Sabre
Campeonato Nacional | ||
---|---|---|
5 | 3 | 0 |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 31/05/1986 / 01/06/1986 | Copenhagen | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 29/10/1983 / 30/10/1983 | Stockholm | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 29/10/1983 / 30/10/1983 | Stockholm | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 19/11/1977 / 20/11/1977 | Copenhagen | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 19/11/1977 / 20/11/1977 | Copenhagen | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 16/11/1975 | Copenhagen | Nordic Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 21/07/1983 / 30/07/1983 | Wien | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
9 | 21/07/1983 / 30/07/1983 | Wien | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 03/03/1984 / 04/03/1984 | Hannover | World Cup | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
49 | 11/03/1978 / 12/03/1978 | Hannover | Coat of Hamburg | Sabre masculino Senior Individual |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 01/06/1985 | Stockholm | Swedish Seniors Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 19/05/1984 / 20/05/1984 | Stockholm | Swedish Seniors Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 10/12/1983 | Stockholm | Swedish Championships Team | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
2 | 08/11/1980 | Stockholm | Swedish Championships Team | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 13/11/1977 | Stockholm | Championships of Sweden Team | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 14/05/1977 | Stockholm | Championships of Sweden | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 07/11/1976 | Lund | Championships of Sweden Team | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 23/11/1975 | Stockholm | Championships of Sweden Team | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 30/03/1985 / 31/03/1985 | München | Münchener Schwert | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
37 | 01/04/1984 | München | Münchener Schwert | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
33 | 23/04/1983 / 24/04/1983 | München | Münchener Schwert | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 22/03/1975 / 23/03/1975 | Halmstad | Halmstadfäktningarna | Sabre masculino Senior Individual |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 26/04/1975 / 27/04/1975 | Stockholm | SAF Pokalen | Sabre masculino Senior Individual |
Temporada |
---|
wins Poule |
losses Poule |
wins Eliminatória Direta |
losses Eliminatória Direta |
total hits |
average hits winning Poule |
average hits losing Poule |
average hits winning Eliminatória Direta |
average hits losing Eliminatória Direta |
Temporada | selection | Disciplina | Federação | trainingcenter | Treinador |
---|
Clube | Tipo | Início | Fim | |
---|---|---|---|---|
[i] HJFK Stockholm (SWE) | Clube | 30 de jun de 2019 | Inativo |
All information is supplied without liability and all obligation. Competition results are only available for events providing digital result data to Ophardt Online.