Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. 4. 2017 - 2. 4. 2017 | Karl-May-Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | KELPE Bendix | 2003 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
2 | FÜRSTENAU Jannik | 2003 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | |||
3 | HÖDTKE Moritz Jonathan | 2003 | M | GER | Blau-Weiss Buchholz (GER) | |||
4 | KNECHTEL Maximilian | 2003 | M | GER | Sport-Club Itzehoe (GER) | |||
16. 4. 2016 - 17. 4. 2016 | Karl-May-Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | KIEBULA Artur | 2002 | M | GER | Osnabrücker SC (GER) | |||
2 | KELPE Bendix | 2003 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
3 | OTTO Fritz Henry | 2002 | M | GER | ASC Göttingen (GER) | |||
4 | BEDNER Daniel | 2002 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
28. 3. 2015 - 29. 3. 2015 | Karl-May-Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | BOROWSKI Ben-Nicolas | 2001 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
2 | THODE Laurin | 2001 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
3 | LINOW Rasmus | 2001 | M | GER | Sport-Club Itzehoe (GER) | |||
4 | SCHWENTNER Patrick | 2001 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | |||
5. 4. 2014 - 6. 4. 2014 | Karl-May-Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | LINOW Rasmus | 2001 | M | GER | Sport-Club Itzehoe (GER) | |||
2 | BOEHNKE Joram | 2000 | M | GER | 1.SC Norderstedt (GER) | |||
3 | SCHELLSCHEIDT Florenz | 2001 | M | GER | Sport-Club Itzehoe (GER) | |||
4 | PETERSEN Moritz | 2000 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
6. 4. 2013 - 7. 4. 2013 | Karl-May-Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | SEYD Julian Dominic | 1999 | M | GER | FA Rheinfelden (GER) | |||
2 | KRÖGER Max | 1999 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | |||
3 | MEINERS Erik | 1999 | M | GER | Schleswiger FC (GER) | |||
4 | SPECKETER Henrik | 2000 | M | GER | FC Bremen-Nord (GER) | |||
26. 5. 2007 - 26. 5. 2007 | Karl-May Turnier | Bad Segeberg | ||||||||
1 | CLEMENT Richard | 1993 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) | |||
2 | SIEBER Marcel | 1994 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | ROOS Alexander | 1993 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
4 | RICHTER Arne | 1994 | M | GER | FG Segeberg (GER) |