Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. 6. 2024 - 4. 6. 2024 | European Championships | Antalya | ||||||||
1 | N | HRYCIUK Szymon | 2002 | M | POL | Palac Mlodziezy Katowice (POL) | ||
2 | N | COVALIU Vlad | 2005 | M | ROU | |||
3 | N | DENKIEWICZ Benedykt | 2006 | M | POL | |||
3 | N | VECCIA SCAVALLI Lupo Giorgio Giovanni | 2003 | M | ITA | Frascati Scherma (ITA) | ||
23. 5. 2023 - 27. 5. 2023 | European Championships | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | N | NITU Radu | 2004 | M | ROU | CS RIPOSTA (ROU) | ||
2 | N | ZMAU Alexandru | 2001 | M | ROU | CSM IASI (ROU) | ||
3 | N | HORVATH Gergo | 2002 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
3 | N | MADRIGAL Santiago | 2004 | M | ESP | CE-M (ESP) | ||
27. 5. 2022 - 31. 5. 2022 | European Championships | Tallinn | ||||||||
1 | N | PIANFETTI Maxime | 1999 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | ||
2 | N | SZCZEPANIK Piotr | 2000 | M | POL | MUKS VICTOR (POL) | ||
3 | N | NERI Matteo | 1999 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | OLLIVIER Leandre | 1999 | M | FRA | PARIS USM (FRA) | ||
29. 5. 2019 - 2. 6. 2019 | European Championships | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | N | KOSTENKO Anatoliy | 1998 | M | AIN | |||
2 | N | DREOSSI Leonardo | 1997 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | BONAH Raoul | 1998 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | ||
3 | N | DRAGOMIR George | 1999 | M | ROU | CSS Slobozia (ROU) | ||
15. 4. 2018 - 19. 4. 2018 | European Championships | Yerevan | ||||||||
1 | CAVALIERE Dario | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SHENGELIA Nika | 1999 | M | GEO | FC Tbilisi (GEO) | |||
3 | DANILENKO Dmitriy | 1995 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | DUBARRY Baptiste | 1997 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
21. 4. 2017 - 25. 4. 2017 | European Championships U23 | Minsk | ||||||||
1 | D'ARMIENTO Francesco | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | LAMBERT Maxence | 1994 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
3 | TEODOSIU Iulian | 1994 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | YILDIRIM Enver | 1995 | M | TUR | Bekir Yilmaz GSK (TUR) | |||
1. 5. 2016 - 4. 5. 2016 | European Championships U23 | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
2 | D'ARMIENTO Francesco | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | AFFEDE Leonardo | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | TRUSHAKOV Alexander | 1994 | M | RUS | CSKA Moscow (RUS) | |||
22. 4. 2015 - 26. 4. 2015 | European Championships U23 | Vicenza | ||||||||
1 | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | NOVIKAU Artsiom | 1996 | M | BLR | ||||
3 | AFFEDE Leonardo | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SCEPI Stefano | 1992 | M | ITA | ||||
24. 6. 2014 - 28. 6. 2014 | European Championships U23 | Tbilisi | ||||||||
1 | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
2 | TRUSHAKOV Alexander | 1994 | M | RUS | CSKA Moscow (RUS) | |||
3 | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | SHACHANIN Siarhei | 1992 | M | BLR | RCPhES (BLR) | |||
5. 6. 2013 - 9. 6. 2013 | European Championships U23 | Torun | ||||||||
1 | FOSCHINI Gabriele | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | SCHRÖDTER Sebastian | 1990 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | BOTEZATU Maxim | 1990 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | RAVASZ Etele | 1992 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
25. 5. 2012 - 29. 5. 2012 | European Championships U23 | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | SZATMARI Andras | 1993 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | BALOK Maksim | 1991 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | BAZADZE Beka | 1989 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
3 | LIKHACHEUSKI Aliaksei | 1990 | M | BLR | RCPhES (BLR) | |||
27. 5. 2011 - 31. 5. 2011 | European Championships U23 | Kazan | ||||||||
1 | IBRAGIMOV Kamil | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | GIANI Amedeo | 1991 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | BALOK Maksim | 1991 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | RAVASZ Etele | 1992 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
27. 4. 2010 - 28. 4. 2010 | European Championships U23 | Gdansk | ||||||||
1 | MEDARD Julien | 1987 | M | FRA | PAU SECTION (FRA) | |||
2 | ERSHOV Sergey | 1987 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | GALL Csaba | 1989 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | |||
3 | WAGNER Benedikt | 1990 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
8. 5. 2009 - 9. 5. 2009 | European Championships U23 | Debrecen | ||||||||
1 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | RESHETNIKOV Veniamin | 1986 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
3 | MIRACCO Luigi | 1988 | M | ITA | ||||
9. 5. 2008 - 10. 5. 2008 | European Championships U23 | Monza | ||||||||
1 | N | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | ||
2 | N | SAMELE Luigi | 1987 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | NAGY Pal | 1985 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
3 | N | YAGODKA Andriy | 1988 | M | UKR | Musketeer Odessa (UKR) |