Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24. 5. 2024 - 25. 5. 2024 | Österreichische Meisterschaft | Salzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | NEMEC Jaden | 2008 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | ||
2 | N | KÜTTNER Nicolas | 2007 | M | AUT | ASC Wien (AUT) | ||
3 | N | DELLA PIETRA Ulisse | 2008 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
3 | N | PLATZER Florian | 2008 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
3. 6. 2023 - 4. 6. 2023 | Österreichische Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | N | PECNIK Georg | 2006 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | ||
2 | N | SKRABITZ Tim | 2006 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
3 | N | BRUNBAUER Alexander | 2007 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | ||
3 | N | HUBNER Maximilian | 2006 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | ||
18. 6. 2022 - 19. 6. 2022 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | N | MELOT DE BEAUREGARD Matisse | 2006 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
2 | N | PRIBAS Fabian Alexi | 2005 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
3 | N | HUBNER Maximilian | 2006 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | ||
3 | N | KÜTTNER Kilian | 2005 | M | AUT | ASC Wien (AUT) | ||
29. 5. 2021 - 30. 5. 2021 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Linz | ||||||||
1 | N | HUBNER Alexander | 2004 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | ||
2 | N | PRIBAS Fabian Alexi | 2005 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
3 | N | RAMIREZ Pablo | 2004 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | ||
3 | N | WAGNER Alexander | 2004 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | ||
15. 6. 2019 - 16. 6. 2019 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Linz | ||||||||
1 | N | SEMINERIO Giuliano | 2002 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | ||
2 | N | BRESSLAUER Tobias | 2002 | M | AUT | SU Wien 9 (AUT) | ||
3 | N | KALT Andreas | 2002 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | ||
3 | N | SCHIEBEL Paul | 2002 | M | AUT | UFC Wien (AUT) | ||
9. 6. 2018 - 10. 6. 2018 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | BRESSLAUER Tobias | 2002 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
2 | KALT Andreas | 2002 | M | AUT | FCW Wels (AUT) | |||
3 | LEHNER Leon | 2003 | M | AUT | FK Vöcklabruck (AUT) | |||
3 | SCHUBERT Max | 2001 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
10. 6. 2017 - 11. 6. 2017 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | LEHNER Kilian | 2000 | M | AUT | FK Vöcklabruck (AUT) | |||
2 | LECHNER Moritz | 2000 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
3 | SCHUBERT Max | 2001 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | WAGNER Phillip | 2000 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
7. 5. 2016 - 8. 5. 2016 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Graz | ||||||||
1 | KAIN Martin | 1999 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | HUTHMANN Erik-Elmar | 1999 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | GRASNEK Tobias | 1999 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | LECHNER Moritz | 2000 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
9. 5. 2015 - 10. 5. 2015 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Salzburg | ||||||||
1 | LECHNER Moritz | 2000 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
2 | HUTHMANN Erik-Elmar | 1999 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | AUBOCK Sebastian | 1998 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | HELLDORF Nicolai | 1998 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
10. 5. 2014 - 11. 5. 2014 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | KAIN Martin | 1999 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | LECHNER Moritz | 2000 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
3 | AUBOCK Sebastian | 1998 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | MAHRINGER Josef | 1997 | M | AUT | FUL LINZ (AUT) | |||
11. 5. 2013 - 12. 5. 2013 | Österreichische U17 Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | OBERHUBER Philipp | 1996 | M | AUT | FK Vöcklabruck (AUT) | |||
2 | KAIN Martin | 1999 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | HELLDORF Nicolai | 1998 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
3 | RUSS Nico | 1996 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
12. 5. 2012 - 13. 5. 2012 | Österreichische Meisterschaft | Wels | ||||||||
1 | LANGER Mario | 1995 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | OBERHUBER Philipp | 1996 | M | AUT | FK Vöcklabruck (AUT) | |||
3 | ENDLER Tobias | 1995 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
3 | RYSZKA Aaron | 1997 | M | AUT | UFC Wien (AUT) | |||
14. 5. 2011 - 15. 5. 2011 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Graz | ||||||||
1 | LANGER Mario | 1995 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | ENDLER Tobias | 1995 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
3 | FELNER Markus | 1994 | M | AUT | FUW Wien (AUT) | |||
3 | MUNDIGLER Dominik | 1995 | M | AUT | FK Vöcklabruck (AUT) | |||
15. 5. 2010 - 16. 5. 2010 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Graz | ||||||||
1 | STÜHLER Maximilian | 1993 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | LANGER Mario | 1995 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | WETTER Elias | 1993 | M | AUT | FUW Wien (AUT) | |||
3 | ZSACSEK Viktor | 1993 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
16. 5. 2009 - 17. 5. 2009 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Graz | ||||||||
1 | RITSCH Sebastian | 1992 | M | AUT | FTS Dornbirn (AUT) | |||
2 | LANGER Mario | 1995 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | MAYER Maximilian | 1994 | M | AUT | FTS Dornbirn (AUT) | |||
3 | PFEFFERKORN Robin | 1992 | M | AUT | FTS Dornbirn (AUT) | |||
15. 3. 2008 - 16. 3. 2008 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Krems | ||||||||
1 | STÜHLER Sven | 1991 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
2 | WOZNIAK Viktor | 1991 | M | AUT | UFC Wien (AUT) | |||
3 | HÖSELE Robert | 1992 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
3 | WALLA Benjamin | 1991 | M | AUT | FTS Dornbirn (AUT) | |||
9. 6. 2007 - 10. 6. 2007 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Krems | ||||||||
1 | WOHLGEMUTH-ENGEL Dominik | 1990 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | POSCHARNIG Johannes | 1990 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | LIU Guang-Yuan | 1990 | M | AUT | Wiener FK (AUT) | |||
3 | WOZNIAK Viktor | 1991 | M | AUT | UFC Wien (AUT) | |||
4. 3. 2006 - 5. 3. 2006 | Österreichische Meisterschaft U17 | Krems | ||||||||
1 | BRUGGER Arno | 1989 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | WOHLGEMUTH-ENGEL Dominik | 1990 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
3 | DOBIASCH Martin | 1989 | M | AUT | WAT Wieden (AUT) | |||
3 | POSCHARNIG Johannes | 1990 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) |