rank | status | pool | name | yob | gender | nation | club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6 giu 2024 - 9 giu 2024 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | GRUNERT Adrian | 2007 | M | SVK | |||
3 | N | KNEPP Matej | 2006 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 giu 2023 - 4 giu 2023 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KNEPP Matej | 2006 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SZALAY Jan | 1992 | M | SVK | BA - M.P.C. Slovakia (SVK) | ||
3 | N | ZENTKO Matej Tadeas | 2001 | M | SVK | Willard Kosice (SVK) | ||
2 giu 2022 - 5 giu 2022 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | STOLAR Samuel | 1998 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | ONDO Daniel | 2005 | M | SVK | Willard Kosice (SVK) | ||
27 ago 2021 - 29 ago 2021 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | STOLAR Samuel | 1998 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SZALAY Jan | 1992 | M | SVK | BA - M.P.C. Slovakia (SVK) | ||
7 giu 2019 - 9 giu 2019 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SOPOLIGA Michal | 2002 | M | SVK | KSK 1903 Kosice (SVK) | ||
3 | N | STEIS Lukas | 1995 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
8 giu 2018 - 10 giu 2018 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | STEIS Lukas | 1995 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 giu 2017 - 4 giu 2017 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | SZALAY Jan | 1992 | M | SVK | BA - M.P.C. Slovakia (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DUDUC Alex | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JOHANIDES Lukas Jakub | 1999 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
29 mag 2016 - 29 mag 2016 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | STEIS Lukas | 1995 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
2 | N | FISER Juraj | 1978 | M | SVK | STU Modern Pentathlon (SVK) | ||
3 | N | DRENCAK Adam | 1999 | M | SVK | KSK 1903 Kosice (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KARKALIK Matej | 1991 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
30 mag 2015 - 31 mag 2015 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | FISER Juraj | 1978 | M | SVK | STU Modern Pentathlon (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KARKALIK Matej | 1991 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BERKA Adam | 1982 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JURCACKO Viktor | 1982 | M | SVK | |||
1 giu 2014 - 1 giu 2014 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | FISER Juraj | 1978 | M | SVK | STU Modern Pentathlon (SVK) | ||
2 | N | ILLE Ondrej | 1993 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | RECLO Martin | 1998 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
3 | N | STEIS Lukas | 1995 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
1 giu 2013 - 2 giu 2013 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | CIPAR Stefan | 1988 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | FISER Juraj | 1978 | M | SVK | STU Modern Pentathlon (SVK) | ||
3 | N | CIPAR Jan | 1997 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | STEIS Lukas | 1995 | M | SVK | Akademia sermu (SVK) | ||
2 giu 2012 - 2 giu 2012 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | FARMER Alexander-Bryan | 1994 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | FISER Juraj | 1978 | M | SVK | STU Modern Pentathlon (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BUJNOVSKY Branislav | 1979 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | ILLE Ondrej | 1993 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
18 giu 2011 - 19 giu 2011 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | ILLE Ondrej | 1993 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | CIPAR Stefan | 1988 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BUJNOVSKY Branislav | 1979 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SETNICKY Ladislav | 1985 | M | SVK | |||
12 dic 2009 - 13 dic 2009 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | BOLEDOVIC Ivan | 1965 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | ILLE Ondrej | 1993 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BUJNOVSKY Branislav | 1979 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KAPRAL Martin | 1993 | M | SVK | KS Snina (SVK) | ||
13 dic 2008 - 14 dic 2008 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | ERSEK Attila | 1984 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | BOKES Tomas | 1984 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BENO Lubomir | 1983 | M | SVK | |||
3 | N | BOLEDOVIC Ivan | 1965 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
8 dic 2007 - 9 dic 2007 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | ERSEK Attila | 1984 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | BENO Lubomir | 1983 | M | SVK | |||
3 | N | BOKES Tomas | 1984 | M | SVK | BSK Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BOLEDOVIC Ivan | 1965 | M | SVK | Slavia UK Bratislava (SVK) |