rank | status | pool | name | yob | γένος | nation | σωματείο | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mar 30, 2019 - Mar 30, 2019 | Sydsvenska Cupen - Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | GUSTAFSSON Elias | 2004 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
2 | N | FORSMAN Emil | 2005 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | ||
3 | N | OXHOLM WAGNER Alec | 2005 | M | DEN | Glostrup FK (DEN) | ||
3 | N | SIMONSSON Erik | 2004 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | ||
Mar 3, 2018 - Mar 3, 2018 | Sydsvenska Cupen - Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | FRIDH Simon | 2003 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
2 | ENGVALL Olle | 2003 | M | SWE | HFS Halmstad (SWE) | |||
3 | BJÖRKBÄCK Adam | 2004 | M | SWE | A6 Jönköping (SWE) | |||
3 | GUSTAFSSON Elias | 2004 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
Mar 4, 2017 - Mar 4, 2017 | Sydsvenska Cupen - Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | BJÖRKBÄCK Erik | 2002 | M | SWE | A6 Jönköping (SWE) | |||
2 | TORESTEN Mikael | 2002 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
3 | ENGSTRAND Theodor | 2003 | M | SWE | ARA Helsingborg (SWE) | |||
3 | ENGVALL Olle | 2003 | M | SWE | HFS Halmstad (SWE) | |||
Mar 15, 2014 - Mar 16, 2014 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | MAGNUSSON Jakob | 1999 | M | SWE | A6 Jönköping (SWE) | |||
2 | POUSETTE Hugo | 2001 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | ANGELSTEN Richard | 1999 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | |||
3 | GRANEVIK Gunnar | 2000 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
Mar 16, 2013 - Mar 17, 2013 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | GAHM Oscar | 1998 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | MATTSSON Axel | 1998 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | ||
3 | N | DEJENFELT Tobias | 1998 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | ||
3 | N | GUSTAFSSON Viktor | 1998 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | ||
Mar 17, 2012 - Mar 18, 2012 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | KIMFORS Anton | 1997 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | GAHM Oscar | 1998 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | JOHANSSON Tim | 1998 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
3 | VON HAARTMAN Max | 1997 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
Mar 19, 2011 - Mar 20, 2011 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | DEJENFELT Rasmus | 1996 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
2 | KARLSSON Fredrik | 1996 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
3 | WEDIN Gustav | 1996 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | |||
3 | WIRSTAD GUSTAFSSON Valentin | 1997 | M | SWE | KF99 Kungsbacka (SWE) | |||
Mar 13, 2010 - Mar 14, 2010 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | NYGÅRD Oskar | 1995 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | BERG NIEMELÄ Elias | 1996 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | LINDE Joakim | 1995 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | NIKLASSON Carl | 1995 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | ||
Mar 14, 2009 - Mar 15, 2009 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | EGERTZ SKAANES Lukas | 1994 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | RIZELL Simon | 1994 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
3 | N | BERG NIEMELÄ Elias | 1996 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | HAGLUND Daniel | 1994 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 15, 2008 - Mar 16, 2008 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | CRUZ Roberto | 1994 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | ||
2 | N | MAREND Alexander | 1993 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | ||
3 | N | LINDE Johan | 1993 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
3 | N | WARG Jonathan | 1993 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 10, 2007 - Mar 11, 2007 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | EGELUND Alexander S. | 1993 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | ||
2 | N | LYDH Alexander | 1992 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | EGERTZ SKAANES Oskar | 1992 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | WARG Jonathan | 1993 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 11, 2006 - Mar 12, 2006 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | EKSTRÖM Gustav | 1991 | M | SWE | WFF Örebro (SWE) | ||
2 | N | SÄRLAND Emil | 1991 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | LUNDBERG Viktor | 1993 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | MÅNSSON Rasmus | 1991 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 5, 2005 - Mar 6, 2005 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | KARLSSON Philip | 1990 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | SAMUELSSON Anton | 1990 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | LOMBACH Wilhelm | 1990 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | ÖSTERBERG Carl David | 1990 | M | SWE | |||
Mar 6, 2004 - Mar 7, 2004 | Lingiaden | Ljungby | ||||||||
1 | N | LANDÉN Richard | 1989 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | LINDQVIST Joakim | 1989 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | ||
3 | N | EKBERG VEMMER Jais Emil | 1989 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
3 | N | SCHMIDT Christian Nis | 1989 | M | DEN | FK Mahaut (DEN) |