Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
26. 2. 2024 - 29. 2. 2024 | European Championships | Napoli | ||||||||
1 | N | GARRIGUE Remi | 2004 | M | FRA | CERGY CE (FRA) | ||
2 | N | CANTINI Edoardo | 2004 | M | ITA | Centro Sportivo Carabinieri (ITA) | ||
3 | N | MADRIGAL Santiago | 2004 | M | ESP | CE-M (ESP) | ||
3 | N | VIGH Benedek | 2004 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
25. 2. 2023 - 28. 2. 2023 | European Championships | Tallinn | ||||||||
1 | N | MASTRULLO Marco | 2003 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | LUKASHENKO Darii | 2005 | M | UKR | |||
3 | N | ASLAN Tolga | 2005 | M | TUR | |||
3 | N | CIDU Casian | 2006 | M | ROU | CSS Unirea Iasi (ROU) | ||
26. 2. 2022 - 2. 3. 2022 | European Championships | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | N | HEATHCOCK Colin | 2005 | M | USA | TSG Eislingen (GER) | ||
2 | N | NITU Radu | 2004 | M | ROU | CS RIPOSTA (ROU) | ||
3 | N | GARRIGUE Remi | 2004 | M | FRA | CERGY CE (FRA) | ||
3 | N | HRYCIUK Szymon | 2002 | M | POL | Palac Mlodziezy Katowice (POL) | ||
27. 2. 2020 - 2. 3. 2020 | European Championships | Porec | ||||||||
1 | N | HUMEN Vasyl | 2002 | M | UKR | KIEW (UKR) | ||
2 | N | FIORETTO Luca | 2000 | M | ITA | |||
3 | N | RABB Krisztian | 2001 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | ||
3 | N | TYULYUKOV Kirill | 2001 | M | AIN | |||
27. 2. 2019 - 3. 3. 2019 | European Championships | Foggia | ||||||||
1 | N | NERI Matteo | 1999 | M | ITA | |||
2 | N | POZDNYAKOV Vladislav | 1999 | M | RUS | |||
3 | N | GENOV Galin | 2000 | M | BUL | Plovdiv BG (BUL) | ||
3 | N | SHENGELIA Nika | 1999 | M | GEO | FC Tbilisi (GEO) | ||
7. 3. 2018 - 11. 3. 2018 | European Championships U20 | Sochi | ||||||||
1 | PIANFETTI Maxime | 1999 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
2 | PATRICE Sebastien | 2000 | M | FRA | GEMENOS (FRA) | |||
3 | ARPINO Alberto | 1998 | M | ITA | [i] SAL Lugano (SUI) | |||
3 | LOKHANOV Konstantin | 1998 | M | RUS | ||||
5. 3. 2017 - 9. 3. 2017 | European Championships U20 | Plovdiv | ||||||||
1 | POZDNYAKOV Vladislav | 1999 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | CAVALIERE Dario | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | DREOSSI Leonardo | 1997 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | LOKHANOV Konstantin | 1998 | M | RUS | ||||
4. 3. 2016 - 9. 3. 2016 | European Championships U20 | Novi Sad | ||||||||
1 | COLLEAU Charles | 1996 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
2 | VORONOV Kostiantyn | 1996 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
3 | GODLEWSKI Mateusz | 1997 | M | POL | ||||
3 | PECH Miklos | 1996 | M | HUN | MTK (HUN) | |||
1. 3. 2015 - 5. 3. 2015 | European Championships U20 | Maribor | ||||||||
1 | DANILENKO Dmitriy | 1995 | M | AIN | ||||
2 | BONSANTO Francesco | 1995 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | ANDREEV Iliy | 1995 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | VORONOV Kostiantyn | 1996 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
28. 2. 2014 - 4. 3. 2014 | European Championships U20 | Jerusalem | ||||||||
1 | CURATOLI Luca | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | VORONOV Kostiantyn | 1996 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
3 | BUCHKOVSKIY Artem | 1995 | M | RUS | CSKA Moscow (RUS) | |||
3 | LAMBERT Maxence | 1994 | M | FRA | TARBES ATE (FRA) | |||
