Markkleeberg (GER) | |||
3 | REICHLING Felix | 1977 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | SALBRECHTER Gerd | 1975 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
Mar 27, 1994 - Mar 28, 1994 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Mexico | ||||||||
1 | ZENNARO Matteo | 1976 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | OR Tomer | 1978 | M | ISR | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
3 | BLASZCZAK Piotr | 1976 | M | POL | ||||
3 | TADDEI Lorenzo | 1975 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 7, 1993 - Apr 8, 1993 | World Championships Cadets/Juniors | Denver | ||||||||
1 | RAUHAUS Jan Eric | 1973 | M | GER | ||||
2 | SOULIER David | 1974 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | FALCHETTO Marco | 1973 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | TADDEI Lorenzo | 1975 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 16, 1992 - Apr 20, 1992 | World Championships Juniors | Génes | ||||||||
1 | CAZZANI Matteo | 1973 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | DONZELLI Luca | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | RAUHAUS Jan Eric | 1973 | M | GER | ||||
3 | WIENAND Wolfgang | 1972 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
Oct 30, 1991 - Oct 31, 1991 | World Championships Juniors | Istanbul | ||||||||
1 | DONZELLI Luca | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BIßDORF Ralf | 1971 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | BECKER Thorsten | 1971 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | MARSI Mark | 1973 | M | HUN | ||||
Apr 11, 1990 - Apr 16, 1990 | World Championships Juniors | Mödling | ||||||||
1 | LAMBERT Olivier | 1971 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | BECKER Thorsten | 1971 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | PAVLOVITCH Vladislav | 1971 | M | RUS | ||||
4 | JOON-SUK Hwang | 1900 | M | KOR | ||||
Apr 23, 1989 - Apr 27, 1989 | World Championships Juniors | Athen | ||||||||
1 | YE Chong | 1969 | M | CHN | ||||
2 | ENDRES Thomas | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | DI RUSSO Fabio | 1969 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | RÖMER Uwe | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
Mar 30, 1988 - Apr 4, 1988 | World Championships Juniors | South Bend | ||||||||
1 | KOCH Alexander | 1969 | M | GER | ||||
2 | ENDRES Thomas | 1969 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | PUCCINI Alessandro | 1968 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | SIESS Cezary | 1968 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 16, 1987 - Apr 20, 1987 | World Championships Juniors | Sao Paulo | ||||||||
1 | CHEVTCHENKO Dimitri | 1967 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | PLUMENAIL Lionel | 1967 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | SCHMITT Ulrich | 1968 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
4 | FINET Lionel | 1967 | M | FRA | ORLY AS (FRA) | |||
Mar 28, 1986 - Apr 1, 1986 | World Championships Juniors | Stuttgart | ||||||||
1 | WEIDNER Thorsten | 1967 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | MOLEA Romica | 1966 | M | ROU | ||||
3 | ERSEK Zsolt | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
4 | ARPINO Marco | 1966 | M | SUI | [i] SAL Lugano (SUI) | |||
Apr 4, 1985 - Apr 8, 1985 | World Championships Juniors | Arnhem | ||||||||
1 | ERSEK Zsolt | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | VITALESTA Luca | 1965 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ARPINO Marco | 1966 | M | SUI | [i] SAL Lugano (SUI) | |||
4 | MOLEA Romica | 1966 | M | ROU | ||||
Apr 19, 1984 - Apr 23, 1984 | World Championships Juniors | Leningrad | ||||||||
1 | CERIONI Stefano | 1964 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | LHOTELLIER Patrice | 1966 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
3 | IBRAGIMOV Anvar | 1965 | M | RUS | ||||
4 | ERSEK Zsolt | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
Mar 31, 1983 - Apr 4, 1983 | World Championships Juniors | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | VITALESTA Luca | 1965 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | CERIONI Stefano | 1964 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ERSEK Zsolt | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
4 | MARDUCHAJEW Peter | 1963 | M | GER | Eintracht Duisburg (GER) | |||
Apr 8, 1982 - Apr 12, 1982 | World Championships Juniors | Buenos Aires | ||||||||
1 | CIPRESSA Andrea | 1963 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SCHRECK Ulrich | 1962 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | MONTANARI Danilo | 1963 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | APTSIAURI Vladimir | 1962 | M | GEO | ||||
Apr 16, 1981 - Apr 20, 1981 | Championnats du Monde Juniors | Lausanne | ||||||||
1 | NUMA Mauro | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SCHRECK Ulrich | 1962 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | CERVI Frederico | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | RIEGER Vincenz | 1900 | M | GER | ||||
