Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2024年2月26日 - 2024年2月29日 | European Championships | Napoli | ||||||||
1 | N | IACOMONI Matteo | 2005 | M | ITA | Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | ||
2 | N | CHAGNON Eliot | 2004 | M | FRA | MEUNG LOIRE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | GEUDVERT Oscar | 2004 | M | BEL | CE Les 3 armes (BEL) | ||
3 | N | IVANOV Alexey | 2004 | M | AIN | |||
2023年2月25日 - 2023年2月28日 | European Championships | Tallinn | ||||||||
1 | N | JAKUBOWSKI Adam | 2003 | M | POL | UKS Atena Gdansk (POL) | ||
2 | N | BROBERG Marcus | 2003 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
3 | N | BAGDANY Albert | 2005 | M | HUN | Szigetszentmiklosi Tor Egylet (HUN) | ||
3 | N | DIESTELKAMP Niklas | 2005 | M | GER | KTF Luitpold München (GER) | ||
2022年2月26日 - 2022年3月2日 | European Championships | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | N | LOMBARDI Giulio | 2002 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | CASTANIE Valerian | 2002 | M | FRA | |||
3 | N | CHAGNON Eliot | 2004 | M | FRA | MEUNG LOIRE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | DE BADTS Paul Antoine | 2002 | M | FRA | Masque de fer Lyon (FRA) | ||
2020年2月27日 - 2020年3月2日 | European Championships | Porec | ||||||||
1 | N | BORODACHEV Kirill | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
2 | N | BORODACHEV Anton | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
3 | N | BEM Maciej | 2001 | M | POL | AZS AWF Poznan (POL) | ||
3 | N | TOTUSEK Marek | 2002 | M | CZE | Sokol Bystrice nad Pernstejnem (CZE) | ||
2019年2月27日 - 2019年3月3日 | European Championships | Foggia | ||||||||
1 | N | MARINI Tommaso | 2000 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | BORODACHEV Anton | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
3 | N | MYLNIKOV Vladislav | 2000 | M | AIN | |||
3 | N | SPICHIGER Armand | 2001 | M | FRA | LYON SE (FRA) | ||
2018年3月7日 - 2018年3月11日 | European Championships U20 | Sochi | ||||||||
1 | BORODACHEV Kirill | 2000 | M | AIN | ||||
2 | FILIPPI Davide | 1998 | M | ITA | [i] AS Padova (ITA) | |||
3 | GIACON Daniel | 2000 | M | NED | SC Amsterdam (NED) | |||
3 | ROGER Wallerand | 1998 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
2017年3月5日 - 2017年3月9日 | European Championships U20 | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | BIANCHI Guillaume | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | BORODACHEV Kirill | 2000 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | EDIRI Alexandre | 1998 | M | FRA | MEAUX CE (FRA) | |||
3 | ROGER Wallerand | 1998 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
2016年3月4日 - 2016年3月9日 | European Championships U20 | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | CHASTANET Maximilien | 1996 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | RZADKOWSKI Andrzej | 1997 | M | POL | Wroclawianie (POL) | |||
3 | EDIRI Alexandre | 1998 | M | FRA | MEAUX CE (FRA) | |||
3 | GRIDELLI Alessandro | 1997 | M | ITA | [i] ASD FRASCATI SCHERMA (ITA) | |||
2015年3月1日 - 2015年3月5日 | European Championships U20 | Maribor | ||||||||
1 | ROSATELLI Damiano | 1995 | M | ITA | [i] CS ARICCIA (ITA) | |||
2 | DOSA Daniel | 1996 | M | HUN | Torekves (HUN) | |||
3 | CHASTANET Maximilien | 1996 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | DAHLIN Kolja | 1996 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
2014年2月28日 - 2014年3月4日 | European Championships U20 | Jerusalem | ||||||||
1 | CHOUPENITCH Alexander | 1994 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | |||
2 | MOURRAIN Baptiste | 1994 | M | FRA | CE MELUN VAL DE SEINE (FRA) | |||
3 | GRYGLEWSKI Krystian | 1994 | M | POL | Fundacja Gdańska Szkola Floretu (POL) | |||