3. 3. 2013 - 9. 3. 2013 | European Championships | Budapest | ||||||||
1 | BAZADZE Sandro | 1993 | M | GEO | FC Kutaisi (GEO) | |||
2 | VORONOV Kostiantyn | 1996 | M | ISR | Maccabi Jerusalem (ISR) | |||
3 | D'ARMIENTO Francesco | 1994 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | IBRAGIMOV Kamil | 1993 | M | RUS | ||||
28. 2. 2012 - 10. 3. 2012 | European Championships U20 | Porec | ||||||||
1 | SZATMARI Andras | 1993 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | GANS Emmanuel | 1992 | M | FRA | GEMENOS (FRA) | |||
3 | SCEPI Stefano | 1992 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | TRUSHAKOV Alexander | 1994 | M | RUS | CSKA Moscow (RUS) | |||
24. 10. 2010 - 30. 10. 2010 | European Championships | Lobnya | ||||||||
1 | BERRÈ Enrico | 1992 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | TSAP Yuriy | 1992 | M | UKR | Nikolaev (UKR) | |||
3 | KARPUKIN Alexander | 1991 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | SCEPI Stefano | 1992 | M | ITA | ||||
1. 11. 2009 - 2. 11. 2009 | European Championships U20 | Odense | ||||||||
1 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | HÜBERS Richard | 1993 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | BOTEZATU Maxim | 1990 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | WILLAU Mathias | 1992 | M | AUT | FUM Mödling (AUT) | |||
3. 11. 2008 - 4. 11. 2008 | European Championships U20 | Amsterdam | ||||||||
1 | ILIASZ Nicolas | 1991 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | MARINO Fabrizio | 1990 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | GEMESI Bence | 1989 | M | HUN | GEAC Gödöllö (HUN) | |||
3 | MORENO Pablo | 1989 | M | ESP | ||||
29. 10. 2007 - 30. 10. 2007 | European Championships U20 | Prag | ||||||||
1 | PUNDYK Dmytro | 1989 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
2 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
3 | DOLNICEANU Tiberiu | 1988 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | MIRACCO Luigi | 1988 | M | ITA | ||||
1. 11. 2006 - 2. 11. 2006 | European Championships U20 | Poznan | ||||||||
1 | SZILAGYI Aron | 1990 | M | HUN | VASAS Budapest (HUN) | |||
2 | DOLNICEANU Tiberiu | 1988 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | HARTUNG Max | 1989 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
3 | PELLEGRINI Alberto | 1988 | M | ITA | ||||
1. 11. 2005 - 8. 11. 2005 | European Championships U20 | Tapolca | ||||||||
1 | SAMELE Luigi | 1987 | M | ITA | ||||
2 | MARCEA Virgil | 1986 | M | ROU | CSA Steaua Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
3 | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
3 | KOVALEV Nikolay | 1986 | M | RUS | ||||
31. 10. 2004 - 6. 11. 2004 | European Championships U20 | Espinho | ||||||||
1 | LIMBACH Nicolas | 1985 | M | GER | TSV Bayer Dormagen (GER) | |||
2 | HÜBNER-FEHRER Björn | 1986 | M | GER | ||||
3 | BOGHICEV Franz | 1985 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
3 | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
4. 11. 2003 - 11. 11. 2003 | European Championships U20 | Porec | ||||||||
1 | LONTAY Balazs | 1984 | M | HUN | BVSC BUDAPEST (HUN) | |||
2 | BUIKEVICH Aliaksandr | 1984 | M | BLR | RCPhES (BLR) | |||
3 | BOGHICEV Franz | 1985 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
3 | BOYKO Dmytro | 1986 | M | UKR | Netishyn (UKR) | |||
4. 11. 2002 - 10. 11. 2002 | European Championships U20 | Conegliano | ||||||||
