rank | status | pool | name | yob | γένος | nation | σωματείο | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jun 1, 2001 - Jun 2, 2001 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SZNAJDER Rafal | 1972 | M | POL | ||||
3 | CASERTA Raffaello | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | COVALIU Mihai | 1977 | M | ROU | ||||
Jun 2, 2000 - Jun 3, 2000 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | FERJANCSIK Domonkos | 1975 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | KOEVES Csaba | 1966 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | CASERTA Raffaello | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SZNAJDER Rafal | 1972 | M | POL | ||||
Jun 12, 1999 - Jun 13, 1999 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | CASERTA Raffaello | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | PILLET Julien | 1977 | M | FRA | STRASBOURG UC (FRA) | |||
3 | KALUZHNIY Vladimir | 1972 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | SEGUIN Cedric | 1973 | M | FRA | ||||
Jun 6, 1998 - Jun 7, 1998 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
2 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | CASERTA Raffaello | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | POZDNYAKOV Stanislav | 1973 | M | RUS | ||||
Oct 19, 1996 - Oct 20, 1996 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | TOUYA Damien | 1975 | M | FRA | ||||
2 | LUPEICA Alin-Florin | 1973 | M | ROU | ||||
3 | BOROS Gyorgy | 1971 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
Oct 14, 1995 - Oct 16, 1995 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | NAVARETTE Jozsef | 1965 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | TERENZI Tonhi | 1969 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
3 | DAURELLE Jean philippe | 1963 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | |||
3 | SZABO Bence | 1962 | M | HUN | ||||
Oct 8, 1994 - Oct 9, 1994 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | TARANTINO Luigi | 1972 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | CHARIKOV Serguei | 1974 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | SZABO Vilmos | 1964 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | TERENZI Tonhi | 1969 | M | ITA | [i] CS Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) | |||
Oct 9, 1993 - Oct 10, 1993 | Memorial Rohony | Bucharest | ||||||||
1 | SZABO Vilmos | 1964 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
2 | CHARIKOV Serguei | 1974 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | EIFLER Ulrich | 1961 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | |||
3 | GAUREANU Dan-Victor | 1967 | M | ROU |