Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feb 25, 2023 - Feb 26, 2023 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | N | AICHER Felix | 1989 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | ||
2 | N | SCHMAUZER Jürgen | 1984 | M | AUT | |||
Feb 22, 2020 - Feb 23, 2020 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | N | AICHER Felix | 1989 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | ||
Apr 2, 2016 - Apr 3, 2016 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | JAGODITSCH Klaus | 1972 | M | AUT | UFC Wien (AUT) | |||
2 | ALTINGER Jörg | 1975 | M | GER | TSV Speyer (GER) | |||
3 | TRIMMEL Johannes | 1975 | M | AUT | ASC Wien (AUT) | |||
Feb 28, 2015 - Mar 1, 2015 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | WANG Dominik | 1981 | M | AUT | ASVÖ FC Salzburg (AUT) | |||
2 | GOMORI Csaba | 1979 | M | HUN | Terezvaros (HUN) | |||
Mar 1, 2014 - Mar 2, 2014 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | GOMORI Csaba | 1979 | M | HUN | Terezvaros (HUN) | |||
Feb 16, 2013 - Feb 17, 2013 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | BLASCHKA Robert | 1958 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
1 | GERENCSER Ondrej | 1948 | M | SVK | ||||
1 | SAGHY Ervin | 1976 | M | HUN | Budakalasz (HUN) | |||
1 | SZONTAGH Tribor | 1949 | M | AUT | ASC Wien (AUT) | |||
2 | CSAK Attila | 1961 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | VADASZ Laszlo | 1947 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | HRUBESCH Friedrich | 1960 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
4 | LUBY Ludovit | 1958 | M | SVK | ||||
May 5, 2012 - May 6, 2012 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | HRUBESCH Andreas | 1956 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
1 | POSCHARNIG Josef | 1941 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | HRUBESCH Friedrich | 1960 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
2 | MAIER Walter | 1940 | M | AUT | ATUS Weiz (AUT) | |||
3 | LANGE Wieland | 1949 | M | AUT | FK Spittal (AUT) | |||
3 | PRYBILA Thomas | 1962 | M | AUT | ASC Wien (AUT) | |||
Oct 30, 2004 - Oct 31, 2004 | Otto-Sokopp-Gedenkturnier | Wien | ||||||||
1 | BLASCHKA Robert | 1958 | M | AUT | StLFC Graz (AUT) | |||
2 | HRUBESCH Andreas | 1956 | M | AUT | FU Krems (AUT) | |||
3 | BARZ Mathias | 1963 | M | SUI | UFC Wien (AUT) | |||
3 | PETERS Jens | 1968 | M | GER | TV Wetzlar (GER) |