Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4. okt. 2023 - 8. okt. 2023 | Nordic Championships | Kääriku | ||||||||
1 | N | SALA Carl | 2007 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
2 | N | OZOLINS Jekabs | 2008 | M | LAT | |||
3 | N | SVIRIDENKOVS Vladislavs | 2008 | M | LAT | |||
3 | N | ZDORS Markuss | 2007 | M | LAT | BJSS Ridzene (LAT) | ||
24. aug. 2022 - 28. aug. 2022 | Nordic Championships | Copenhagen | ||||||||
1 | N | GRELA Tristan | 2006 | M | SWE | EGF Solna (SWE) | ||
2 | N | VAABEN Frode | 2007 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
3 | N | MOHOLI Elvis | 2008 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
3 | N | SALA Carl | 2007 | M | SWE | VF Vallentuna (SWE) | ||
11. maj 2019 - 12. maj 2019 | Nordic Championships | Riga | ||||||||
1 | N | YLITERVO Santeri | 2002 | M | FIN | Oulun Miekkailuseura (FIN) | ||
2 | N | KARLSEN Jonas Benjamin | 2004 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | ||
3 | N | HUSAINOVS Zans | 2003 | M | LAT | BJSS Ridzene (LAT) | ||
3 | N | ZELTISEVS Matvejs | 2004 | M | LAT | BJSS Ridzene (LAT) | ||
12. feb. 2011 - 12. feb. 2011 | Nordic Championships | Oulu | ||||||||
1 | LÖF Jesper | 1994 | M | SWE | HFS Halmstad (SWE) | |||
2 | SØRENSEN Julius | 1996 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
3 | HIETAHARJU Antte | 1995 | M | FIN | Oulun Miekkailuseura (FIN) | |||
3 | JÄRVELÄ Olli | 1997 | M | FIN | Oulun Miekkailuseura (FIN) | |||
6. feb. 2010 - 7. feb. 2010 | Coupe de Helsingborg - Nordic Championships | Helsingborg | ||||||||
1 | ISAKSON Erik | 1993 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
2 | RIZELL Simon | 1994 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | MARTIN Julius | 1994 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | STJERNDAL Jimmy | 1994 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
25. jun. 2007 - 29. jun. 2007 | Nordic Championships | Odense | ||||||||
1 | JOHANSEN Soeren-Ulrik | 1991 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
2 | JØRGENSEN Patrick | 1991 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
3 | BRÄNNSTRÖM Gustaf | 1991 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | JESSING Oliver Birk | 1992 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
26. jan. 2002 - 27. jan. 2002 | Kungsbacka Masters - Nordic Championships | Kungsbacka | ||||||||
1 | THELAND Simon | 1985 | M | DEN | Trekanten København (DEN) | |||
2 | LUNDEGARD Henrik | 1985 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | ALBINSSON Daniel | 1987 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
3 | TARKOVSKIJ-HEMMINGHYTT Alexandr | 1986 | M | NOR | Njård Fekting (NOR) | |||
15. jan. 2000 - 16. jan. 2000 | Partille Cup - Nordic Championships | Partille | ||||||||
1 | N | WERTSÉN Johan | 1983 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | ||
2 | N | ENARSSON Simon | 1984 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | ||
3 | N | RUDZKI Filip | 1983 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | SKÅRBRATT Erik | 1984 | M | SWE | |||
21. mar. 1998 - 22. mar. 1998 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | LINDMAR Johan | 1982 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
2 | MAGNUSSON Mattias | 1981 | M | SWE | HFS Halmstad (SWE) | |||
3 | BRANTE John | 1981 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | |||
3 | WERTSÉN Johan | 1983 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
11. jan. 1997 - 12. jan. 1997 | Partille Cup - Nordic Championships | Partille | ||||||||
1 | LINDMAR Johan | 1982 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
3 | STRIDH Christoffer | 1981 | M | SWE | FKC Karlskrona (SWE) | |||
4 | BRANTE John | 1981 | M | SWE | LUGI Lund (SWE) | |||
24. feb. 1996 - 25. feb. 1996 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | ROMANTCHUK Romantchuk | 1900 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | EDLUND Peter | 1979 | M | SWE | [i] PFK Partille (SWE) | |||
