ranking | status | erä | name | yob | sukupuoli | Maa | Seura | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2.6.2018 - 3.6.2018 | Malmö International | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | WIKSTRÖM Olle | 1994 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | BRODÉN Daniel | 1989 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | BERNTSSON Hannes | 1996 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | |||
3 | DOBRYDEN Illia | 1985 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3.6.2017 - 4.6.2017 | Malmö International - Nordic Championships | Malmö | ||||||||
1 | BERLAND Mick With | 1998 | M | DEN | Roskilde FK (DEN) | |||
2 | BRINGSTRUP Sebastian Toft | 1994 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
3 | WAGNER Alexander | 1990 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | |||
3 | WIEMERSLAGE Lyle | 1982 | M | USA | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
10.10.2015 - 11.10.2015 | Nordic Championships | Reykjavik | ||||||||
1 | BRINGSTRUP Sebastian Toft | 1994 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
2 | BERLAND Mick With | 1998 | M | DEN | Roskilde FK (DEN) | |||
3 | HUGOSSON Haraldur | 1988 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | |||
3 | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | |||
18.10.2014 - 19.10.2014 | Nordic Championships | Reykjavik | ||||||||
1 | N | AGUSTSSON Gunnar Egill | 1992 | M | ISL | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
2 | N | MAHLAMÄKI Olli | 1982 | M | FIN | Tapanilan Erä Miekkailujaosto (FIN) | ||
3 | N | BRYNJARSSON Gudjon Ragnar | 1993 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
3 | N | RYDENFELT Mikael | 1984 | M | FIN | Miekka Miehet (FIN) | ||
26.10.2013 - 27.10.2013 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | JONSSON Hilmar Orn | 1994 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
2 | N | AGUSTSSON Gunnar Egill | 1992 | M | ISL | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
3 | N | BRYNJARSSON Gudjon Ragnar | 1993 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
3 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
11.3.2011 - 11.3.2011 | Nordic Championships | Rødovre | ||||||||
1 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
2 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
3 | N | JØRGENSEN Magnus Normann | 1993 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
3 | N | LUDVIKSSON Saevar-Baldur | 1990 | M | ISL | UMFA Mosfellsbae (ISL) | ||
24.4.2010 - 24.4.2010 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
2 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
3 | N | HUGOSSON Hroar | 1982 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
3 | N | LUDVIKSSON Saevar-Baldur | 1990 | M | ISL | UMFA Mosfellsbae (ISL) | ||
11.4.2009 - 12.4.2009 | Nordic Championships | Örebro | ||||||||
1 | N | MAHLAMÄKI Olli | 1982 | M | FIN | Tapanilan Erä Miekkailujaosto (FIN) | ||
2 | N | CLASSON Johan | 1981 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | ABRAHAMSEN Ulrik Schack | 1991 | M | DEN | Roskilde FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
14.6.2008 - 15.6.2008 | Nordic Championships | Reykjavik | ||||||||
1 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
2 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
3 | N | LUDVIKSSON Saevar-Baldur | 1990 | M | ISL | UMFA Mosfellsbae (ISL) | ||
3 | N | MAHLAMÄKI Olli | 1982 | M | FIN | Tapanilan Erä Miekkailujaosto (FIN) | ||
25.6.2007 - 27.6.2007 | Nordic Championships | Odense | ||||||||
1 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
2 | N | MAHLAMÄKI Olli | 1982 | M | FIN | Tapanilan Erä Miekkailujaosto (FIN) | ||
3 | N | BJORNSSON Kari-Freyr | 1978 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
3 | N | KRISTINSSON Andri | 1982 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
8.4.2006 - 8.4.2006 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | ROMAN Mika | 1974 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
2 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
3 | N | PENTIKÄINEN Kimmo | 1968 | M | FIN | Säiläklubi (FIN) | ||
3 | N | VOROBJOVS Viktors | 1988 | M | LAT | |||
16.4.2005 - 17.4.2005 | Nordic Championships | Örebro | ||||||||
1 | N | SIGURDSSON Ragnar | 1976 | M | ISL | FH Hafnarfjordur (ISL) | ||
2 | N | WIGREN Eric | 1972 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | ||
3 | N | KRISTINSSON Andri | 1982 | M | ISL | FC Reykjavik (ISL) | ||
