ranking | status | erä | name | yob | sukupuoli | Maa | Seura | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
9.4.2022 - 10.4.2022 | Graines d'Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | Q | MUMENTHALER Bastien | 2010 | M | SUI | CEFL Florimont (SUI) | ||
2 | Q | MATHIER Tilo | 2010 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | Q | FAVRE Anatole | 2011 | M | SUI | CES Sierre (SUI) | ||
3 | Q | PIRA Julian | 2010 | M | SUI | FECB Baden (SUI) | ||
30.3.2019 - 31.3.2019 | Graines d'Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | N | WICHT Gianluca | 2007 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | MAEDER Manech | 2007 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FELTGEN Erwan | 2008 | M | SUI | CEM Morges (SUI) | ||
3 | N | FUA Emmanuel | 2007 | M | SUI | CEM Morges (SUI) | ||
24.3.2018 - 25.3.2018 | Graines d Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | PFEIFER Paul | 2006 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
2 | BERGER Jules | 2006 | M | SUI | CEM Morges (SUI) | |||
3 | FAVRE Arthur | 2006 | M | SUI | CES Sierre (SUI) | |||
3 | FAVRE Aurélien | 2008 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | |||
25.3.2017 - 26.3.2017 | Graines d Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | CLAUDE Joonas | 2005 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
2 | POIDEVIN Felix | 2006 | M | SUI | CES Sierre (SUI) | |||
3 | PFEIFER Paul | 2006 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | |||
3 | WICHT Gianluca | 2007 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
16.4.2016 - 17.4.2016 | Graines d Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | ORLANDO Noé | 2004 | M | SUI | BFC Basel (SUI) | |||
2 | AEBERSOLD Alban | 2004 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
3 | GARNIER Jules | 2004 | M | FRA | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | |||
3 | HÜRLIMANN David | 2004 | M | SUI | SESAF Fribourg (SUI) | |||
10.5.2014 - 11.5.2014 | Graines d Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | N | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
2 | N | CAVADINI Lazare | 2002 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | CASTEJON Davide Alejandro | 2002 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | VERONE Morgan | 2002 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
27.4.2013 - 28.4.2013 | Graines d Escrime Vaudois | St. Légier | ||||||||
1 | N | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | WICHT Matteo | 2002 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | DESSOLY Te Mana | 2001 | M | SUI | |||
3 | N | FRACHEBOUD Téo | 2001 | M | SUI |