3 | NEMETH Andras | 1995 | M | HUN | BHSE BUDAPEST (HUN) | |||
2013年3月3日 - 2013年3月9日 | European Championships | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | NISTA Lorenzo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | CHOUPENITCH Alexander | 1994 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | |||
3 | LICHAGIN Kirill | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | LUPERI Edoardo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
2012年2月28日 - 2012年3月10日 | European Championships U20 | Porec | ||||||||
1 | LICHAGIN Kirill | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | CHOUPENITCH Alexander | 1994 | M | CZE | Sokol Brno (CZE) | |||
3 | ESCURAT Aymeric | 1992 | M | FRA | ISSY MOUSQUETAIRES (FRA) | |||
3 | GUERRA Filippo | 1993 | M | ITA | ||||
2010年10月24日 - 2010年10月30日 | European Championships | Lobnya | ||||||||
1 | KRÖPLIN Moritz | 1991 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2 | WLOSEK Maciej | 1991 | M | POL | ||||
3 | ARSLANOV Timur | 1991 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | ROSOWSKY Husayn | 1991 | M | GBR | Academy (GBR) | |||
2009年11月1日 - 2009年11月2日 | European Championships U20 | Odense | ||||||||
1 | GAROZZO Daniele | 1992 | M | ITA | [i] CS Acireale (ITA) | |||
2 | SANITA André | 1992 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | LECOCQ Hans Joachim | 1991 | M | BEL | ||||
3 | NAKIS Theodoros | 1992 | M | GRE | ATHINAIKOS O.O. (GRE) | |||
2008年11月3日 - 2008年11月4日 | European Championships U20 | Amsterdam | ||||||||
1 | OSMANSKI Pawel | 1989 | M | POL | ||||
2 | LARI Tommaso | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ARSLANOV Timur | 1991 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | KONTOCHRISTOPOULOS Nikolaos | 1992 | M | GRE | A.O.X. EGALEO (GRE) | |||
2007年10月29日 - 2007年10月30日 | European Championships U20 | Prag | ||||||||
1 | TONY HELISSEY Jean-Paul | 1990 | M | FRA | BOURG LA REINE (FRA) | |||
2 | ZHEREBCHENKO Dmitry | 1989 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | KOMISSAROV Dmitry | 1990 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | POGREBNIAK Andrii | 1988 | M | UKR | KIEW (UKR) | |||
2006年11月1日 - 2006年11月2日 | European Championships U20 | Poznan | ||||||||
1 | GAVIN Guillaume | 1987 | M | FRA | ST DOULCHARD (FRA) | |||
2 | SARDA Thibault | 1987 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | ASPROMONTE Valerio | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MAJEWSKI Michal | 1987 | M | POL | ||||
2005年11月1日 - 2005年11月8日 | European Championships U20 | Tapolca | ||||||||
1 | BOULLE Pierre | 1986 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
2 | KHOVANSKIY Alexey | 1987 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | ASPROMONTE Valerio | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | MAJEWSKI Michal | 1987 | M | POL | ||||
2004年10月31日 - 2004年11月6日 | European Championships U20 | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | GRIDNEV Igor | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | HATOEL Maor | 1985 | M | ISR | ||||
3 | DE BAZELAIRE Stanislaw | 1986 | M | POL | ||||
3 | KLEIBRINK Benjamin | 1985 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2003年11月4日 - 2003年11月11日 | European Championships U20 | Porec | ||||||||
1 | GANEEV Renal | 1985 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | ALONGI Giuseppe | 1985 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | |||
3 | PIETRUSIAK Krzysztof | 1984 | M | POL | ||||
3 | SALISCAN Virgil | 1984 | M | ROU | CSA Steaua Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
2002年11月4日 - 2002年11月10日 | European Championships U20 | Conegliano | ||||||||
