Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11 paź 2023 - 16 paź 2023 | World Championships Veterans | Daytona Beach | ||||||||
1 | N | LUNDBORG Mark | 1960 | M | USA | |||
2 | N | KAS Geza | 1958 | M | FRA | |||
3 | N | FEIRA CHIOS Alberto | 1959 | M | ITA | Fides Livorno (ITA) | ||
3 | N | HECK Steven | 1961 | M | USA | |||
6 paź 2022 - 12 paź 2022 | World Championships Veterans | Zadar | ||||||||
1 | N | LUNDBORG Mark | 1960 | M | USA | |||
2 | N | FEIRA CHIOS Alberto | 1959 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | RUNYAN Joshua | 1958 | M | USA | |||
3 | N | TAKACSY László | 1962 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | ||
5 paź 2019 - 11 paź 2019 | World Championships Veterans | Cairo | ||||||||
1 | N | RUNYAN Joshua | 1958 | M | USA | |||
2 | N | KAS Geza | 1958 | M | FRA | |||
3 | N | BUSI Paolo | 1959 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | FEIRA CHIOS Alberto | 1959 | M | ITA | |||
8 paź 2018 - 14 paź 2018 | World Championships Veterans | Livorno | ||||||||
1 | N | KAS Geza | 1958 | M | FRA | |||
2 | N | YUNG Wang Yip | 1950 | M | HKG | |||
3 | N | ANTINORO Enrico | 1955 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | RUNYAN Joshua | 1958 | M | USA | |||
16 paź 2017 - 21 paź 2017 | World Championships Veterans | Maribor | ||||||||
1 | PAROLI Giulio | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | ANTINORO Enrico | 1955 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | BADGER Carlton | 1956 | M | USA | ||||
3 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
11 paź 2016 - 16 paź 2016 | World Championships Veterans | Stralsund | ||||||||
1 | ANTINORO Enrico | 1955 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
3 | PAROLI Giulio | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | PREIS Paul | 1955 | M | GER | CTG Koblenz (GER) | |||
20 paź 2015 - 25 paź 2015 | Weltmeisterschaft der Veteranen | Limoges | ||||||||
1 | ANTINORO Enrico | 1955 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
3 | LOISEAU Eric | 1955 | M | FRA | ALENCON DUCS (FRA) | |||
3 | STREB Joseph | 1952 | M | USA | ||||
21 paź 2014 - 26 paź 2014 | Weltmeisterschaft der Veteranen | Debrecen | ||||||||
1 | PARISI Pasquale | 1953 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | YUNG Wang Yip | 1950 | M | HKG | ||||
3 | PELE Patrick | 1951 | M | FRA | JOUE TOURS (FRA) | |||
3 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
1 paź 2013 - 6 paź 2013 | Weltmeisterschaft der Veteranen | Varna | ||||||||
1 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
2 | PAROLI Giulio | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | BONEHILL Richard | 1949 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | FILIPPI Fabrizio | 1946 | M | ITA | ||||
17 paź 2012 - 21 paź 2012 | Weltmeisterschaft der Veteranen | Krems | ||||||||
1 | PAROLI Giulio | 1952 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | STREB Joseph | 1952 | M | USA | ||||
3 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
3 | YUNG Wang Yip | 1950 | M | HKG | ||||
27 wrz 2011 - 2 paź 2011 | World Championships Veterans | Porec | ||||||||
1 | YUNG Wang Yip | 1950 | M | HKG | ||||
2 | COHEN Richard | 1947 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | HELFRICHT Helmut | 1948 | M | GER | FC Leipzig (GER) | |||
3 | SEUSS David | 1950 | M | USA | ||||
28 wrz 2010 - 29 wrz 2010 | World Championships Veterans | Porec | ||||||||
1 | BONEHILL Richard | 1949 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | SEXTON III Ray L. | 1943 | M | USA | ||||
3 | CARMINA Riccardo | 1948 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | FILIPPI Fabrizio | 1946 | M | ITA | ||||
24 wrz 2009 - 25 wrz 2009 | World Championships Veterans | Moscow | ||||||||
1 | COHEN Richard | 1947 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | PANON Patrice | 1946 | M | FRA | PARIS ESCRIM (FRA) | |||
3 | FILIPPI Fabrizio | 1946 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SEXTON III Ray L. | 1943 | M | USA | ||||
2 paź 2008 - 3 paź 2008 | Championnats du Monde Veterans | Limoges | ||||||||
1 | COHEN Richard | 1947 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | APOSTOL Paul | 1945 | M | USA | ||||
3 | BARON Peter | 1942 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | SEXTON III Ray L. | 1943 | M | USA | ||||
14 wrz 2007 - 15 wrz 2007 | World Championships Veterans | Sydney | ||||||||
1 | APOSTOL Paul | 1945 | M | USA | ||||
2 | BOITE Patrick | 1942 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | KOVACS Alexander | 1947 | M | USA | ||||
3 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
1 wrz 2006 - 2 wrz 2006 | World Championships Veterans | Bath | ||||||||
1 | APOSTOL Paul | 1945 | M | USA | ||||
2 | PINKUS Lawrence | 1945 | M | USA | ||||
3 | BORNEMISZA Andras | 1945 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | VOLKMANN Rudy | 1942 | M | USA | ||||
2 wrz 2005 - 3 wrz 2005 | World Championships Veterans | Tampa | ||||||||
1 | PINKUS Lawrence | 1945 | M | USA | ||||
2 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
3 | BOITE Patrick | 1942 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | CHABOISSEAU Andre | 1945 | M | FRA | NIORT CE (FRA) | |||
3 wrz 2004 - 4 wrz 2004 | World Championships Veterans | Krems | ||||||||
1 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
2 | ESSER Karl-Heinz | 1938 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
3 | CAWTON Malcolm P | 1942 | M | GBR | ||||
3 | HALL William | 1935 | M | USA | ||||
5 wrz 2003 - 7 wrz 2003 | Championnats du Monde Veterans | Limoges | ||||||||
1 | BARON Peter | 1942 | M | GBR | ||||
2 | HALL William | 1935 | M | USA | ||||
3 | ESSER Karl-Heinz | 1938 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
3 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
31 sie 2002 - 2 wrz 2002 | World Championships Veterans | Tampa | ||||||||
1 | HALL William | 1935 | M | USA | ||||
2 | FINE Marvin | 1935 | M | CAN | ||||
3 | GOERING William A. | 1932 | M | USA | ||||
3 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
1 wrz 2001 - 2 wrz 2001 | Championnats du Monde Veterans | Martinique | ||||||||
1 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
2 | KELM Jürgen | 1936 | M | GER | ||||
3 | GOERING William A. | 1932 | M | USA | ||||
3 | RAVELING Bette | 1936 | M | GER | TV Emden (GER) | |||
25 sie 2000 - 27 sie 2000 | World Championships Veterans | Godollo | ||||||||
1 | BAKONYI Peter | 1938 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | FINE Marvin | 1935 | M | CAN | ||||
3 | NETTINGSMEYER Wolf | 1937 | M | GER | TG Herford (GER) | |||
3 | RAVELING Bette | 1936 | M | GER | TV Emden (GER) | |||
25 sie 1999 - 29 sie 1999 | World Championships Veterans | Siofok | ||||||||
1 | KELM Jürgen | 1936 | M | GER | ||||
2 | SCHLICK Calvert | 1956 | M | USA | ||||
3 | ESSER Karl-Heinz | 1938 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
3 | FINE Marvin | 1935 | M | CAN |