ranking | status | erä | name | yob | sukupuoli | Maa | Seura | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
14.10.2023 - 15.10.2023 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | N | DE MOLA Daniel | 1999 | M | ITA | Centro Sportivo Carabinieri (ITA) | ||
2 | N | PERCHUK Maksym | 2006 | M | UKR | |||
3 | N | LIMARDO Francisco | 1987 | M | VEN | |||
3 | N | VALLOSIO Andrea | 1992 | M | ITA | Centro Sportivo Aeronautica Militare (ITA) | ||
15.10.2022 - 16.10.2022 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | N | NAGY David | 1999 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
2 | N | SOMODY Soma | 2004 | M | HUN | MTK (HUN) | ||
3 | N | KOCH Mate Tamas | 1999 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
3 | N | LUGONES RUGGERI Jesus Andres | 1991 | M | ARG | ANGERS SCO (FRA) | ||
12.10.2019 - 13.10.2019 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | N | BIDA Sergey | 1993 | M | RUS | Dynamo Moskau (RUS) | ||
2 | N | ANOKHIN Vadim | 1992 | M | AIN | Dinamo-Kazan (RUS) | ||
3 | N | KNYSH Oleg | 1997 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | SCHMIDT Richard | 1992 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | ||
13.10.2018 - 14.10.2018 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | N | KHODOS Sergey | 1986 | M | RUS | |||
2 | N | LUGONES RUGGERI Jesus Andres | 1991 | M | ARG | ANGERS SCO (FRA) | ||
3 | N | GLEBKO Anton | 1989 | M | RUS | |||
3 | N | MAHRINGER Josef | 1997 | M | AUT | FUL LINZ (AUT) | ||
28.4.2018 - 28.4.2018 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | BOLLATI Federico | 1978 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | LUGONES RUGGERI Jesus Andres | 1991 | M | ARG | ANGERS SCO (FRA) | |||
3 | HERZBERG Fabian | 1988 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | |||
3 | MARENCO Federico | 1998 | M | ITA | ||||
20.5.2017 - 21.5.2017 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | MITRICA Alin | 1987 | M | ROU | CSU Craiova (ROU) | |||
2 | HEIDECKER Pascal | 1991 | M | CAN | ||||
3 | CIOVICA Lucian | 1993 | M | ROU | CSU Craiova (ROU) | |||
3 | MAYNARD Calum | 1993 | M | GBR | ||||
14.5.2016 - 14.5.2016 | St. Duje Cup | Split | ||||||||
1 | TAGLIARIOL Matteo | 1983 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | LIMARDO Francisco | 1987 | M | VEN | ||||
3 | COQUECO GUERRERO Gustavo Adolfo | 1985 | M | COL | ||||
3 | LUGONES RUGGERI Jesus Andres | 1991 | M | ARG | ANGERS SCO (FRA) | |||
16.5.2015 - 16.5.2015 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | TULEN Tristan | 1991 | M | NED | s.v. Scaramouche (NED) | |||
2 | LUGONES RUGGERI Jesus Andres | 1991 | M | ARG | ANGERS SCO (FRA) | |||
3 | MATHE Jorg | 1982 | M | AUT | FC Vindobona (AUT) | |||
3 | VINNICKY Ariel | 1995 | M | ISR | Hapoel Ashkelon (ISR) | |||
17.5.2014 - 18.5.2014 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | TARDI Otto | 1985 | M | ROU | CSM Oradea (ROU) | |||
2 | SCHWANTES Athos | 1985 | M | BRA | AMK Mestre Kato (BRA) | |||
3 | KIRSCHEN Uwe | 1967 | M | GER | SC Berlin (GER) | |||
3 | MATHE Jorg | 1982 | M | AUT | FC Vindobona (AUT) | |||
18.5.2013 - 19.5.2013 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | MATHE Jorg | 1982 | M | AUT | FC Vindobona (AUT) | |||
2 | SERRA Solt | 1989 | M | HUN | Debrecen (HUN) | |||
3 | KIRSCHEN Uwe | 1967 | M | GER | SC Berlin (GER) | |||
3 | SCHWANTES Athos | 1985 | M | BRA | AMK Mestre Kato (BRA) | |||
19.5.2012 - 19.5.2012 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | BÖJTE Szabolocs Jozsef | 1992 | M | TUR | [i] BVSC 2 (HUN) | |||
2 | HURME Tommi | 1985 | M | USA | ||||
3 | BIDOVEC Jan | 1989 | M | SLO | SS Tabor Ljubljana (SLO) | |||
3 | SERRA Solt | 1989 | M | HUN | Debrecen (HUN) | |||
21.5.2011 - 21.5.2011 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | NYISZTOR Alexandru | 1979 | M | ROU | ||||
2 | HURME Tommi | 1985 | M | USA | ||||
3 | GUJINOVIC Luka | 1992 | M | CRO | MK Split (CRO) | |||
3 | SCHWANTES Athos | 1985 | M | BRA | AMK Mestre Kato (BRA) | |||
23.5.2010 - 24.5.2010 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | MUNZONE Edoardo | 1988 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | PIRVAN Marin Dorian | 1989 | M | ROU | CSU Craiova (ROU) | |||
3 | DUPIN Nicolas | 1986 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | MITRICA Alin | 1987 | M | ROU | CSU Craiova (ROU) | |||
23.5.2009 - 24.5.2009 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | BALENT Uros | 1980 | M | SLO | ||||
2 | DEBIC Ozren | 1979 | M | CRO | MK Rapir (CRO) | |||
3 | ELSAGHIR Ahmed | 1986 | M | EGY | ||||
3 | LUSIC Miro | 1981 | M | CRO | MK Split (CRO) | |||
24.5.2008 - 25.5.2008 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | N | DEBIC Ozren | 1979 | M | CRO | MK Rapir (CRO) | ||
2 | N | SLODNJAK Martin | 1976 | M | SLO | |||
3 | N | HINZ Gerald | 1965 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | ||
3 | N | RIDGE John | 1950 | M | USA | |||
6.5.2007 - 6.5.2007 | Satellite Tournament | Split | ||||||||
1 | DEBIC Ozren | 1979 | M | CRO | MK Rapir (CRO) | |||
2 | SLODNJAK Martin | 1976 | M | SLO | ||||
3 | HINZ Gerald | 1965 | M | GER | Elmshorner MTV (GER) | |||
3 | RIDGE John | 1950 | M | USA |