1 | KRUSE Richard | 1983 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | CASSARA Andrea | 1984 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | IVANOV Anton | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | SALISCAN Virgil | 1984 | M | ROU | CSA Steaua Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
2001年11月13日 - 2001年11月18日 | European Championships U20 | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | HALSTED Laurence | 1984 | M | GBR | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
2 | KRUSE Richard | 1983 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | IVANOV Anton | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | JOUBERT Terence | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
2000年10月30日 - 2000年11月5日 | European Championships U20 | Antalya | ||||||||
1 | SENFT Jan-Simon | 1982 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
2 | JOPPICH Peter | 1982 | M | GER | CTG Koblenz (GER) | |||
3 | MENENDEZ Javier | 1981 | M | ESP | ||||
3 | NASSIBOULLINE Rouslan | 1981 | M | RUS | ||||
1999年11月15日 - 1999年11月21日 | European Championships U20 | Viana do Castelo | ||||||||
1 | CIEPLY Tomasz | 1980 | M | POL | AZS AWF Poznan (POL) | |||
2 | MENENDEZ Javier | 1981 | M | ESP | ||||
3 | TIKHONOV Serguei | 1982 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | WEßELS André | 1981 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
1998年11月4日 - 1998年11月8日 | European Championships U20 | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | JELEZOV Serghei | 1979 | M | MDA | Scoala de Scrima (MDA) | |||
2 | BONOMETTO Andrea | 1980 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
3 | HAUSMANN David | 1979 | M | GER | OFC Bonn (GER) | |||
3 | VANNI Simone | 1979 | M | ITA | ||||
1997年11月4日 - 1997年11月9日 | European Championships U20 | Gdansk | ||||||||
1 | WITKOWSKI Andrzej | 1979 | M | POL | ||||
2 | DEEV Andrei | 1978 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | COUTANT Sebastien | 1978 | M | FRA | Masque de fer Lyon (FRA) | |||
3 | FOGT Przemyslaw | 1980 | M | POL | ||||
1996年11月5日 - 1996年11月5日 | European Championships U20 | Limoges | ||||||||
1 | N | PIERUCCI Giuseppe | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | MERCIER Antoine | 1977 | M | FRA | AUBERVILLIER (FRA) | ||
3 | N | JAMROZ Lukasz | 1977 | M | POL | |||
3 | N | RAMACCI Marco | 1977 | M | ITA | |||
1995年11月9日 - 1995年11月9日 | European Championships U20 | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | SCHACHE Lars | 1976 | M | GER | TV Markkleeberg (GER) | |||
2 | N | SZUCHNICKI Wojciech | 1976 | M | POL | |||
3 | N | SCHLECHTWEG Christian | 1976 | M | GER | |||
4 | N | EGOROV Viatcheslav | 1976 | M | RUS | |||
1994年11月11日 - 1994年11月13日 | European Championships U20 | Krakow | ||||||||
1 | SANZO Salvatore | 1975 | M | ITA | [i] CS CARABINIERI ROMA (ITA) | |||
2 | SCHLECHTWEG Christian | 1976 | M | GER | ||||
3 | EGOROV Viatcheslav | 1976 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | LEFEBVRE Tristan | 1976 | M | FRA | GONESSE (FRA) | |||
1993年10月30日 - 1993年10月31日 | European Championships | Estoril | ||||||||
1 | TADDEI Lorenzo | 1975 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | HEIN Sven | 1974 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | AIOUPOV Vadim | 1974 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | ROTH Yaron | 1974 | M | ISR | ||||
1992年10月31日 - 1992年11月2日 | European Championships U20 | Innsbruck | ||||||||
1 | MARSI Mark | 1973 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | LUDWIG Michael | 1972 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3 | ANDERSEN-PRYCE Rama | 1973 | M | DEN | Frederiksberg Slots FK (DEN) | |||
3 | TADDEI Lorenzo | 1975 | M | ITA |