Apr 3, 1980 - Apr 7, 1980 | World Championships Juniors | Venedig | ||||||||
1 | CERVI Frederico | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | HOWE Jens | 1961 | M | GER | OSC Potsdam (GER) | |||
3 | NUMA Mauro | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | KOTZMANN Klaus | 1960 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
Apr 12, 1979 - Apr 16, 1979 | World Championships Juniors | South Bend | ||||||||
1 | BORELLA Andrea | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | GEY Matthias | 1960 | M | GER | ||||
3 | NUMA Mauro | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | LAPITSKY Vladimir | 1959 | M | RUS | ||||
Mar 23, 1978 - Mar 27, 1978 | Championnats du Monde | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | NUMA Mauro | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BORELLA Andrea | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | LAPITSKY Vladimir | 1959 | M | RUS | ||||
4 | JOLYOT Pascal | 1958 | M | FRA | PARIS SCUF (FRA) | |||
Apr 6, 1977 - Apr 11, 1977 | Championnats du Monde | Wien | ||||||||
1 | LAPITSKY Vladimir | 1959 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | BORELLA Andrea | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | GEY Matthias | 1960 | M | GER | ||||
4 | NUMA Mauro | 1961 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 16, 1976 - Apr 19, 1976 | Championnats du Monde | Poznan | ||||||||
1 | BRUNIGES Robert | 1956 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | JOLYOT Pascal | 1958 | M | FRA | PARIS SCUF (FRA) | |||
3 | DAL ZOTTO Fabio | 1957 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | KUZMA Mariusz | 1900 | M | POL | ||||
Mar 28, 1975 - Apr 2, 1975 | Championnats du Monde | Mexico | ||||||||
1 | KUKI Petru | 1955 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | BEHR Matthias | 1955 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | KOSENKO Sergey | 1956 | M | RUS | ||||
4 | FUMENKO | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 12, 1974 - Apr 15, 1974 | Championnats du Monde | Istanbul | ||||||||
1 | KUKI Petru | 1955 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | BEHR Matthias | 1955 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | PIETRUSZKA Frederic | 1954 | M | FRA | ||||
4 | DAL ZOTTO Fabio | 1957 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 16, 1973 - Apr 23, 1973 | Championnats du Monde | Buenos Aires | ||||||||
1 | PIETRUSZKA Frederic | 1954 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | BEHR Matthias | 1955 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | BRUNIGES Robert | 1956 | M | GBR | ||||
4 | WIDERA Marek | 1900 | M | POL | ||||
Mar 30, 1972 - Apr 3, 1972 | Championnats du Monde | Madrid | ||||||||
1 | GODEL Arkadiusz | 1952 | M | POL | ||||
2 | RODIONOV Viktor | 1952 | M | RUS | MK Musketiri (CRO) | |||
3 | PIETRUSZKA Frederic | 1954 | M | FRA | ||||
4 | RUZIEV Sabirzhan | 1953 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 8, 1971 - Apr 12, 1971 | Championnats du Monde | South Bend | ||||||||
1 | BOSCHERIE Bruno | 1951 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
2 | BERNKOPF Edoardo | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | BACH Thomas | 1953 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
4 | PIETRUSZKA Frederic | 1954 | M | FRA | ||||
Mar 27, 1970 - Mar 30, 1970 | Championnats du Monde | Minsk | ||||||||
1 | HEIN Harald | 1950 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | VOLOCHINE Arkadiy | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | KALINSKI Andrzej | 1900 | M | POL | ||||
4 | TROKINE | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 4, 1969 - Apr 7, 1969 | Championnats du Monde | Genua | ||||||||
1 | KOZIEJOWSKI Lech | 1949 | M | POL | ||||
2 | DABROWSKI Marek | 1949 | M | POL | ||||
3 | BERNKOPF Edoardo | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
4 | TROKINE | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
Apr 12, 1968 - Apr 15, 1968 | Championnats du Monde | London | ||||||||
1 | KACZMAREK Jerzy | 1948 | M | POL | ||||
2 | YUNITCHENKO Sergey | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | BEIERSTETTEL Elmar | 1948 | M | GER | ||||
4 | KOZIEJOWSKI Lech | 1949 | M | POL | ||||
Mar 24, 1967 - Mar 27, 1967 | World Championships Juniors | Téhéran | ||||||||
1 | ROMANOV Leonid | 1947 | M | URS | ||||
2 | TALVARD Bernard | 1947 | M | FRA | MEAUX CE (FRA) | |||
3 | DABROWSKI Marek | 1949 | M | POL | ||||
4 | PAUL Graham | 1947 | M | GBR | ||||
Apr 8, 1966 - Apr 11, 1966 | Championnats du Monde | Wien | ||||||||
1 | WEISBOCH Stefan | 1946 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | BERKOVITS Miklos | 1948 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | TIU Mihai | 1946 | M | ROU | ||||
4 | OLEXA Tomas | 1946 | M | CZE | ||||
Apr 16, 1965 - Apr 19, 1965 | Championnats du Monde | Rotterdam | ||||||||
1 | LOSERT Roland | 1945 | M | AUT | ||||
