olympics | ||
---|---|---|
0 | 1 | 0 |
Campeonatos Mundiais | ||
---|---|---|
2 | 1 | 0 |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 26/08/1972 / 11/09/1972 | München | Olympic Games | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 12/07/1978 / 22/07/1978 | Hamburg | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
5 | 12/07/1978 / 22/07/1978 | Hamburg | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 14/07/1977 / 24/07/1977 | Buenos Aires | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
6 | 14/07/1977 / 24/07/1977 | Buenos Aires | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 04/07/1971 / 17/07/1971 | Wien | World Championships | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
7 | 08/04/1966 / 11/04/1966 | Vienna | World Championships | Sabre masculino U20 Individual |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 20/03/1982 / 21/03/1982 | Hannover | World Cup | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
4 | 14/03/1981 / 15/03/1981 | Hannover | World Cup | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
7 | 23/01/1981 / 26/01/1981 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
17 | 25/01/1980 / 28/01/1980 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
4 | 25/01/1980 / 28/01/1980 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
7 | 12/05/1979 / 13/05/1979 | Padua | Trophée Luxardo | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
13 | 07/04/1979 / 08/04/1979 | Hamburg | Coat of Hamburg | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
6 | 25/01/1979 / 28/01/1979 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
5 | 21/04/1978 / 23/04/1978 | Budapest | Coupe Hungaria | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
25 | 11/03/1978 / 12/03/1978 | Hannover | Coat of Hamburg | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
7 | 26/01/1978 / 29/01/1978 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
9 | 12/03/1977 / 13/03/1977 | Hamburg | Coat of Hamburg | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
6 | 15/05/1976 / 16/05/1976 | Padua | Trophée Luxardo | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
2 | 24/01/1976 / 27/01/1976 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
6 | 24/01/1976 / 27/01/1976 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 14/02/1974 / 17/02/1974 | Moscow | Sabre of Moscow | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
1 | 15/08/1973 / 25/08/1973 | Moscow | Summer Universiade | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe | |
7 | 13/05/1972 / 14/05/1972 | Padua | Trophée Luxardo | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
6 | 05/05/1972 / 07/05/1972 | Budapest | Coupe Hungaria | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
3 | 30/04/1971 / 02/05/1971 | Budapest | Coupe Hungaria | Sabre masculino Senior Individual | |
1 | 26/08/1970 / 05/09/1970 | Torino | Summer Universiade | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe |
Rank | Data | Competição | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 18/03/1978 / 19/03/1978 | Hamburg | 7-Nationen-Turnier | Sabre masculino Senior Equipe |
Temporada |
---|
wins Poule |
losses Poule |
wins Eliminatória Direta |
losses Eliminatória Direta |
total hits |
average hits winning Poule |
average hits losing Poule |
average hits winning Eliminatória Direta |
average hits losing Eliminatória Direta |
Temporada | selection | Disciplina | Federação | trainingcenter | Treinador |
---|
Clube | Tipo | Início | Fim |
---|
All information is supplied without liability and all obligation. Competition results are only available for events providing digital result data to Ophardt Online.