rank | status | pool | name | yob | gender | nation | club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
22 giu 2024 - 23 giu 2024 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | DERGAY David | 2004 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | ||
2 | N | TIMOSHENKO Kirill | 1990 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | ||
3 | N | BELLMANN Achim | 1957 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | ||
3 | N | TRÜTZSCHLER V. FALKENSTEIN Alexander | 1973 | M | GER | Heidelberger FC/TSG R. (GER) | ||
24 giu 2023 - 25 giu 2023 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | BITSCH Peter | 1996 | M | GER | Heidelberger FC/TSG R. (GER) | ||
2 | N | DERGAY David | 2004 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | ||
3 | N | BELLMANN Achim | 1957 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | ||
3 | N | WIESEMANN Johannes | 1990 | M | GER | Darmstädter FC (GER) | ||
18 giu 2022 - 19 giu 2022 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | DERGAY David | 2004 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | ||
2 | N | BAEDEKER Frank | 1966 | M | GER | TV Ingolstadt (GER) | ||
3 | N | LANDAVERE Alex | 1991 | M | PER | Nürnberger FC (GER) | ||
3 | N | LEHMANN Frank | 1986 | M | GER | BW Schneidhain (GER) | ||
29 giu 2019 - 30 giu 2019 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | N | BITSCH Peter | 1996 | M | GER | Darmstädter FC (GER) | ||
2 | N | TIMOSHENKO Kirill | 1990 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | ||
3 | N | LAUE Richard | 2000 | M | GER | HC Bad Dürkheim (GER) | ||
3 | N | WIESEMANN Johannes | 1990 | M | GER | Darmstädter FC (GER) | ||
23 giu 2018 - 24 giu 2018 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | WIESEMANN Johannes | 1990 | M | GER | Darmstädter FC (GER) | |||
2 | TALAN Jan | 2000 | M | GER | TV Augsburg (GER) | |||
3 | FISCHER Lukas | 1990 | M | GER | MTV München (GER) | |||
3 | MARKUS Daniel | 1967 | M | GER | TV Augsburg (GER) | |||
24 giu 2017 - 25 giu 2017 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | WEIDLICH Reinhard | 1992 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | |||
2 | DAHLHAUS Lukas | 1995 | M | GER | FC Kassel (GER) | |||
3 | KONDRING Philipp | 1998 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | WECKERLE Tobias | 2000 | M | GER | SV Böblingen (GER) | |||
4 giu 2016 - 5 giu 2016 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | BITSCH Peter | 1996 | M | GER | Darmstädter FC (GER) | |||
2 | HEIDENREICH Christian | 1986 | M | GER | SV Böblingen (GER) | |||
3 | MARKUS Daniel | 1967 | M | GER | TV Augsburg (GER) | |||
3 | WEIDLICH Reinhard | 1992 | M | GER | Frankfurter TV (GER) | |||
13 giu 2015 - 14 giu 2015 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | PEIGNET Frederic | 1988 | M | FRA | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
2 | UNTERHAUSER Samuel | 1997 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | DRESCHER Tim | 1990 | M | GER | TG Schweinfurt (GER) | |||
3 | MESZAROS Maximilian | 1998 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
31 mag 2014 - 1 giu 2014 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | BRAND Andreas | 1979 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
2 | FERNANDEZ PEREZ Javier | 1998 | M | ESP | SAE-M (ESP) | |||
3 | BAEDEKER Frank | 1966 | M | GER | TV Ingolstadt (GER) | |||
3 | LEHMANN Frank | 1986 | M | GER | FC Regensburg (GER) | |||
22 giu 2013 - 23 giu 2013 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | SCHMIDT Richard | 1992 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
2 | PEIGNET Frederic | 1988 | M | FRA | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
3 | GIERISCH Sven | 1987 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | MEYER Sebastian | 1983 | M | GER | FS TG Würzburg (GER) | |||
23 giu 2012 - 24 giu 2012 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | HERZBERG Fabian | 1988 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | |||
2 | PEIGNET Frederic | 1988 | M | FRA | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
3 | HALLER Rudolf | 1991 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
3 | STUMPF Janek | 1995 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 lug 2011 - 3 lug 2011 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | LEHMANN Frank | 1986 | M | GER | FC Regensburg (GER) | |||
2 | OBERSON Philippe | 1992 | M | SUI | BFC Basel (SUI) | |||
3 | DRESCHER Tim | 1990 | M | GER | TG Schweinfurt (GER) | |||
3 | HERZBERG Fabian | 1988 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | |||
12 giu 2010 - 13 giu 2010 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | KECK Maximilian | 1990 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
2 | BÖHM Constantin | 1991 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | LAUNER Steffen | 1986 | M | GER | SV Böblingen (GER) | |||
3 | WILLIS Jonathan | 1981 | M | GBR | ||||
20 giu 2009 - 21 giu 2009 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | GREINER Stefan | 1977 | M | GER | SV Böblingen (GER) | |||
2 | TRAN Te-Mao | 1988 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | BAYER Thorsten | 1984 | M | GER | FC Offenbach (GER) | |||
3 | HERZBERG Fabian | 1988 | M | GER | TSV Bayer 04 Leverkusen (GER) | |||
14 giu 2008 - 15 giu 2008 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | ACKERMANN Norman | 1983 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | FIEDLER Jörg | 1978 | M | GER | FC Leipzig (GER) | |||
3 | SCHMID Sven | 1978 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | ZUBEL Marius | 1988 | M | GER | TSV Laupheim (GER) | |||
10 giu 2000 - 11 giu 2000 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | QUANZ Guido | 1966 | M | GER | ||||
3 | OTT Dominik | 1983 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | PRASKI Christian | 1982 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
12 giu 1999 - 13 giu 1999 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | ACKERMANN Norman | 1983 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
2 | SCHNEIDER Achim | 1981 | M | GER | SV Böblingen (GER) | |||
3 | FRÖHLICH Oliver | 1967 | M | GER | Wiesbadener FC (GER) | |||
4 | KLUGE Rainer | 1958 | M | GER | ||||
7 giu 1997 - 8 giu 1997 | Würzburger Stadtwappen | Würzburg | ||||||||
1 | SCHMIDT Fabian | 1975 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
2 | ERNST Florian | 1979 | M | GER | Heidenheimer SB (GER) | |||
3 | MUSTER Jens | 1971 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
4 | FRÖHLICH Oliver | 1967 | M | GER | Wiesbadener FC (GER) |