Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10. feb. 2024 - 11. feb. 2024 | 1 Prova Trofeo Granducato | Pisa | ||||||||
1 | N | BELLANI Luca | 2010 | M | ITA | CS Navacchio (ITA) | ||
2 | N | BELLINI Samuele | 2010 | M | ITA | CS La Spezia (ITA) | ||
3 | N | CANDEAGO Tommaso | 2010 | M | ITA | Scherma Mogliano (ITA) | ||
3 | N | PAGANELLI Bernardo nigel | 2011 | M | ITA | Pisascherma (ITA) | ||
21. jan. 2023 - 22. jan. 2023 | 1 Prova Trofeo Granducato | Siena | ||||||||
1 | N | PAPI Leonardo alberto | 2010 | M | ITA | Frascati Scherma (ITA) | ||
2 | N | ALTERI Davide | 2009 | M | ITA | Frascati Scherma (ITA) | ||
3 | N | MAIO Fabrizio | 2009 | M | ITA | Giulio Verne Scherma (ITA) | ||
3 | N | ORSELLI Giovanni | 2010 | M | ITA | Acc. Schermistica Fiorentina (ITA) | ||
13. okt. 2019 - 13. okt. 2019 | Trofeo Granducato Prova 1 | Pisa | ||||||||
1 | N | FAVARO Andrea | 2006 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | FORMICHINI BIGI Lorenzo Maria | 2006 | M | ITA | Acc. Schermistica Fiorentina (ITA) | ||
3 | N | POGGIO Jacopo | 2007 | M | ITA | SC Torino (ITA) | ||
3 | N | SCALORA Fernando | 2006 | M | ITA | Scherma Modica (ITA) | ||
7. okt. 2018 - 7. okt. 2018 | Trofeo Granducato Prova 1 | Pisa | ||||||||
1 | N | PETRACCHI Filippo | 2005 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | LO STORTO Giovanni | 2005 | M | ITA | CdS Terni (ITA) | ||
3 | N | FRANZESE Tommaso | 2005 | M | ITA | CS Aretino (ITA) | ||
3 | N | IACOMONI Matteo | 2005 | M | ITA | Pisascherma (ITA) | ||
19. nov. 2017 - 19. nov. 2017 | Trofeo Granducato Prova 1 | Pisa | ||||||||
1 | N | CIANI Joel | 2004 | M | ITA | Frascati Scherma (ITA) | ||
2 | N | FORMICHINI BIGI Carlo Tommaso | 2004 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | COLONNELLI Gabriele | 2004 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | SIDOTI Francesco | 2004 | M | ITA | Pisascherma (ITA) | ||
20. nov. 2016 - 20. nov. 2016 | 1 Prova Trofeo Granducato | Pisa | ||||||||
1 | N | PALMERINI Gregorio | 2003 | M | ITA | Fides Livorno (ITA) | ||
2 | N | ADOUL Raian | 2003 | M | ITA | SC Ancona (ITA) | ||
3 | N | ARINGHIERI Francesco | 2003 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | DI VEROLI Damiano | 2003 | M | ITA | Fiamme Oro Roma (ITA) |