Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23. 9. 2023 - 24. 9. 2023 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | VAN LIER Arthur | 2008 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | PROSSÉ Art | 2007 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
3 | N | VAN INGELGEM Cyriel | 2008 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | WITTOUCK Corto | 2008 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
17. 9. 2022 - 18. 9. 2022 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | TRUTT Gaêtan | 2006 | M | FRA | CHARLEVILLE (FRA) | ||
2 | N | CHAUVEL Titouan | 2007 | M | FRA | CHARLEVILLE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | PROSSÉ Art | 2007 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
3 | N | VAN LISHOUT Mats | 2007 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
18. 9. 2021 - 19. 9. 2021 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | DEVOS Jurre | 2005 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | VOLCKAERT Cédric | 2005 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | DANNEELS Birgen | 2005 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
4 | N | AUDENAERT Sil | 2006 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
19. 9. 2020 - 20. 9. 2020 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | VOLCKAERT Cédric | 2005 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | DE VISSCHER Jerome | 2004 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | DEVOS Jurre | 2005 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | PROSSÉ Nand | 2004 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
21. 9. 2019 - 22. 9. 2019 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | PROSSÉ Nand | 2004 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
2 | N | VANNIEUWENBORGH Gijs | 2003 | M | BEL | SC Parcival Leuven (BEL) | ||
3 | N | DEVOS Jurre | 2005 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | STAS DE RICHELLE Arnaud | 2003 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
8. 9. 2018 - 9. 9. 2018 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | KURVERS Lester | 2002 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | PROSSÉ Nand | 2004 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
3 | N | NEUHÄUSER Marc | 2004 | M | GER | FC Tauberbischofsheim (GER) | ||
3 | N | VANNIEUWENBORGH Gijs | 2003 | M | BEL | SC Parcival Leuven (BEL) | ||
16. 9. 2017 - 17. 9. 2017 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | HEMELSOET Elias | 2001 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | PROSSE Mael | 2001 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
3 | N | KURVERS Lester | 2002 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | VANNIEUWENBORGH Gijs | 2003 | M | BEL | SC Parcival Leuven (BEL) | ||
17. 9. 2016 - 18. 9. 2016 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | BOUWMAN Dirk-Jan | 2000 | M | NED | s.v. Surtout (NED) | ||
2 | N | KURVERS Lester | 2002 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | EL BOUJDAINI Amine | 2000 | M | BEL | CE Braine l'Alleud (BEL) | ||
3 | N | PROSSE Mael | 2001 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
3. 10. 2015 - 4. 10. 2015 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | DE RIDDER Arne | 2000 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
2 | N | STRIJK Philippe | 2000 | M | NED | Delft Fencing Club (NED) | ||
3 | N | DELTOUR Axel | 2000 | M | BEL | |||
3 | N | POIZAT Alexandre | 2000 | M | BEL | Sabre Noir (BEL) | ||
22. 9. 2012 - 23. 9. 2012 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | DENTANT Ian | 1996 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
2 | N | DE RIDDER Arne | 2000 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
3 | N | SWENNEN Frans | 1997 | M | BEL | |||
3 | N | VAN DURME Egon | 1997 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
24. 9. 2011 - 25. 9. 2011 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | JACQUES Philippe | 1995 | M | BEL | CE Braine l'Alleud (BEL) | ||
2 | N | DE VOS Pieter | 1995 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
3 | N | CALLENS Thomas | 1995 | M | BEL | SC Parcival Leuven (BEL) | ||
3 | N | DENTANT Ian | 1996 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
11. 9. 2010 - 12. 9. 2010 | De Gulden Klauw | Sint Niklaas | ||||||||
1 | N | DE VOS Pieter | 1995 | M | BEL | SG de Klauwaerts (BEL) | ||
2 | N | DE VISSCHER Jules-Emile | 1995 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) | ||
3 | N | JACQUES Philippe | 1995 | M | BEL | CE Braine l'Alleud (BEL) | ||
3 | N | REYNAERT Samuel | 1994 | M | BEL | Confrerie Gent (BEL) |