Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6. jun. 2024 - 9. jun. 2024 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | FAZEKAS Arpad | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KUCHTA Leopold Marc | 2003 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | LANCARIC Branislav | 2006 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3. sep. 2022 - 3. sep. 2022 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | FAZEKAS Arpad | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | GYÖRGY Bendeguz | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | PIRK Akos | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
18. sep. 2021 - 19. sep. 2021 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | GYÖRGY Bendeguz | 2004 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
6. jun. 2019 - 9. jun. 2019 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SARMANY Zoltan | 2002 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
8. jun. 2018 - 10. jun. 2018 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2. jun. 2017 - 4. jun. 2017 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | SERRI Cedrik | 1991 | M | SVK | |||
2 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
11. jun. 2016 - 11. jun. 2016 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | FARKAS Attila | 1972 | M | CZE | |||
23. maj 2015 - 23. maj 2015 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | BLANAR Samuel | 1994 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | SIMEUNOVIC Rastislav | 1995 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
31. maj 2014 - 31. maj 2014 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | EGYENES PORSOK Henrik | 1999 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
29. maj 2013 - 29. maj 2013 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VILEM Michal | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
10. jun. 2012 - 10. jun. 2012 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
11. jun. 2011 - 11. jun. 2011 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | FORGACH Peter | 1979 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | NAGY Jozef | 1966 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VEGH David | 1995 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
19. jun. 2010 - 19. jun. 2010 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | LELKES Peter | 1984 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
20. jun. 2009 - 20. jun. 2009 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | VILEM Michal | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
21. jun. 2008 - 21. jun. 2008 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | HORONY Tamas | 1985 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK Andrej | 1991 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | MEZEY Ladislav | 1983 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
9. jun. 2007 - 9. jun. 2007 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | JONIAK Jakub | 1990 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
2 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | CELLER Pavol | 1989 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) | ||
3 | N | HORVATH Michal | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
29. dec. 2006 - 29. dec. 2006 | Majstrovstvá Slovenska | Samorin | ||||||||
1 | N | DOMSITZ Tibor | 1988 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
2 | N | NAGY Jozef | 1966 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | BOTLO Balint | 1985 | M | SVK | KS Samorin (SVK) | ||
3 | N | KRALIK David | 1975 | M | SVK | Slavia STU Bratislava (SVK) |