1. apr. 1995 - 2. apr. 1995 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | ROTH KRONWALL Martin | 1978 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | NYMAN Johan | 1978 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | MAGNUSSON Martin | 1978 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
3 | VISTISEN Eduardo | 1978 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) | |||
24. nov. 1990 - 24. nov. 1990 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | HALLNER Fredrik | 1973 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
3 | SCHÜLER Fredrik | 1973 | M | SWE | ARA Helsingborg (SWE) | |||
4 | THUNBERG Jonas | 1973 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | |||
18. mar. 1989 - 19. mar. 1989 | Nordic Championships | Västeras | ||||||||
1 | MARKUSSON Marcus | 1972 | M | SWE | [i] MFK Åkersberga (SWE) | |||
2 | THUNBERG Jonas | 1973 | M | SWE | GoFK Visby (SWE) | |||
3 | LÖFGREN Magnus | 1973 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
4 | HALLNER Fredrik | 1973 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
5. mar. 1988 - 6. mar. 1988 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | HALLNER Fredrik | 1973 | M | SWE | UF Uppsala (SWE) | |||
2 | ANDERSEN-PRYCE Rama | 1973 | M | DEN | Frederiksberg Slots FK (DEN) | |||
3 | TAJTHY Petter | 1973 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
4 | LÖFGREN Magnus | 1973 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
14. mar. 1987 - 15. mar. 1987 | Nordic Championships | København | ||||||||
1 | GRANLER Oskar | 1972 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | DANIELSSON Martin | 1972 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
3 | TAJTHY Petter | 1973 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
1. mar. 1986 - 2. mar. 1986 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | HANSEN Rasmus Hvass | 1971 | M | DEN | ||||
2 | DANIELSSON Martin | 1972 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
3 | HELLSTRÖM Max | 1971 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
4 | HENRIKSEN Karsten | 1900 | M | DEN | ||||
23. apr. 1985 - 24. apr. 1985 | Nordic Championships | Lidingö | ||||||||
1 | SIPOS Szilard | 1970 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
2 | HELLSTRÖM Max | 1971 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | DANIELSSON Martin | 1972 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
4 | HOLMAN Kristian | 1900 | M | FIN | Miekka Miehet (FIN) | |||
10. mar. 1984 - 11. mar. 1984 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | JENSEN Johan | 1969 | M | SWE | LjFK Ljungby (SWE) | |||
2 | KERTES Andreas | 1969 | M | SWE | DIF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
3 | KAJBJER Ola | 1969 | M | SWE | KFK Kalmar (SWE) | |||
4 | SKOGEN Pal | 1969 | M | NOR | ||||
12. mar. 1983 - 13. mar. 1983 | Nordic Championships | Birkerod | ||||||||
1 | SJÖLIN Ola | 1968 | M | SWE | ARA Helsingborg (SWE) | |||
2 | NIELSEN Peter | 1900 | M | DEN | ||||
3 | RIEHKO Rikard | 1968 | M | SWE | JFK Järfälla (SWE) | |||
4 | FRANSELLA Adrian | 1900 | M | DEN | ||||
13. mar. 1982 - 14. mar. 1982 | Nordic Championships | Oslo | ||||||||
1 | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
2 | KOLBJORNSEN Endre | 1967 | M | NOR | Bygdø FK (NOR) | |||
3 | GOMEZ Andres | 1967 | M | SWE | FFF Stockholm (SWE) | |||
4 | MØRK Søren | 1967 | M | DEN | ||||
21. mar. 1981 - 22. mar. 1981 | Nordic Championships | Stockholm | ||||||||
1 | STRAND Eric | 1966 | M | SWE | GFK Göteborg (SWE) | |||
2 | ABRAHAMSSON Peter | 1966 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
3 | AHLGREN Mats | 1967 | M | SWE | SAF Solna (SWE) | |||
4 | LARSSON Richard | 1967 | M | SWE | MF19 Malmö (SWE) | |||
8. mar. 1980 - 9. mar. 1980 | Nordic Championships | Helsinki | ||||||||
1 | N | HULTMAN Henrik | 1965 | M | SWE | |||
2 | N | GÖTHLIN Lars | 1965 | M | SWE | |||
3 | N | PETERSTRAND Lars | 1965 | M | SWE | ÄFK Stockholm (SWE) | ||
4 | N | WINKEL-HOLM Isak | 1965 | M | DEN | Hellerup FK (DEN) |