2 | DIMONT Jacques | 1945 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | OLEXA Tomas | 1946 | M | CZE | ||||
4 | CZAKKEL Istvan | 1947 | M | GER | Solinger TB (GER) | |||
Mar 27, 1964 - Mar 30, 1964 | Championnats du Monde | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | LOSERT Roland | 1945 | M | AUT | ||||
2 | SIMONOV Pavel | 1944 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | NOËL Christian | 1945 | M | FRA | ||||
4 | KANIKOWSKI Andrzej | 1944 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 11, 1963 - Apr 16, 1963 | Championnats du Monde | Gent | ||||||||
1 | ANDRIADZE Nikoloz | 1943 | M | GEO | ||||
2 | DRIMBA Ionel Alexandru | 1942 | M | ROU | ||||
3 | COURTILLAT Jacques | 1943 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
4 | LOSERT Roland | 1945 | M | AUT | ||||
Apr 20, 1962 - Apr 23, 1962 | Championnats du Monde | Cairo | ||||||||
1 | COURTILLAT Jacques | 1943 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
2 | LUKYANCHENKO Valery | 1942 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | LOSERT Roland | 1945 | M | AUT | ||||
4 | ANDRZEJEWSKI Bohdan | 1942 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 1, 1961 - Apr 3, 1961 | Championnats du Monde | Duisburg | ||||||||
1 | MAGNAN Jean claude | 1941 | M | FRA | MARSEIL IVA (FRA) | |||
2 | COURTILLAT Jacques | 1943 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
3 | WESSEL Friedrich | 1945 | M | GER | ||||
4 | GRANIERI Nicola | 1942 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 15, 1960 - Apr 19, 1960 | Championnats du Monde | St. Petersburg | ||||||||
1 | KAMUTI Laszlo | 1940 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | MAGNAN Jean claude | 1941 | M | FRA | MARSEIL IVA (FRA) | |||
3 | BRECHT Jürgen | 1940 | M | GER | ||||
4 | MURESANU Tanase | 1940 | M | ROU | ||||
Mar 28, 1959 - Mar 31, 1959 | Championnats du Monde | Paris | ||||||||
1 | LINK Jean | 1938 | M | LUX | ||||
2 | GERRESHEIM Tim | 1939 | M | GER | FC Rothenbaum (GER) | |||
3 | KAMUTI Laszlo | 1940 | M | HUN | ||||
4 | PARULSKI Ryszard Wladyslaw | 1938 | M | POL | ||||
Apr 4, 1958 - Apr 7, 1958 | Championnats du Monde | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | LINK Jean | 1938 | M | LUX | ||||
2 | KAMUTI Jeno | 1937 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | MURESANU Tanase | 1940 | M | ROU | ||||
4 | PELLATON Georges | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
Apr 20, 1957 - Apr 22, 1957 | Championnats du Monde | Warszawa | ||||||||
1 | FÜLÖP Mihaly | 1936 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | KAMUTI Laszlo | 1940 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | OSIPOV Yuri | 1937 | M | GEO | ||||
Apr 1, 1956 - Apr 1, 1956 | Championnats du Monde | Letzeburg | ||||||||
1 | FÜLÖP Mihaly | 1936 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | KAMUTI Laszlo | 1940 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | STEININGER Michel | 1935 | M | SUI | ||||
4 | CURLETTO Mario | 1935 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 9, 1955 - Apr 10, 1955 | Championnats du Monde | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | GYURICZA Jozsef | 1934 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | LEBARD Daniel | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | FÜLÖP Mihaly | 1936 | M | HUN | ||||
Apr 17, 1954 - Apr 19, 1954 | Championnats du Monde | Cremone | ||||||||
1 | CLOSSET Roger | 1933 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | SZÖCS Bertalan | 1934 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | LAVOIPIERRE Yves | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
4 | TOSATTO Giancarlo | 1900 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 5, 1953 - Apr 6, 1953 | Championnats du Monde | Paris | ||||||||
1 | CLOSSET Roger | 1933 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | MONTORSI Arturo | 1900 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | GERMANI Mario | 1900 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MOUSSY Pascal | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
Apr 12, 1952 - Apr 14, 1952 | Championnats du Monde | Cremone | ||||||||
1 | CINTRAT René | 1931 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | BULTHE Roger | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | LAVOIPIERRE Yves | 1900 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | MONTORSI Arturo | 1900 | M | ITA | ||||
Mar 29, 1951 - Mar 29, 1951 | Championnats du Monde | Paris | ||||||||
1 | FAVIA Mario | 1930 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BANCILHON Claude | 1931 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | AUREGGI Aldo | 1931 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | CALARESE Wladimiro | 1930 | M | ITA | ||||
Apr 1, 1950 - Apr 1, 1950 | Championnats du Monde | Nice | ||||||||
1 | FAVIA Mario | 1930 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BANCILHON Claude | 1931 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CAPT Pierre | 1900 | M | SUI | ||||
3 | MONTORSI Arturo | 1900 | M | ITA |