Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
27. jan. 2024 - 28. jan. 2024 | Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | N | MUMENTHALER Bastien | 2010 | M | SUI | CEFL Florimont (SUI) | ||
2 | N | FORRER Thibaud | 2010 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | ||
3 | N | BOSSHARD Lionel | 2011 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GRUNER Kyle | 2010 | M | SUI | ZFC Zürich (SUI) | ||
28. jan. 2023 - 29. jan. 2023 | Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | N | STOLZ Arthur | 2009 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
2 | N | DESSIMOZ Martin | 2009 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ETTER William | 2009 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
3 | N | REGNAT Louis | 2009 | M | SUI | FCZ Zug (SUI) | ||
18. jan. 2020 - 19. jan. 2020 | Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | N | SQUIERI Juliano Nicola | 2007 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | SIMINSZKY Mark | 2006 | M | SUI | SEN Neuchâtel (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ISCHI Eric | 2006 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | ||
3 | N | POIDEVIN Felix | 2006 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
6. apr. 2019 - 7. apr. 2019 | Contre de Sixte | Marly | ||||||||
1 | N | PFEIFER Paul | 2006 | M | SUI | CEB Biel/Bienne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | WIDMER Neel | 2005 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | ||
3 | N | GRECU Ioan | 2005 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | ||
3 | N | ISCHI Eric | 2006 | M | SUI | SEVM Vevey (SUI) | ||
21. apr. 2018 - 22. apr. 2018 | Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | HÜRLIMANN David | 2004 | M | SUI | SESAF Fribourg (SUI) | |||
2 | AEBERSOLD Alban | 2004 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
3 | DEL CONTRASTO Nicolo' | 2004 | M | ITA | LUG Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | MOSER Dominik | 2004 | M | SUI | AFCB Bern (SUI) | |||
28. jan. 2017 - 29. jan. 2017 | CNJ Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | |||
2 | GERBER Jacob | 2003 | M | SUI | AFCB Bern (SUI) | |||
3 | FAVRE Aurèle | 2004 | M | SUI | CES Sierre (SUI) | |||
3 | RAMUZ Jeremy | 2003 | M | SUI | FCB Bern (SUI) | |||
23. jan. 2016 - 24. jan. 2016 | CNJ Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | SCHEUNER Joël | 2002 | M | SUI | SEB Basel (SUI) | |||
2 | HAURI Ian | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
3 | BROCHARD Théo | 2003 | M | SUI | SECH Chaux-de-Fonds (SUI) | |||
3 | WICHT Matteo | 2002 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | |||
12. jan. 2013 - 13. jan. 2013 | CNJ Contre de Sixte | Fribourg | ||||||||
1 | N | BONFERRONI Gabriel | 1999 | M | SUI | SEG Geneve (SUI) | ||
2 | N | SEYD Julian Dominic | 1999 | M | GER | |||
3 | N | LUTIN Antoine | 2000 | M | SUI | SES Sion (SUI) | ||
3 | N | MARZIALE Enrico | 2000 | M | SUI |