Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. 4. 2023 - 2. 4. 2023 | 5 Prova Master Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio | ||||||||
1 | N | NICOLI Giovanni | 1972 | M | ITA | Scherma Sebino (ITA) | ||
2 | N | PIETROMARCHI Lorenzo | 1967 | M | ITA | Acc. Scherma Milano (ITA) | ||
3 | N | BIGAGLI Cristiano | 1973 | M | ITA | SC Lucca Tbb (ITA) | ||
3 | N | PESCE Filippo | 1972 | M | ITA | Udinese Scherma (ITA) | ||
19. 1. 2019 - 20. 1. 2019 | CNV Bologna | Bologna | ||||||||
1 | N | DI RUSSO Fabio | 1969 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | CAPELLINI Fabrizio | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | VANNUCCI Dino | 1967 | M | ITA | |||
17. 3. 2018 - 18. 3. 2018 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio | ||||||||
1 | N | DOUSSE Christian | 1960 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | CALLEGARINI Pierantonio | 1968 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | DE SANTIS Michele | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | OSTINO Carlo | 1964 | M | ITA | |||
18. 2. 2017 - 19. 2. 2017 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio Varese | ||||||||
1 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | DE SANTIS Michele | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | SIRENA Andrea | 1962 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | VANNUCCI Dino | 1967 | M | ITA | |||
12. 3. 2016 - 13. 3. 2016 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio Varese | ||||||||
1 | N | DOUSSE Christian | 1960 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | CAPELLINI Fabrizio | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BELLI Leonardo | 1957 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
14. 2. 2015 - 15. 2. 2015 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio Varese | ||||||||
1 | N | GIANNINI Daniele | 1964 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | CAPELLINI Fabrizio | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | SIRENA Andrea | 1962 | M | ITA | |||
26. 10. 2013 - 27. 10. 2013 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio Varese | ||||||||
1 | N | DOUSSE Christian | 1960 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | CAPELLINI Fabrizio | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | MAZZOTTA Marco | 1962 | M | ITA | |||
27. 10. 2012 - 28. 10. 2012 | CNV Busto Arsizio | Busto Arsizio Varese | ||||||||
1 | N | DOUSSE Christian | 1960 | M | SUI | CAL Lausanne (SUI) | ||
2 | N | BOSIO Marco | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | CAPELLINI Fabrizio | 1961 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | GALVAN Maurizio | 1954 | M | ITA |