3 | N | MAHLAMÄKI Olli | 1982 | M | FIN | Tapanilan Erä Miekkailujaosto (FIN) | ||
25.5.1991 - 26.5.1991 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | DEAK Janos | 1973 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | ÅKERFELT Jari | 1971 | M | SWE | |||
26.5.1990 - 27.5.1990 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | FORNITZ Michael | 1959 | M | DEN | FK Mahaut (DEN) | ||
2 | N | CHRISTENSEN H | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | ÅKERFELT Jari | 1971 | M | SWE | |||
20.5.1989 - 21.5.1989 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | WALLSTEN Lars | 1957 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | CHRISTTREU Holger | 1961 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
4 | N | WULFF Jan | 1960 | M | DEN | |||
5.8.1988 - 5.8.1988 | Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | ÅGREN Erik | 1964 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | WULFF Jan | 1960 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | LITNÄS Martin | 1967 | M | SWE | |||
8.8.1987 - 9.8.1987 | Nordic Championships | Ystad | ||||||||
1 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | FORNITZ Michael | 1959 | M | DEN | FK Mahaut (DEN) | ||
3 | N | UNGUREIT Udo | 1950 | M | GER | OSC Berlin (GER) | ||
4 | N | ÅGREN Erik | 1964 | M | SWE | |||
29.10.1983 - 30.10.1983 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | WALLSTEN Lars | 1957 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | CSILLAG Stefan | 1950 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | TOTH Istvan | 1963 | M | SWE | |||
13.11.1982 - 14.11.1982 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | WALLSTEN Lars | 1957 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | WULFF Jan | 1960 | M | DEN | |||
21.11.1981 - 22.11.1981 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | WULFF Jan | 1960 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | JØRGENSEN Jens-Normann | 1951 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | KUCZYNSKI Wojciech | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3.6.1960 - 5.6.1960 | Nordic Championships | Saltsjöbaden | ||||||||
1 | N | FREY Palle | 1920 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | SVENSTAM Ingemar | 1926 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | CARNERA Raimondo Alberto Pietro | 1915 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | ENHAGEN Carl-Olof | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
5.6.1959 - 7.5.1959 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | FREY Palle | 1920 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | ANDERSEN Per | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | JÖNSSON Ingvar | 1927 | M | SWE | |||
30.5.1957 - 2.6.1957 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | ANDERSEN Per | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | FREY Palle | 1920 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | KOLBINGER Karl | 1900 | M | GER | |||
6.5.1955 - 8.5.1955 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | DAGSBERG Karl Erik | 1922 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | BORESTAM Stig | 1917 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | CARNERA Raimondo Alberto Pietro | 1915 | M | DEN | |||
6.6.1953 - 8.6.1953 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | FREY Palle | 1920 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | CARNERA Raimondo Alberto Pietro | 1915 | M | DEN | |||
4 | N | BORESTAM Stig | 1917 | M | SWE | |||
4.11.1951 - 6.11.1951 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | FREY Palle | 1920 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | BORESTAM Stig | 1917 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | LINDSTRÖM Tage | 1917 | M | SWE | |||
18.6.1949 - 20.6.1949 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | N | LEIDERSDORFF Aage Albert | 1910 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | NORDHOLM Knut | 1902 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | NORDIN Henry | 1921 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | KNUTZEN Egill Christian | 1914 | M | NOR | |||
25.5.1946 - 1.6.1946 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | N | LEIDERSDORFF Aage Albert | 1910 | M | DEN | |||
2 | N | EIGENFELDT Ove | 1900 | M | DEN | |||
3 | N | ÅKERBERG Dag | 1909 | M | SWE | |||
4 | N | KNUTZEN Egill Christian | 1914 | M | NOR |