Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
30. maj 2024 - 2. jun. 2024 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Verona | ||||||||
1 | N | VERDOLIVA Vittorio | 1998 | M | ITA | Ager Nucerinus (ITA) | ||
2 | N | RUOCCO Ciro Maria | 1995 | M | ITA | Ager Nucerinus (ITA) | ||
3 | N | CIMINAGHI Simone | 1993 | M | ITA | Acc. Scherma Milano (ITA) | ||
3 | N | GAZZEA Umberto | 1985 | M | ITA | Petrarca Scherma (ITA) | ||
4. maj 2023 - 7. maj 2023 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Cagliari | ||||||||
1 | N | SARCINA Alessio Orazio | 1987 | M | ITA | Comando Aeronautica Militare Roma (ITA) | ||
2 | N | BIONDI Simone | 1992 | M | ITA | SC Roma (ITA) | ||
3 | N | BODRIA Francesco | 1995 | M | ITA | SC La Farnesiana (ITA) | ||
3 | N | CIMINAGHI Simone | 1993 | M | ITA | Acc. Scherma Milano (ITA) | ||
9. jun. 2022 - 12. jun. 2022 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Courmayeur | ||||||||
1 | N | MAZZONI Giacomo | 1993 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | SALIS Luca | 1986 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | GAMBINI Giacomo | 1993 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | MURANA Luca | 1992 | M | ITA | [i] Chiti Scherma Pistoia (ITA) | ||
24. jun. 2021 - 27. jun. 2021 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Bressanone | ||||||||
1 | N | BENEDETTO Enrico-Maria | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | LISPI Alessandro | 1993 | M | ITA | [i] Gaudini Roma ASD (ITA) | ||
3 | N | CARVAJAL Jesus | 1995 | M | VEN | |||
3 | N | DI GIULIO Giacomo Emanuele | 1991 | M | ITA | |||
1. maj 2019 - 4. maj 2019 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Casale Montferrato | ||||||||
1 | N | FILIPPI Gianluca | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | LISPI Alessandro | 1993 | M | ITA | [i] Gaudini Roma ASD (ITA) | ||
3 | N | BENEDETTO Enrico-Maria | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BERNARDINI Nicola | 1984 | M | ITA | |||
1. jun. 2018 - 4. jun. 2018 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Trieste | ||||||||
1 | N | NICASSIO Davide | 1988 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | BENEDETTO Enrico-Maria | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | FESTA Marco | 1985 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | MICHELI Matteo | 1987 | M | ITA | |||
2. jun. 2017 - 5. jun. 2017 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Longarone | ||||||||
1 | N | FILIPPI Gianluca | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | BIANCHI Fabio | 1986 | M | ITA | [i] CS ARICCIA (ITA) | ||
3 | N | LISPI Alessandro | 1993 | M | ITA | [i] Gaudini Roma ASD (ITA) | ||
3 | N | NICASSIO Davide | 1988 | M | ITA | |||
28. maj 2016 - 29. maj 2016 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Rimini | ||||||||
1 | N | FORCELLA Raffaele | 1984 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | ||
2 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | NICASSIO Davide | 1988 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | PINTALDI Filippo | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
5. jun. 2015 - 8. jun. 2015 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Pistoia | ||||||||
1 | N | FORCELLA Raffaele | 1984 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | ||
2 | N | BENEDETTO Enrico-Maria | 1989 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | NICASSIO Davide | 1988 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | ZARRA Nicola | 1987 | M | ITA | |||
6. jun. 2014 - 10. jun. 2014 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Pistoia | ||||||||
1 | N | FORCELLA Raffaele | 1984 | M | ITA | [i] AERONAUTICA ROMA (ITA) | ||
2 | N | CASAGLIA Gabriele | 1981 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | RAMENGHI Tommaso | 1983 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | ZANELLATO Lorenzo | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
7. jun. 2013 - 9. jun. 2013 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Montecatini Terme | ||||||||
1 | N | VENDITTI Gaspare Lorenzo | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | LABBOZZETTA Mauro | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | ROSSETTO Alberto | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
1. jun. 2012 - 3. jun. 2012 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Montecatini Terme | ||||||||
1 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | MOCHI Mauro | 1981 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | LABBOZZETTA Mauro | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | ZANELLATO Lorenzo | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
17. jun. 2011 - 19. jun. 2011 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Montecatini Terme | ||||||||
1 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | ZANELLATO Lorenzo | 1980 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | IVALDI Marco | 1972 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | PREDOLIN Luca | 1979 | M | ITA | |||
19. jun. 2010 - 20. jun. 2010 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Verona | ||||||||
1 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | SPILIMBERGO Jacopo | 1980 | M | ITA | [i] PTPD (ITA) | ||
3 | N | IVALDI Marco | 1972 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | RANCOITA Fabrizio | 1971 | M | ITA | |||
20. jun. 2009 - 21. jun. 2009 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Roma | ||||||||
1 | N | AMALFITANO Roberto | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | CAGLIERO Roberto | 1970 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | DI GREZIA Marco | 1973 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | POZZI Matteo | 1974 | M | ITA | |||
1. jun. 2008 - 2. jun. 2008 | Campionati Italiani Veterani | Bergamo | ||||||||
1 | N | VIRGILIO Lucio | 1969 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | GIANNETTI Marco | 1978 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | CAGLIERO Roberto | 1970 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | PARDINI Diego | 1975 | M | ITA |