Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mar 2, 2024 - Mar 2, 2024 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | DAHLE Abel Austbø | 2009 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
2 | N | BAKKE Lucas Jacob | 2009 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | AABØ-YÜKSEL Leander | 2009 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | ALEXANDER AIRES Ricardo | 2009 | M | NOR | Titan Fekteklubb (NOR) | ||
Mar 4, 2023 - Mar 5, 2023 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | LINDLAND Olav | 2008 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
2 | N | FOSSUM Alexander Allport | 2008 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | DAHLE Abel Austbø | 2009 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | NORDFALK Lukas | 2008 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
Mar 5, 2022 - Mar 6, 2022 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | ØISTAD Johannes | 2007 | M | NOR | Oslo FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | VIK Martin Aleksander | 2007 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | FATULLAYEV Vahab | 2008 | M | AZE | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | SOLVIKAAS Kristoffer Mikael | 2008 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
Feb 29, 2020 - Mar 1, 2020 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | HOLMEN Franz Philip Pap | 2006 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
2 | N | MOULIN Emrik | 2005 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | HAGEN Henrik | 2007 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
3 | N | HAGEN Viktor Jarl Breivik | 2006 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | ||
Mar 9, 2019 - Mar 10, 2019 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | MALVIK Aleksander | 2005 | M | NOR | Titan Fekteklubb (NOR) | ||
2 | N | WALLE Henrik Christopher | 2004 | M | NOR | |||
3 | N | GRANDAL Adrian | 2004 | M | NOR | Nesodden Fekting (NOR) | ||
3 | N | KRASIKOVAS Emilis | 2005 | M | NOR | Stavanger FK (NOR) | ||
Mar 10, 2018 - Mar 11, 2018 | Vårstøtet | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | DRAUGEDALEN Emil | 2005 | M | NOR | Nøtterøy FK (NOR) | |||
2 | BURUM-AUENSEN Alexander | 2003 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | |||
3 | GÖTHLIN Gustav | 2003 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | |||
3 | WALLE Henrik Christopher | 2004 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) |