Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2023年4月21日 - 2023年4月23日 | British Veterans Championships | Manchester | ||||||||
1 | N | AGRENICH Alex | 1978 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | KERNOHAN Hugh Deans | 1958 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ELLISON Alexander | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | MACDONALD Leslie | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
2022年3月6日 - 2022年3月6日 | British Veterans Championships | London | ||||||||
1 | N | ELLISON Alexander | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | DOWNIE Malcolm | 1976 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | STEPHENS Tim | 1978 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | LAUGA Eric | 1974 | M | FRA | |||
2021年10月29日 - 2021年10月31日 | British Veterans Championships | Manchester | ||||||||
1 | N | ALLEN Gregory | 1972 | M | GBR | Haverstock Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FLATT Robert | 1971 | M | GBR | Wellington Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | LEAHEY John | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
2020年2月28日 - 2020年3月1日 | British Veterans Championships | Nottingham | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | MILLER Will | 1961 | M | GBR | Eastbourne Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | GATES Darcy | 1971 | M | CAN | |||
3 | N | HOWSER Christopher | 1972 | M | GBR | Kingston Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2019年5月10日 - 2019年5月12日 | British Veterans Championships | Oldham | ||||||||
1 | N | HEAPS Christopher | 1968 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | PRIME John E | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BARNETT Keith | 1966 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | CHRISP Tom | 1967 | M | GBR | Wingerworth Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2018年3月3日 - 2018年3月4日 | British Veterans Championships | Manchester | ||||||||
1 | N | HEAPS Christopher | 1968 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | KERNOHAN Hugh Deans | 1958 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BARNETT Keith | 1966 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | THOMAS Michael | 1968 | M | GBR | |||
2017年3月4日 - 2017年3月5日 | British Veterans Championships | Manchester | ||||||||
1 | N | HOWSER Christopher | 1972 | M | GBR | Kingston Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | MACDONALD Leslie | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BUZWELL Timothy | 1973 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | LEAHEY John | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
2016年3月4日 - 2016年3月6日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | PHELPS Richard | 1961 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | HOWSER Christopher | 1972 | M | GBR | Kingston Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | BARNETT Keith | 1966 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | TOWNSON Paul | 1974 | M | GBR | |||
2015年3月6日 - 2015年3月8日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | HOWSER Christopher | 1972 | M | GBR | Kingston Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2 | N | DOMEC Stephen | 1970 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FANCOURT Nigel | 1962 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | THOMPSON Mark | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
2014年2月28日 - 2014年3月2日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | LEAHEY John | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | FLATT Robert | 1971 | M | GBR | Wellington Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | POLLARD William Anton | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
2013年3月1日 - 2013年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | HOWSER Christopher | 1972 | M | GBR | Kingston Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
3 | N | HYDE John-David | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | LEAHEY John | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
2012年3月2日 - 2012年3月4日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | FLATT Robert | 1971 | M | GBR | Wellington Swords (GBR) | ||
3 | N | MACDONALD Leslie | 1969 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | SCRIMSHAW Jason | 1971 | M | GBR | London Thames Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
2011年3月4日 - 2011年3月6日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | POLLARD William Anton | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | DAVENPORT Robin | 1946 | M | GBR | Scaramouche (GBR) | ||
3 | N | LISTON George D | 1960 | M | GBR | |||
2010年3月5日 - 2010年3月7日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | POLLARD William Anton | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | RAWLINSON Jon | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2009年3月6日 - 2009年3月8日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | STANBURY Jonathan P | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | CHALMERS John | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2008年3月1日 - 2008年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | BARNETT Keith | 1966 | M | GBR | Truro Fencing Club (GBR) | ||
4 | N | STANBURY Jonathan P | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
2007年3月1日 - 2007年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | DAVENPORT Robin | 1946 | M | GBR | Scaramouche (GBR) | ||
3 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2006年3月1日 - 2006年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | MALLETT Neal | 1957 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | SIMPSON Gerald | 1956 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | DAVENPORT Robin | 1946 | M | GBR | Scaramouche (GBR) | ||
2005年3月1日 - 2005年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | BRUNIGES Robert | 1956 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | STANBURY Jonathan P | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | VERYZER Hugo | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
2004年3月1日 - 2004年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ALLTON Malcolm | 1953 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | STANBURY Jonathan P | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
2003年3月1日 - 2003年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | PERRY Alan | 1952 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | STANBURY Jonathan P | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | FARE Malcolm | 1942 | M | GBR | |||
2002年3月1日 - 2002年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | BRUNIGES Robert | 1956 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | PAUL Graham | 1947 | M | GBR | |||
2001年3月1日 - 2001年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | PERRY Alan | 1952 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | DOWNS Tony | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
2000年3月1日 - 2000年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | PAUL Graham | 1947 | M | GBR | |||
2 | N | JOHNSON Ralph | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | WEST Howard | 1948 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | FARE Malcolm | 1942 | M | GBR | |||
1999年3月1日 - 1999年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | DAVENPORT Robin | 1946 | M | GBR | Scaramouche (GBR) | ||
2 | N | DOWNS Tony | 1955 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | LAVINGTON Stephen | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | FARE Malcolm | 1942 | M | GBR | |||
1998年3月1日 - 1998年3月3日 | British Veterans Championships | Gloucester | ||||||||
1 | N | DAVENPORT Robin | 1946 | M | GBR | Scaramouche (GBR) | ||
2 | N | LAVINGTON Stephen | 1951 | M | GBR | |||
3 | N | ROOSE Steve | 1900 | M | GBR | |||
4 | N | FARE Malcolm | 1942 | M | GBR |