Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2023年5月11日 - 2023年5月16日 | South East Asian Games | Phnom Penh | ||||||||
1 | N | SITO Jian Tong | 2003 | M | SGP | |||
2 | N | JOSE Noelito | 1997 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | LEE Simon Renjie | 2003 | M | SGP | SSP (SGP) | ||
3 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2022年5月12日 - 2022年5月18日 | South East Asian Games | Hanoi | ||||||||
1 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | JOSE Noelito | 1997 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | JOSHUA KOH I-Jie | 1990 | M | MAS | |||
3 | N | LEE Simon Renjie | 2003 | M | SGP | SSP (SGP) | ||
2019年12月3日 - 2019年12月8日 | South East Asian Games | Pasay | ||||||||
1 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | JOSHUA KOH I-Jie | 1990 | M | MAS | |||
3 | N | JOSE Noelito | 1997 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | NGUYEN Phuoc Den | 1996 | M | VIE | |||
2017年8月21日 - 2017年8月23日 | South East Asian Games | Kuala Lumpur | ||||||||
1 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | CHAMCHARERN Panthawit | 1989 | M | THA | |||
3 | N | JAYA KUSUMA Indra | 1988 | M | INA | |||
3 | N | JOSHUA KOH I-Jie | 1990 | M | MAS | |||
2015年6月3日 - 2015年6月7日 | South East Asian Games | Singapore | ||||||||
1 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | LIM Wei Wen | 1985 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | CHAMCHARERN Panthawit | 1989 | M | THA | |||
3 | N | LEE Samson Mun Hou | 1986 | M | SGP | Blade (SGP) | ||
2011年11月11日 - 2011年11月23日 | South East Asian Games | Palembang | ||||||||
1 | N | JOSHUA KOH I-Jie | 1990 | M | MAS | |||
2 | N | HAERULLAH Muhammad | 1977 | M | INA | |||
3 | N | CHAMCHARERN Panthawit | 1989 | M | THA | |||
3 | N | NGUYEN Tien Nhat | 1990 | M | VIE | |||
2007年12月8日 - 2007年12月11日 | South East Asian Games | Nakhon Ratchasima | ||||||||
1 | N | DO Huu Cuong | 1984 | M | VIE | |||
2 | N | LIM Wei Wen | 1985 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | LIN Qinghui | 1981 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | MANUHUTU Agustinus Pieter | 1975 | M | INA | |||
2005年11月28日 - 2005年12月1日 | South East Asian Games | Manila | ||||||||
1 | N | RATHPRASERT Siriroj | 1975 | M | THA | |||
2 | N | DO Huu Cuong | 1984 | M | VIE | |||
3 | N | HAERULLAH Muhammad | 1977 | M | INA | |||
3 | N | VICTORINO Avelino | 1981 | M | PHI | |||
2003年12月10日 - 2003年12月13日 | South East Asian Games | Hanoi | ||||||||
1 | N | RATHPRASERT Siriroj | 1975 | M | THA | |||
2 | N | VIZCAYNO Wilfredo jr. | 1981 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | ANG Chez Yee | 1972 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | HAERULLAH Muhammad | 1977 | M | INA | |||
2001年9月10日 - 2001年9月12日 | South East Asian Games | Kuala Lumpur | ||||||||
1 | N | TRIAGI Perdian | 1900 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | GOMEZ Richard I. | 1900 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | ANG Chez Yee | 1972 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | RATHPRASERT Siriroj | 1975 | M | THA | |||
1997年10月12日 - 1997年10月18日 | South East Asian Games | Jakarta | ||||||||
1 | N | LENZUN Handri Octavinus | 1971 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | GOMEZ Richard I. | 1900 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | TRIAGI Perdian | 1900 | M | INA | |||
4 | N | RATHPRASERT Siriroj | 1975 | M | THA | |||
1995年12月9日 - 1995年12月17日 | South East Asian Games | Chiang Mai | ||||||||
1 | N | RATHPRASERT Siriroj | 1975 | M | THA | |||
2 | N | LENZUN Handri Octavinus | 1971 | M | INA | |||
3 | N | JIMENEZ Gerardo | 1900 | M | PHI | |||
1993年6月12日 - 1993年6月20日 | South East Asian Games | Singapore | ||||||||
1 | N | LENZUN Handri Octavinus | 1971 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | LIPAT Alan B. | 1900 | M | PHI | |||
3 | N | TAN Kim Huat Ronald | 1959 | M | SGP | |||
1991年11月24日 - 1991年12月4日 | South East Asian Games | Manila | ||||||||
1 | N | YUSMAHDI . | 1900 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | WONG Teng Huat | 1900 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | CHAIRAT Nonhakarn | 1900 | M | THA | |||
3 | N | MAUWA Joshua | 1900 | M | INA | |||
1989年8月20日 - 1989年8月31日 | South East Asian Games | Kuala Lumpur | ||||||||
1 | N | YUSMAHDI . | 1900 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | TAN Kim Huat Ronald | 1959 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | NAKAPHAIBOON Tratchakra | 1960 | M | THA | |||
3 | N | SUROSO Hadi | 1900 | M | INA | |||
1987年9月10日 - 1987年9月15日 | South East Asian Games | Jakarta | ||||||||
1 | N | SUROSA Hadi | 1900 | M | INA | |||
2 | N | TAN Kim Huat Ronald | 1959 | M | SGP | |||
3 | N | MAUWA Joshua | 1900 | M | INA |