1 | SHTURBABIN Oleh | 1984 | M | UKR | ||||
2 | YAKIMENKO Alexey | 1983 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | DRANYK Artem | 1983 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | KONIUSZ Marcin | 1983 | M | POL | FORTIS Sosnowiec (POL) | |||
13. 11. 2001 - 18. 11. 2001 | European Championships U20 | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | PRYIEMKA Valery | 1983 | M | AIN | SC TUFB (BLR) | |||
2 | ANSTETT Vincent | 1982 | M | FRA | SOUFFELWEYE (FRA) | |||
3 | MARTIN Clement | 1984 | M | FRA | ORLEANS CE (FRA) | |||
3 | NEUHOLD Sandor | 1982 | M | HUN | ||||
30. 10. 2000 - 5. 11. 2000 | European Championships U20 | Antalya | ||||||||
1 | DECSI Tamas | 1982 | M | HUN | Kondorosi Vívók Sportegyesület (HUN) | |||
2 | BEDEL Simon | 1982 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | ANSTETT Vincent | 1982 | M | FRA | SOUFFELWEYE (FRA) | |||
3 | SAZONOV Viatcheslav | 1982 | M | RUS | ||||
15. 11. 1999 - 21. 11. 1999 | European Championships U20 | Viana do Castelo | ||||||||
1 | VELIKI Grigor | 1980 | M | RUS | ||||
2 | BAUER Dennis | 1980 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
3 | GRIMM Philipp | 1980 | M | GER | TSG Eislingen (GER) | |||
3 | WISNIEWSKI Bartosz | 1982 | M | POL | ||||
4. 11. 1998 - 8. 11. 1998 | European Championships U20 | Bratislava | ||||||||
1 | SURIMTO Alexandre | 1979 | M | BLR | ||||
2 | LUKASHENKO Vladimir | 1980 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | KHRYSTIK Vladimir | 1979 | M | UKR | ||||
3 | ZALOMIR Florin | 1984 | M | ROU | CS Dinamo Bucuresti (ROU) | |||
4. 11. 1997 - 9. 11. 1997 | European Championships U20 | Gdansk | ||||||||
1 | BAUER Dennis | 1980 | M | GER | [i] Königsbacher SC (GER) | |||
2 | MORENO Gregoire | 1978 | M | FRA | ||||
3 | FROSIN Aleksey | 1978 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | KHRYSTIK Vladimir | 1979 | M | UKR | ||||
5. 11. 1996 - 5. 11. 1996 | European Championships U20 | Limoges | ||||||||
1 | N | DECSI Andras | 1977 | M | HUN | |||
2 | N | DIATCHENKO Alexei | 1978 | M | RUS | |||
3 | N | FROSIN Aleksey | 1978 | M | AIN | |||
3 | N | WEBER Alexander | 1978 | M | ARG | Freiburger TS (GER) | ||
9. 11. 1995 - 9. 11. 1995 | European Championships U20 | Keszthely | ||||||||
1 | LAPKES Dmitri | 1976 | M | BLR | Dinamo (BLR) | |||
2 | FROSIN Aleksey | 1978 | M | AIN | ||||
3 | CASTRUCCI COTICHINI Giovanni | 1976 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | GALVEZ Guillaume | 1976 | M | FRA | VINCENNES CE (FRA) | |||
11. 11. 1994 - 13. 11. 1994 | European Championships U20 | Krakow | ||||||||
1 | FERJANCSIK Domonkos | 1975 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | CHARRON Herve | 1975 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | HERM Michael | 1976 | M | GER | TSG Eislingen (GER) | |||
3 | LAPKES Dmitri | 1976 | M | BLR | Dinamo (BLR) | |||
30. 10. 1993 - 31. 10. 1993 | European Championships | Estoril | ||||||||
1 | FERJANCSIK Domonkos | 1975 | M | HUN | ||||
2 | CHARRON Herve | 1975 | M | FRA | PARIS RCF (FRA) | |||
3 | ERMOLAEV Alexei | 1975 | M | RUS | ||||
3 | TOUYA Damien | 1975 | M | FRA | ||||
31. 10. 1992 - 2. 11. 1992 | European Championships U20 | Innsbruck | ||||||||
1 | GILMAN Dariusz | 1973 | M | POL | ||||
2 | MAGNINI Livio | 1973 | M | ITA | ||||
3 | TAKACS Peter | 1973 | M | HUN | ||||
3 | TUCCILLO Giuseppe | 1973 | M | ITA | [i] CHAMP NAPOLI (ITA) |